This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2015 at 01:28:04 (UTC).

Bearings - Lead Case

Case Summary

On 09/05/2012 Bearings - Lead Case was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Marianne O. Battani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:12-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Marianne O. Battani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Albert B. Crush Company

Auto Dealership Plaintiffs

Melissa Barron

Beck Motors, Inc.

Bonneville and Son, Inc.

Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc.

Capitol Dealerships, Incorporated

Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC

Jennifer Chase

DALC GEAR & BEARING SUPPLY CORP.

Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc.

Dave Heather Corporation

Desert European Motor Cars LTD

Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, interested parties

End-Payor Plaintiffs

Florida Attorney General

Florida Welding Fabricators & Erectors, Inc.

Eugene Friedman

Green Team of Clay Center, Inc.

Curtis Gunnerson

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Warren T. Burns

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 5100

Dallas, TX 75202

Brendan H. Frey

Attorney at Mantese Honigman Rossman & Williamson, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Melissa Maxman

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1627 I Street Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20006

Michael S. Smith

Attorney at Preti Plaherty Beliveau & Pachios LLP

One City Center, P.O. Box 9546

Portland, ME 04112-9546

Ronald Wick

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1627 I Street, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20006

Sheldon L. Miller

31731 Northwestern Highway, Suite 280 West

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Shawn M. Raiter

Attorney at Larson King, LLP

30 E 7Th Street, Suite 2800

St Paul, MN 55101

Paul A. Sand - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Attorney at Larson King, LLP

30 East Seventh Street, Suite 2800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Jonathan W. Cuneo

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP

507 C Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Joel Davidow

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca

507 C Steet Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Kathryn Eisenstein

Attorney at Mantese Honigman Rossman & Williamson, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

David F. Hansma

Attorney at Mantese and Rossman

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

John C. Kakinuki

Attorney at Kakinuki Law Office, PC

1000 Fourth St.

San Rafael, CA 94901-3118

Yifei Li

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP

507 C Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Joshua Paul Lushnat

Attorney at Mantese Honigman Rossman & Williamson, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Gerard V. Mantese

Attorney at Mantese Assoc.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Victoria Romanenko

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca

507 C Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Craig Corbitt - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400

San Francisco, CA 94104

W. Joseph Bruckner

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen

100 Washington Avenue, S, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

73 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#174

#175

#172

#173

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#167

#168

#169

#170

#171

349 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#175) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua Paul Lushnat appearing on behalf of Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Incorporated, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation, Desert European Motor Cars LTD, Green Team of Clay Center, Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Incorporated, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group No. 1, Incorporated, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Incorporated, Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc., Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Incorporated, Stoebner Holdings, Inc, Thornhill Superstore, Incorporated, VIP Motor Cars LTD, Westfield Dodge City, Inc. (Lushnat, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#174) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth A. Cate appearing on behalf of NTN Corporation, NTN USA Corporation (Cate, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#173) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey J. Amato appearing on behalf of NTN Corporation, NTN USA Corporation (Amato, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#172) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR FILING ANSWERS AND DISMISSING CERTAIN STATE LAW CLAIMS - Stipulating Defendants shall file answers or responsive motions to the Truck and Equipment Dealers Complaint consistent with the dates set forth in the Stipulation and Agreement dated September 12, 2014 (ECF No. 164 in 2:12-cv-500) as noted above. Plaintiffs antitrust claims brought under the laws of New Hampshire prior to January 1, 2008 (paragraph 224 of the Truck and Equipment Dealers Complaint) and Utah prior to May 1, 2006 (paragraph 232 of the Truck and Equipment Dealers Complaint), as well as the Plaintiffs consumer protection claim brought under the laws of South Carolina (paragraph 247 of the Truck and Equipment Dealers Complaint) are hereby dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiffs retain all rights of appeal with respect to these claims. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (see order for details) (KDoa) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#171) ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL FOR TRUCK AND EQUIPMENT DEALER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#170) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael S. Smith appearing on behalf of Albert B. Crush Company, DALC GEAR & BEARING SUPPLY CORP., McGuire Bearing Company, SPS Spindle Parts and Service, LLC, Sherman Bearings, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#169) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Kakinuki on behalf of Beck Motors, Inc., Bonneville and Son, Inc., Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc., Capitol Dealerships, Incorporated, Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC, Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc., Dave Heather Corporation, Desert European Motor Cars LTD, Green Team of Clay Center, Inc., Hammett Motor Company, Inc, Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Incorporated, Holzhauer Auto and Truck Sales, Inc., John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC, Landers Auto Group No. 1, Incorporated, Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC, Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc., Lee's Summit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc, Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc., Pitre, Incorporated, Ramey Motors, Inc., SLT Group II, Incorporated, Thornhill Superstore, Incorporated, VIP Motor Cars LTD, Westfield Dodge City, Inc.. (Kakinuki, John) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#168) NOTICE by Rush Truck Centers of Arizona, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of California, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Colorado, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Florida, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Georgia, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Idaho, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Illinois, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Indiana, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Kansas, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Missouri, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of North Carolina, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Ohio, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Oregon, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Tennessee, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Texas, LP, Rush Truck Centers of Utah, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Virginia, Inc. re # 167 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs Attaching Proposed Order (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Parks, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#167) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs by Rush Truck Centers of Arizona, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of California, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Colorado, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Florida, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Georgia, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Idaho, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Illinois, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Indiana, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Kansas, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Missouri, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of North Carolina, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Ohio, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Oklahoma, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Oregon, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Tennessee, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Texas, LP, Rush Truck Centers of Utah, Inc., Rush Truck Centers of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Unpublished cases, # 3 Exhibit B - DM Antitrust and Competition, # 4 Exhibit C - DM Class Action Litigation, # 5 Exhibit D - Wayne A. Mack Biography, # 6 Exhibit E - J. Manly Parks Biography) (Parks, J.) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#166) OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION # 114 TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Persky on behalf of Bearings - Lead Case. (Persky, Bernard) (Entered: 09/11/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Hollis L Salzman - NOT SWORN on behalf of Bearings - Lead Case. (Salzman - NOT SWORN, Hollis) (Entered: 09/11/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William Reiss - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Bearings - Lead Case. (Reiss - MDL NOT ADMITTED, William) (Entered: 09/11/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Cotchett - NOT SWORN on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Cotchett - NOT SWORN, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank C. Damrell on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Damrell, Frank) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Kim - NOT SWORN on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Kim - NOT SWORN, Gene) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Zapala - NOT SWORN on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Zapala - NOT SWORN, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Williams on behalf of Meetesh Shah. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by E. Powell Miller on behalf of Bearings - Lead Case. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Schnatz on behalf of Bearings - Lead Case. (Schnatz, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dale Martens Nissan Subaru, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Capitol Dealerships, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC is a litigant