Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 06:39:01 (UTC).

West Coast Home Builders, Inc. v. Aventis Cropscience USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2004 West Coast Home Builders, Inc filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Aventis Cropscience USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Illston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:04-CV-02225

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Defendants and Counter Claimants

E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company

General Motors Corporation

USX Corporation

Triangle Wire & Cable, Inc.

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Hewlett-Packard Company

Occidental Chemical Corporation

Ashland, Inc.

PACCAR Inc.

Crompton Corporation

United States of America

Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc.

Hexcel Corporation

Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc.

Rheem Manufacturing Company

Great Western Chemical Company

Raychem Corporation

Aventis Cropscience USA Inc.

Nestle USA, Inc.

United States Department of Defense

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Clifton John McFarland

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Janlynn Robinson Fleener

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814-4686

Daniel Pierre Muino

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Denise G. Fellers

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Andrew L. Collier

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Gregory Thomas Broderick

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Jennifer Scheller Neumann

Attorney at US Dep't of Justice - ENRD

P.O. Box 23795 L'Enfant Station

Washington, DC 20026-3795

Leslie M. Hill

Attorney at Environment & Natural Resources Division

601 D Street, N.W., Suite 8000

Washington, DC 20004

Rochelle Leigh Russell

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

301 Howard Street, Suite 1050

San Francisco, CA 94105

Pamela S. Tonglao

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Other Attorneys

Ruth Ann Castro

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Peter Wells McGaw

Attorney at Archer Norris

2033 North Main St., Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

John Warren Rissier,

Attorney at Bingham McCutchen

355 So. Grand Avenue, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Lauchlan Kortum

Attorney at Severson & WErson

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Lee A. Archer

Attorney at Archer Norris

2033 North Main St., Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

James H. Colopy

Attorney at Farella Braun and Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Monali Subhash Sheth

