This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 16:21:29 (UTC).

ABECASSIS et al v. OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2009 ABECASSIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OSCAR S WYATT, JR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:09-CV-03884

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Naftali Lanzkron

TZURIA AMOSI

Katerina Peline

CHAGAI AMAR

Rachel Glam

Yedidia Lanzkron

Meir Lanzkron

Tamar Levenson

Joseph Rubinoff

Gerald Markowitz

Shiran Zayat

Defendant

El Paso Energy Corporation

3Rd Party Defendants

Merial S.A.S.

AWB, Ltd.

Cilag (AG International)

SmithKline Beecham International

Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE

Ebewe Pharma Ges M.B.H.

Eli-Lilly Export S.A.

Vitol, S.A.

264 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dale Jefferson

Attorney at Martin Disiere et al

808 Travis Street, 20Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

David J. Dickens

Attorney at The Miller Firm LLC

108 Railroad Avenue

Orange, VA 22960

Gavriel Mairone

Attorney at MM-Law LLC

980 North Michigan Avenue, Ste 1400

Chicago, IL 60611

Defendant Attorneys

Robin Christopher Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns

1100 Louisiana, Suite 5300

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey C Kubin

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns LLP

1100 Louisiana, Ste 5300

Houston, TX 77002

William R Pakalka

Attorney at Fulbright & Jaworski LLP

1301 Mckinney St 5, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Steven Richard Selsberg

Attorney at Selsberg Law

3355 West Alabama, Suite 444

Houston, TX 77098

Other Attorneys

Ranah L. Esmaili

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Don Chapple Nelson

3355 W Alabama, Ste 1020

Houston, TX 77098

Gary W Davis, Jr

1250 Capital Of Texas Highway South, Building 3, Ste 400

Austin, TX 78746

Alex Benjamin Roberts

1221 Mckiinney St, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Robert Hickok

Lawrence Alan Lynn

Attorney at Coats Rose et al

Nine Greenway Plaza, Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77046

Danielle M. McLaughlin, Esq.

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

100 Summer St

Boston, MA 02110

Philip E Urofsky

Attorney at Shearman Sterling LLP

801 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2634

Thomas E. Lynch

Attorney at Jones Day

222 East 41St St.

New York, NY 10017

Francis I Spagnoletti

401 Louisiana St, 8Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher Henry Domingo

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Ave, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Robert Henry Ford

Attorney at Fogler Brar Ford O'Neil and Gray LLP

711 Louisiana St, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

Barak Bassman

75 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#562

561 #1

Proposed Order

#561

#560

559 #1

Exhibit A

#559

558 #1

Proposed Order

#558

557 #12

Proposed Order

557 #11

Exhibit K

557 #10

Exhibit J

557 #9

Exhibit I

557 #8

Exhibit H

557 #7

Exhibit G

557 #6

Exhibit F

557 #5

Exhibit E

557 #4

Exhibit D

557 #3

Exhibit C

1,194 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#562) ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING #561 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. Case terminated on 7/21/2016(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 07/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#561) Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dickens, David) (Entered: 07/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#560) ORDER Denying #557 Motion to Amend scheduling order.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 05/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#559) REPLY in Support of #557 MOTION to Amend #517 Scheduling Order,, filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickens, David) (Entered: 05/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#558) RESPONSE in Opposition to #557 MOTION to Amend #517 Scheduling Order,, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis) (Entered: 05/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#557) MOTION to Amend #517 Scheduling Order, by ODELIA ABECASSIS, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order)(Dickens, David) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#556) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by David J. Dickens for Transcript of Status conference on 9/17/2015. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Dickens, David) (Entered: 04/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#555) STATUS REPORT by ODELIA ABECASSIS, filed.(Dickens, David) (Entered: 04/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#554) Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 4/1/2016 re: #551 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 16-20139. Under Fed R. APP. P. 42(b), the appeal is dismissed as of April 1, 2016, pursuant to appellants' unopposed motion, filed.(scastillo, 1) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#553) DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by El Paso Energy Corporation/Ashley M. Kleber. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Hearing 01/21/10. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner. This order form relates to the following: #119 Transcript, #551 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed. (Kleber, Ashley) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
582 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BAYOIL (USA),INC. served on 1/22/2009, answer due 2/11/2009 (tr) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect BAYOIL (USA),INC. as the correct defendant in this case (jeb, ). (Entered: 02/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, defendant El Paso's answer is due April 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 10, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 02/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline M. Mew on behalf of EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Mew, Caroline) (Entered: 02/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (McNabb, Stephen) (Entered: 02/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen) (Entered: 02/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • (#4) NOTICE of filing of Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 01/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • Summons Issued(7) as to OSCAR S. WYATT, JR, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION, BAYOIL (USA),INC., INC., DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR, BAYOIL SUPPLY & TRADING LIMITED. (tr) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect BAYOIL (USA),INC. as the correct defendant in this case (jeb, ). (Entered: 01/05/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against OSCAR S. WYATT, JR, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION,BAYOIL (USA),INC.,DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR, BAYOIL SUPPLY & TRADING LIMITED ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616017339) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tr) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect BAYOIL (USA),INC. as the correct defendant in this case (jeb, ). (Entered: 01/05/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/2/2009. (tr)(See Order for full details) (Entered: 01/05/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tr) (Entered: 01/05/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SmithKline Beecham Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Henry Ford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis I Spagnoletti