Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 21:20:11 (UTC).

Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Afanasyev et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2012 Allstate Insurance Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Afanasyev. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Jack B. Weinstein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:12-CV-02423

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Jack B. Weinstein

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Yefim Klikshteyn

Igor Shturman

Boris Katz

Yury Groisman

Sofiya Kuperman

Ortho Products & Equipment, Inc.

Devonian, Inc.

Ivy Med Distributors Inc.

XVV, Inc.

Excell Plus, Inc.

Robert Finkelshteyn

Irina Pilyavsky

Arkadi Shapiro

Olma Medical Equipment, Inc.

ILya Mugerman

Riviera Wholesale, Inc.

Eduard Bodrunov

Medix Surgical Supply Inc.

Oksana Kovalenko

Millennium Supplies, Inc.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Igor Shturman

Boris Katz

Yury Groisman

Sofiya Kuperman

Ortho Products & Equipment, Inc.

Devonian, Inc.

Ivy Med Distributors Inc.

Excell Plus, Inc.

Robert Finkelshteyn

Irina Pilyavsky

Arkadi Shapiro

Olma Medical Equipment, Inc.

ILya Mugerman

Riviera Wholesale, Inc.

Eduard Bodrunov

Medix Surgical Supply Inc.

Oksana Kovalenko

Millennium Supplies, Inc.

219 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Alec Sauchik

Attorney at Sauchik Law Group, P.C.

6913 Eleventh Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11228

John N. Tasolides

Attorney at Law Offices of John N. Tasolides

6800 Jericho Turnpike, 110W

Syosset, NY 11791

Thomas Anthony Telesca

Attorney at Ruskin Moscou Faltischek PC

East Tower, 15Th Floor, 1425 Rexcorp Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Douglas M. Nadjari

Attorney at Ruskin Mouscou Faltischek, PC

1425 Rxr Plaza, East Tower, 15Th Floor

Uniondale, NY 11556

Laura Nazginov

Attorney at Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, PC

1425 Rxr Plaza, East Tower, 15 Fl, Ste A

Uniondale, NY 11556

Alden Banniettis

Attorney at Law Office of Alden Banniettis

2972 Avenue X

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Michael A. Zimmerman

Attorney at Zimmerman Law, PLLC

734 Walt Whitman Road, Suite 103

Melville, NY 11747

Daniel M Branower

Attorney at Law Office of Daniel Branower

61 Broadway, Suite 2780

New York, NY 10006

Howard B. Weber

61 Broadway, Suite 2780

New York, NY 10006

Dominick Daniel Gullo

Attorney at Law Offices of Dominick Gullo

8118 13Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11228

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Alden Banniettis

Attorney at Law Office of Alden Banniettis

2972 Avenue X

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Michael A. Zimmerman

Attorney at Zimmerman Law, PLLC

734 Walt Whitman Road, Suite 103

Melville, NY 11747

Howard B. Weber

61 Broadway, Suite 2780

New York, NY 10006

Other Attorneys

Tina R Karkera

Attorney at Stern & Montana, LLP

115 Broadway, Trnity Centre

New York, NY 10006

Benjamin Max Pinczewski

Attorney at PINCZEWSKI & SHPELFOGEL, P.C

2753 Coney Island Ave, 2Nd Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11235

David Wikstrom

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Robert A. Stern

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

120 Broadway, Suite 1010

New York, NY 10271

Dayna Rachel Cooper

Attorney at Sten & Montana LLP

One World Financial Center, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Sandra Patricia Burgos

Attorney at Stern & Montana, LLP

One World Financial Center, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Alex B Silverman

Attorney at Stern & Montana, LLP

One World Financial Center, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Mark L. Furman

Attorney at Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman,

630 Third Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel Scott Marvin

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

120 Broadway, Suite 1010

New York, NY 10271

Nicholas Paul Bowers

Attorney at Gary Tsirelman, P.C.

129 Livingston Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#541

(#541) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Solely as to Alex Pivenshteyn and D&R Medical Supply, Inc. Close the case. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/3/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#540

(#540) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Solely as to Gary Nabitovsky and Jesa Medical Supply, Inc. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 4/17/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#539

(#539) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Jesa Medical Supply and Pivenshteyn only by Allstate Insurance Company (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#538

(#538) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to D&R Medical Supply and Nabitovsky Only by Allstate Insurance Company (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#537

(#537) Order endorsed on #533 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Lioudmila Litvinova. Close the case as to Lioudmila Litvinova. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

#536

(#536) Order endorsed on #532 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Igor Ladanov. Close the case as to Igor Ladanov. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

#535

(#535) Order endorsed on #531 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Robert Finkelshteyn. Close the case as to Robert Finkelshteyn. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

#533

(#533) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casuality Insurance Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company Solely as to Defendant Lioudmila Litvinova (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

#532

(#536) Order endorsed on #532 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Igor Ladanov. Close the case as to Igor Ladanov. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action (including a jury or nonjury trial) and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if the parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

1 #6

Exhibit VOL. IV

1 #5

Exhibit VOL. III

1 #4

Exhibit VOL. II

1 #3

Exhibit VOL. I

1 #2

Appendix

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit VOL. I, #4 Exhibit VOL. II, #5 Exhibit VOL. III, #6 Exhibit VOL. IV) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

564 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#541) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Solely as to Alex Pivenshteyn and D&R Medical Supply, Inc. Close the case. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/3/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#540) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Solely as to Gary Nabitovsky and Jesa Medical Supply, Inc. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 4/17/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#539) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Jesa Medical Supply and Pivenshteyn only by Allstate Insurance Company (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#538) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to D&R Medical Supply and Nabitovsky Only by Allstate Insurance Company (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#537) Order endorsed on #533 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Lioudmila Litvinova. Close the case as to Lioudmila Litvinova. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#536) Order endorsed on #532 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Igor Ladanov. Close the case as to Igor Ladanov. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#535) Order endorsed on #531 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Solely as to Robert Finkelshteyn. Close the case as to Robert Finkelshteyn. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/5/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER re #534 . The parties are Ordered to meet and confer regarding the outstanding issues with respect to the Settlement Agreements and shall file a status report by 3/30/2018. If the parties have not resolved the issue by that time, the Court will schedule a conference at which all remaining parties and their counsel will be Ordered to appear in person. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/6/2018. (Blase, Brendan) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#534) STATUS REPORT by Allstate Insurance Company (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#533) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casuality Insurance Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company Solely as to Defendant Lioudmila Litvinova (Marvin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
541 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Alev Medical Supply, Inc.. (Banniettis, Alden) (Entered: 06/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alden Banniettis on behalf of Alev Medical Supply, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Banniettis, Alden) (Entered: 06/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Mega Supplies Billing, Inc.. (Banniettis, Alden) (Entered: 06/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alden Banniettis on behalf of Mega Supplies Billing, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Banniettis, Alden) (Entered: 06/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Memorandum dated 5/17/2012 from Senior Judge Jack B. Weinstein, directing Magistrate Judge Pollak to treat under Local RULE 72.2 and expedite. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action (including a jury or nonjury trial) and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if the parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653043925 (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit VOL. I, #4 Exhibit VOL. II, #5 Exhibit VOL. III, #6 Exhibit VOL. IV) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Max Pinczewski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Scott Marvin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Brian Silverman