This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2019 20:02:37

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 04/15/2011 a Intellectual Property - Patent case was filed by Apple Inc against Samsung Electronics Co Ltd in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 5:11-cv-01846
  • Filing Date 04/15/2011
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Patent
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Lucy H. Koh
  • Courthouse California Northern District

Party Details

  • Not Yet Classified Third Party Sony Mobile Communications USA, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Nicholas Thane Bauz
  • Petitioner InterDigital Technology Corporation
  • Represented By
    • Dylan James Liddiard
    • Michael Brett Levin
  • Petitioner S3G Graphics Co. LTD.
  • Represented By
    • Scott Richard Mosko
  • Amicus Curiae Cellco Partnership
  • Represented By
    • Melinda Mae Morton
  • Counter Claimant Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
  • Represented By
    • Brett Dylan Proctor
    • Huan-Yi Lin
  • Not Yet Classified Motorola Mobility LLC
  • Represented By
    • Jennifer A. Golinveaux
    • Peter John Chassman
  • Not Yet Classified Non-Party Rovi Corp.
  • Represented By
    • Marc Morris
  • Not Yet Classified Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
  • Represented By
    • Timothy Tully Scott
    • Leo Spooner, III
  • Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
  • Represented By
    • Kenneth Reed Chiate
    • Brett Dylan Proctor
  • Amicus Curiae T-Mobile USA, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Michael J. Bettinger

Court Documents

#3152

(#3152) Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2014 befor...

Fees Apply
#3151

(#3151) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...

Fees Apply
#3149

(#3149) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re: #3147 Apple...

Fees Apply
#3148

(#3148) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Americ...

Fees Apply
#3147

(#3147) Apple's Opposition to #3124 William Parker et al.'s ...

Fees Apply
3146 #2

Exhibit A

Fees Apply
3146 #1

Declaration of Robert J. Becher in Support of Samsung's Oppo...

Fees Apply
#3146

(#3146) SAMSUNG'S OPPOSITION TO #3124 MOTION TO INTERVENE AS...

Fees Apply
3124 #1

Envelope

Fees Apply
#3124

(#3146) SAMSUNG'S OPPOSITION TO #3124 MOTION TO INTERVENE AS...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2014
  • (#3152) Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 7/17/2014). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
  • 07/17/2014
  • (#3151) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
  • 07/17/2014
  • (#3150) CLERKS NOTICE: THE HEARINGS SET FOR THURSDAY, JULY 17, AT 1:30 WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 1 ON THE FIFTH FLOOR OF THE COURTHOUSE. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
  • 07/17/2014
  • (#3149) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re: #3147 Apple's Opposition to #3124 William Parker et al.'s Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs, by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified text on 7/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2014)
  • 07/16/2014
  • (#3148) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re #3146 SAMSUNGS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFFS WITH NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE UNDER RULE 24(A)(2), 24(B) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified text on 7/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
  • 07/16/2014
  • (#3147) Apple's Opposition to #3124 William Parker et al.'s Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs by Apple Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified text on 7/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
  • 07/16/2014
  • (#3146) SAMSUNG'S OPPOSITION TO #3124 MOTION TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFFS WITH NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE UNDER RULE 24(A)(2), 24(B) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Becher in Support of Samsung's Opposition, #2 Exhibit A)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified text on 7/17/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
  • 07/15/2014
  • (#3145) Statement of Recent Development Regarding Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,844,915 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
  • 07/09/2014
  • CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING DATE FOR MOTIONS Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3134 MOTION Samsung's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 3117), Order Setting Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs re #3117 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees , #3136 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE , #3135 MOTION inSamsung's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 2935), Order Granting Motion for Sanctions re #2935 Order, . Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
  • 07/09/2014
  • (#3144) EXHIBITS re #3122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Bond #3112 (Redacted) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #3122 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3143) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE GREWAL. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 7/8/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3142) EXHIBITS re #2410 , #2471 , #2557 , #2825 , #2838 , and #2974 ([2410-2]) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [2410-4], #2 [2471-1], #3 [2557-6], #4 [2557-7], #5 [2557-10], #6 [2557-17], #7 [2557-18], #8 [2557-19], #9 [2557-20], #10 [2557-21], #11 [2557-22], #12 [2557-23], #13 [2557-24], #14 [2557-25], #15 [2557-26], #16 [2557-27], #17 [2825-2], #18 [2838-8], #19 [2974-1])(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3141) EXHIBITS re #3039 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Nokia_s Reply re Motion to Compel Information for Remediation filed byNokia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. 1 to Koppelman Dec ISO Reply to Motion)(Related document(s) #3039 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3140) EXHIBITS re #2872 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 filed byNokia Corporation. (Related document(s) #2872 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3139) EXHIBITS re #2836 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNokia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #2836 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3138) EXHIBITS re #2558 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNokia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #21 Declaration Declaration of Koppelman)(Related document(s) #2558 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#3137) RESPONSE to #3113 Order Re Motions To Seal Directing Parties' to File Documents Publicly ; Public Version of Pease Ex. B - Dkt. No. #2395 by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Public Version of Pease Ex. C - Dkt. No. #2395 , #2 Exhibit Public Version of Pease Ex. F - Dkt. No. #2395 , #3 Exhibit Public Version of Korea Ex. 1 - Dkt. No. #2556 , #4 Exhibit Public Version of Korea Ex. 2 - Dkt. No. #2556 , #5 Exhibit Public Version of Korea Ex. 3 - Dkt. No. #2556 , #6 Exhibit Public Version of Becher Exs. C, F, N, O, P, Q, R, S, and X - Dkt. No. 2556-6, #7 Declaration Public Version of Camasasca Declaration - Dkt. No. 2556-18, #8 Declaration Public Version of Vanzetti Declaration - Dkt. No. 2556-19, #9 Declaration Public Version of McGowan Declaration - Dkt. No. 2556-21, #10 Declaration Public Version of Becher Declaration - Dkt. No. #2610 , #11 Declaration Public Version of Becher Declaration - Dkt. No. #2664 , #12 Public Version of Samsung's Notice Related to In Camera Submission - Dkt. No. 2664-3, #13 Exhibit Public Version of Becher Ex. 31 - Dkt. No. #2835 , #14 Exhibit Public Version of Becher Ex. 32 - Dkt. No. #2835 , #15 Exhibit Public Version of Becher Ex. 33 - Dkt. No. #2835 , #16 Declaration Public Version of Becher Declaration - Dkt. No. 2871-7, #17 Public Version of Samsung's Motion for Authorization - Dkt. No. 3037-3, #18 Public Version of Becher Declaration - Dkt. No. 3037-4, #19 Exhibit Public Version of Becher Ex. 1 - Dkt. No. 3037-5, #20 Exhibit Public Version of Becher Ex. 2 - Dkt. No. 3037-6)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/8/2014) Modified text on 7/14/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
  • 07/07/2014
  • (#3136) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Nokia Corporation. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 11/14/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
  • 07/07/2014
  • (#3135) MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 2935), Order Granting Motion for Sanctions re #2935 Order, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Becher in Support of Samsung's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 2935), Order Granting Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified text on 7/14/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/14/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
  • 07/07/2014
  • (#3134) MOTION for Relief from NonDispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 3117), Order Setting Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs re #3117 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Samsung's Motion for Relief from NonDispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 3117), Order Setting Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs, #2 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified text on 8/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/14/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.