This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2022 at 07:18:35 (UTC).

Zaremba v. Franklin et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2006 Zaremba filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Franklin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:06-CV-07088

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas S. Zaremba

Defendants

Robert Franklin

John Ayling

Glenn Fausz

Robert Gioia

Thomas Losby

Thomas Williams

John Doe(s)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin J. Osterkamp

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress

12Th Floor, 155 East Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Patricia B. Fugee

Attorney at FisherBroyles - Perrysburg

27100 Oakmead Drive

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr.

Attorney at FisherBroyles - Toledo

6800 West Central Avenue

Toledo, OH 43617

Bruce R. Schrader, II

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress - Akron

222 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Defendant Attorneys

Steven J. Miller

Attorney at Buckley King - Cleveland

1400 Fifth Third Center, 600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Deborah J. Michelson

Attorney at Buckley King - Cleveland

600 Superior Avenue East

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kurt J. Lindower

Attorney at Zippo Manufacturing

33 Barbour Street

Bradford, PA 16701

Thomas J. Schank

Attorney at Hunter & Schank

One Canton Square, 1700 Canton Avenue

Toledo, OH 43624

R. Jeffrey Lydy

Attorney at Lydy & Moan

4930 Holland-Sylvania Road

Sylvania, OH 43560

David C. Newcomer

Attorney at Newcomer, Shaffer, Spangler & Breininger

117 West Maple Street

Bryan, OH 43506

Jeffrey A. Baddeley

Attorney at Buckley King - Cleveland

1400 Fifth Third Center, 600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Terry M. Brennan

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#61

(#61) Order granting (re #59 ) Motion to dismiss (Voluntary) Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2). Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/21/12. (C,D) (Entered: 02/21/2012)

#60

(#60) Response to #59 Motion to dismiss (Voluntary) Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) filed by Robert Franklin. (Michelson, Deborah) (Entered: 02/15/2012)

59 #2

Proposed Order

59 #1

Exhibit Bankruptcy Court's Order

59 #59

Main Document

#58

(#58) Attorney Appearance and Request for Service by Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. filed by on behalf of Thomas S. Zaremba. (Calamunci, Sr., Anthony) (Entered: 06/16/2009)

#57

(#57) Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Thomas S. Zaremba. (Becker, John) (Entered: 06/12/2009)

#56

(#56) Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Thomas S. Zaremba. (Fugee, Patricia) (Entered: 07/16/2008)

#55

(#55) Attorney Appearance and Request for Service by John W. Becker filed by on behalf of Thomas S. Zaremba. (Becker, John) (Entered: 07/15/2008)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed upon Thomas Williams by certified mail on 9/14/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/19/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed upon Thomas Losby by certified mail on 9/13/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/14/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed upon Robert Gioia by certified mail on 9/13/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/14/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

2 #1

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Mics Case Docket Sheet

1 #1

Bankruptcy Docket Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Order granting (re #59 ) Motion to dismiss (Voluntary) Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2). Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/21/12. (C,D) (Entered: 02/21/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Response to #59 Motion to dismiss (Voluntary) Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) filed by Robert Franklin. (Michelson, Deborah) (Entered: 02/15/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Motion to dismiss (Voluntary) Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiff Thomas S. Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court's Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Fugee, Patricia) (Entered: 02/15/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Attorney Appearance and Request for Service by Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. filed by on behalf of Thomas S. Zaremba. (Calamunci, Sr., Anthony) (Entered: 06/16/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Thomas S. Zaremba. (Becker, John) (Entered: 06/12/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Thomas S. Zaremba. (Fugee, Patricia) (Entered: 07/16/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Attorney Appearance and Request for Service by John W. Becker filed by on behalf of Thomas S. Zaremba. (Becker, John) (Entered: 07/15/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Attorney Appearance by Bruce R. Schrader, II filed by on behalf of Thomas S. Zaremba. (Schrader, Bruce) (Entered: 07/14/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MARGINAL ENTRY ORDER granting Motion to substitute attorney R. Jeffrey Lydy for attorney Richard J. Szczepaniak. (Related Doc #52 ). Signed byJudge Jack Zouhary on 10/22/07.(B,CJ) (Entered: 10/22/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Motion to substitute attorney R. Jeffrey Lydy in place of attorney Richard Szczepaniak filed by Robert Gioia. (Lydy, R.) (Entered: 10/19/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed upon Robert Franklin by certified mail on 9/12/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 10/19/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed upon John Ayling by certified mail on 9/12/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 10/19/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) Modified on 4/4/2006 (G, D). (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed upon Glenn Fausz by certified mail on 9/12/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 10/19/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #2 ) filed by Dennis Kowalski. (Maloney, William) (USBC 10/5/05) (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed upon Dennis Kowalski by certified mail on 9/21/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/22/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed upon Thomas Williams by certified mail on 9/14/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/19/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed upon Thomas Losby by certified mail on 9/13/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/14/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service Executed upon Robert Gioia by certified mail on 9/13/05 filed by Thomas S. Zaremba (USBC 9/14/05) Related document(s) #2 . (G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 454 (Recover Money/Property) Complaint against Glenn Fausz, Robert Gioia, Dennis Kowalski, Thomas Losby, Thomas Williams, John Doe(s), Robert Franklin, John Ayling. Filed by Thomas S. Zaremba. (Fugee, Patricia) (USBC 8/24/05) (Attachments: #1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet)(G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Order granting withdrawal of reference on 3:06MC7006. Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 3/16/06. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet#2 Mics Case Docket Sheet#3 Civil Cover Sheet)(G, D) (Entered: 03/20/2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J. Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry M. Brennan