This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2021 at 15:15:12 (UTC).

BROWN et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2012 BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:12-CV-04929

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RILEY J. BROWN

PAUL L. BROWN

KRISTIN L. BROWN

Defendants

MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE

MCNEIL-PPC, INC.

McNEIL CONSUMER & SPECIALTY PHARMACEUTICALS

MCNEIL CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

D-I-D AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAURA A. FELDMAN

Attorney at FELDMAN & PINTO

30 S. 15Th Street 15Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

SCOTT D. LEVENSTEN

Attorney at THE LEVENSTEN LAW FIRM PC

1420 Walnut St Ste 1500

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOHN BRADLEY MCDERMOTT

Attorney at Feldman & Pinto

6706 Springbank Street, Philadelphia

Philadelphia, PA 19119

BRANDON H. STEFFEY

Attorney at JENSEN & ASSOCIATES

1024 North Main St

Fort Worth, TX 76164

ROSEMARY PINTO

Attorney at Feldman and Pinto

30 South 15Th Street, 15Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JEFFREY E. ZINDER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN D. WITZER INC

8752 Holloway Dr

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID F. ABERNETHY

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

18Th & Cherry Streets, One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996

KADENE K. CHIN

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square Ste 2000, 18Th & Cherry Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

KENNETH P. CONOUR

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont St., 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

VERNON I. ZVOLEFF

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont St., 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

THOMAS W. PULLIAM, JR.

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont St., 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

CARLOS M. LAZATIN

Attorney at O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP

400 South Hope St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MATTHEW P. SMITH

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

284 #12

Exhibit

282 #17

Exhibit Q

282 #3

Exhibit C

276 #5

Exhibit E

232 #3

Exhibit C

227 #8

Exhibit H

177 #4

Exhibit D - MIL re charity in Maya

165 #15

Exhibit 34 to Omnibus Declaration of David F. Abernethy in Support of Defendant&

#153

No Description Available

#123

No Description Available

115 #44

Exhibit Exhibit 41

115 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 4

106 #6

Exhibit 3

#99

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#5

(#5) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KENNETH P. CONOUR, ESQUIRE, PURSUANT TO LOCAL R.CIV. P. 83.5.2(b), filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., McNEIL CONSUMER & SPECIALTY PHARMACEUTICALS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT NO. 69387.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)

1,427 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#383) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/29/2015 PM SESSION before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#382) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/29/2015 AM SESSION before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#381) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/22/2015 before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#380) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/21/2015 PM SESSION before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#379) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/21/2015 AM SESSION before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#378) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/18/2015 PM SESSION before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#377) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/17/2015 PM SESSION before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#376) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/17/2015 AM SESSION, before Judge PAUL S. DIAMOND. Court Reporter: DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC.. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#375) TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 9/16/15 (PM Session) before Judge Diamond. Court Reporter: Diana Doman Transcribing, LLC. (fdc) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Docket(#374) TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 9/16/15 (AM Session) before Judge Diamond. Court Reporter: Diana Doman Transcribing, LLC. (fdc) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
366 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF VERNON I. ZVOLEFF TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/14/2012. 9/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF VERNON I. ZVOLEFF, ESQUIRE, PURSUANT TO LOCAL R.CIV. P. 83.5.2(b), filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., McNEIL CONSUMER & SPECIALTY PHARMACEUTICALS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT NO. 69387.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (LEVENSTEN, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF THOMAS W. PULLIAM, JR., ESQUIRE, PURSUANT TO LOCAL R.CIV. P. 83.5.2(b), filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., McNEIL CONSUMER & SPECIALTY PHARMACEUTICALS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT NO. 69387.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KENNETH P. CONOUR, ESQUIRE, PURSUANT TO LOCAL R.CIV. P. 83.5.2(b), filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., McNEIL CONSUMER & SPECIALTY PHARMACEUTICALS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT NO. 69387.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/1/2012 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Information Report, #2 Letter to Counsel)(gk, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JOINT ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., Certificate of Service. (CHIN, KADENE) Modified on 9/7/2012 (fh) (Entered: 09/04/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(ks, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL-PPC, INC..(ks, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MCNEIL-PPC, INC. from CCP OF PHILADELPHIA, case number JULY TERM 2012, NO. 03495. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 068545) Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(ks, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McNeil Consumer Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant