This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 02:05:30 (UTC).

B R P L L C (Delaware) v. Chesapeake Royalty L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2011 B R P L L C Delaware filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chesapeake Royalty L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:11-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B R P L L C (Delaware)

Defendants

Empress L L C

M C Louisiana Minerals L L C

P X P Louisiana Operations L L C

Empresa Energy L L C

Chesapeake Royalty L L C

Chesapeake Louisiana L P

EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc

P X P Louisiana L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Lake Hearne, Jr

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Julia E Blewer

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Michael W Mengis

Attorney at Baker Hostetler (HOU)

811 Main St Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77002-6111

Randall Stephen Davidson

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Grant E Summers

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Katherine Casey

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kenneth M Klemm

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Herschel E Richard, Jr

Attorney at Cook Yancey et al

P O Box 22260

Shreveport, LA 71120-2260

John Tucker Kalmbach

Attorney at Cook Yancey et al

P O Box 22260

Shreveport, LA 71120-2260

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

13 #3

Text of proposed order

13 #2

Exhibits Exhibits to Memorandum in Support

13 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#13

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil cover sheet

1 #3

Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibits

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DISTRICT REMAND Record Received by 39th JDC, Red River Parish on 3/14/2011, assigned case number 35215. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/17/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 39th JDC Red River Parish. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/09/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED ORDER re #13 MOTION to Remand for Failure to State Basis for Federal Jurisdiction and for Lack of Diversity filed by B R P L L C (Delaware). Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/7/11. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/09/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 39th Judicial District Court Rapides Parish. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/1/11. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for William Lake Hearne Jr. to Enroll as Counsel by B R P L L C (Delaware). (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Blewer, Julia) (Entered: 03/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Deficiency to William Lake Hearne, Jr on behalf of B R P L L C (Delaware) regarding #21 DEFICIENT ? Notice of Appearance. Reason: This party is already represented by other counsel. Please refer to provisions under LR83.2.12 regarding appearance of other counsel to ensure compliance with this rule. A motion to enroll as co-counsel or to substitute counsel (signed by the current counsel of record) is required to remedy this situation. (Please also refer to LR5.7.08W regarding electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party.). (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrective Document filed by B R P L L C (Delaware) regarding #19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (aty,Hearne, William) (Entered: 03/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DEFICIENT NOTICE of Appearance by William Lake Hearne, Jr on behalf of B R P L L C (Delaware) (aty,Hearne, William) Modified to reflect document as deficient on 3/1/2011. (Kennedy, T) Modified to remove "?" from docket text on 3/1/2011. See document #24 Motion to Enroll. (Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Deficiency to Grant E Summers on behalf of B R P L L C (Delaware) regarding #19 DEFICIENT ? Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8W for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 03/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for More Definite Statement and, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Kalmbach, John) (Entered: 02/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Responsive Pleadings with consent by EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Kalmbach, John) Modified on 2/8/2011 (Kennedy, T). (Entered: 02/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc identifying Corporate Parent EnCana Corp for EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. (aty,Kalmbach, John) Modified text on 1/31/2011. (Kennedy, T) (Entered: 01/31/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/27/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T) (Entered: 01/27/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Kenneth M Klemm, Sarah Katherine Casey on behalf of Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake Royalty L L C, Empresa Energy L L C, Empress L L C, M C Louisiana Minerals L L C, P X P Louisiana L L C, P X P Louisiana Operations L L C. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Returned Executed Chesapeake Louisiana L P, M C Louisiana Minerals L L C served on 12/29/2010, answer due 1/19/2011. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY, THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 OF THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc (aty,Kalmbach, John) (Entered: 01/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 39th JDC Red River Parish, Case Number 35215 (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0536-1562225) filed by P X P Louisiana Operations L L C, M C Louisiana Minerals, L L C, Empresa Energy L L C, Chesapeake Royalty, L L C, Empress L L C, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, P X P Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Casey, Sarah) (Entered: 01/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Empress, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where P X P Louisiana L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Encana Oil & Gas USA Inc is a litigant