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Andrew Wood Ingersoll

Attorney at Department of Justice

P.O. Box 23986

Washington, DC 20026-3986

Paul Pickering Spaulding, III

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#128

No Description Available

#127

No Description Available

#113

No Description Available

#103

No Description Available

#101

No Description Available

#93

No Description Available

#83

No Description Available

#75

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

#300

No Description Available

259 #3

Exhibits 14-15

#254

No Description Available

239 #1

Exhibit A-1

230 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 3

#218

No Description Available

193 #2

Exhibit

192 #5

Exhibit

#56

No Description Available

550 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#328) CORRECTED CLOSING ORDER with prejudice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#327) ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#326) ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • ***Deadlines terminated. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#325) STIPULATION for Order by Mary Grace Prewett Bertsch, Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Chemical & Pigment Co., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cooper Industries, Inc., Crompton Corporation, Crown Beverage Packaging, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Faichild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation of California, GBF Holdings LLC, Gaylord Container Corporation, Great Western Chemical Company, Hewlett Packard Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Nestle USA, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ocean View Capital, Inc., PACCAR Inc., Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc., Quebecor Printing San Jose, Inc., Raychem Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Shuller International, Inc., TRC Companies, Inc., USX Corporation, Union Oil Company of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement)(McFarland, Clifton) (Filed on 3/24/2010) (Entered: 03/24/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#324) Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/19/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 3/24/2010). ORDERED AFTER HEARING: The parties shall file the motion for good faith settlement by March 25, 2010. The trial schedule is vacated. Once the motion for settlement is filed, the Court will issue a 90 day conditional dismissal. () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2010) (Entered: 03/24/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#323) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by West Coast Home Builders, Inc.. (Colopy, James) (Filed on 3/16/2010) (Entered: 03/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#322) STATUS REPORT on Settlement Agreement by Ashland, Inc., Aventis Cropscience USA Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Mary Grace Prewett Bertsch, Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cooper Industries, Inc., Crompton Corporation, Crown Beverage Packaging, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Faichild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation of California, GBF Holdings LLC, Gaylord Container Corporation, Great Western Chemical Company, Hewlett Packard Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Nestle USA, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ocean View Capital, Inc., PACCAR Inc., Harold William Prewett, Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc., Quebecor Printing San Jose, Inc., Raychem Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Shuller International, Inc., Henry Simonsen, TRC Companies, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (McFarland, Clifton) (Filed on 3/15/2010) (Entered: 03/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 7/9/2010 08:30 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) (Entered: 03/11/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#321) Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 3/10/2010). Defense counsel shall provide to plaintiff all outstanding signatures to the settlement agreement by 3/12/10. If the signatures are not produced, all corporate representatives must appear in court on March 19, 2010 at 3:0 p.m. for a further status conference with the Court. () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2010) (Entered: 03/10/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
341 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RELATING CASES (96-3147, 01-4029, 04-2648). Signed by Judge Illston on 7/16/04. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2004) (Entered: 07/19/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2004 02:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2004) (Entered: 07/06/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE setting initial case management conference to occur on 10/22/04 @ 2 p.m. (Attachments: #1) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2004) (Entered: 07/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2004
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Case: 04-2648-WDB, 04-2225-SI, 01-4029-SI, 96-3147-SI by SPPI Somersville, Inc., Somersville-Gentry, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2004) (Entered: 07/09/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER RELATING CASE to C-96-3147 and C01-4029. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Illston on 6/21/04. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2004) (Entered: 06/24/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2004
  • CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004) (Entered: 06/10/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2004
  • Summons Issued as to Aventis Cropscience USA Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Mary Grace Prewett Bertsch, Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Chemical & Pigment Co., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cooper Industries, Inc., Crompton Corporation, Crown Beverage Packaging, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Faichild Semiconductor Corporation, Fibreboard Corporation, GBF Holdings LLC, Gaylord Container Corporation, General Motors Corporation, Great Western Chemical Company, Hewlett Packard Company, Hexcel Corporation, IT Corporation, J&G Disposal, Laidlaw Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Nestle USA, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ocean View Capital, Inc., PACCAR Inc., Pacifica Gas And Electric Company, Phillips Petroleum Company, Harold William Prewett, Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc., Quebecor Printing San Jose, Inc., Raychem Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Shell Oil Company, Shuller International, Inc., Henry Simonsen, TRC Companies, Inc., Texaco, Inc., The Pillsbury Company, Triangle Wire & Cable, Inc., USX Corporation, Union Oil Company of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company, United States Air Force, United States Army, United States Navy, United States of America. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004) (Entered: 06/10/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2004
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Case C01-4029 SI& C96-3147 SI filed by plaintiff (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004) (Entered: 06/10/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2004. Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2004 04:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004) (Entered: 06/10/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF RESPONSE; Jury Trial Demanded against Aventis Cropscience USA Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Mary Grace Prewett Bertsch, Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Chemical & Pigment Co., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cooper Industries, Inc., Crompton Corporation, Crown Beverage Packaging, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Faichild Semiconductor Corporation, Fibreboard Corporation, GBF Holdings LLC, Gaylord Container Corporation, General Motors Corporation, Great Western Chemical Company, Hewlett Packard Company, Hexcel Corporation, IT Corporation, J&G Disposal, Laidlaw Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Nestle USA, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ocean View Capital, Inc., PACCAR Inc., Pacifica Gas And Electric Company, Phillips Petroleum Company, Harold William Prewett, Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc., Quebecor Printing San Jose, Inc., Raychem Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Shell Oil Company, Shuller International, Inc., Henry Simonsen, TRC Companies, Inc., Texaco, Inc., The Pillsbury Company, Triangle Wire & Cable, Inc., USX Corporation, Union Oil Company of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company, United States Air Force, United States Army, United States Navy, United States of America (Filing fee $ 150.00.). Filed by West Coast Home Builders, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BOEING SATELLITE SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc is a litigant