Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/29/2021 at 19:20:41 (UTC).

Weiss et al v. Arab Bank, PLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2006 Weiss filed an Other lawsuit against Arab Bank, PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:06-CV-01623

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Plaintiffs

Amichai Lev

Mark Robinson

Shimon Lev

Aynat Schur

Arye Weiss

Ayelet Weiss

Pnina Weiss

Dagan Robinson

Reena Robinson

Liron Lahav

Talia Weiss

David Lahav

Gitit Lev

Itai Robinson

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

Arab Bank, PLC

3Rd Party Defendants and Interested Parties

Mercantile Discount Bank Ltd.

Israel Discount Bank of New York

Bank Hapoalim

ABC Banks 1-20

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark S Werbner

Attorney at Sayles Werbner

1201 Elm Street, 4400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

Joel Lawrence Israel

Attorney at Sayles Werbner

1201 Elm Street, 4400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

John M. Eubanks

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Blvd, Po Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29465

Brian Thomas Frutig

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, Po Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

James P. Bonner

Attorney at Stone Bonner & Rocco LLP

260 Madison Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Walsh

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

David Grant Hille

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Steven J. Young

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Christopher Mark Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 Thirteenth Street

Washington, DC 20005

Nicole Erb

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 Thirteenth Street

Washington, DC 20005

Gregory Gene Little

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Harvey Kurzweil

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

3Rd Party Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Narges Maneck Kakalia

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo P.C.

666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Jennifer R. Cowan

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Matthew E. Fishbein

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Peter Adam Chavkin

Attorney at Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.

666 Third Avenue, The Chrysler Center, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10018

Jay Cohen

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rickind, Wharten & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Thomas Goldstein

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Ave, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

 

Court Documents

#1116

(#1116) Letter dated 3/13/19 from Alan Kolold, having been retained as counsel for Jackob Raz, a lawyer practicing in Israel regarding legal fees; requesting a conference so that we can determine whether the filing of a formal motion is required. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#1115

(#1115) Letter from Jonathan D. Siegfried to Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding filing of Rule 41 stipulation by Arab Bank, PLC Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-05449-BMC-PK et al. (Siegfried, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

1114 #1

Proposed Order

1114 #1555

(#1114) Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding Defendant's April 10, 2018 letter by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

#1113

RESTRICTED

#1111

(#1111) Letter to Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding Scheduling Conference by Arab Bank, PLC Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Siegfried, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

#1110

(#1110) Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding Defendant's March 23, 2018 letter by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

5 #2

Letter from Ron Zdrojeski to The Honorable Viktor Pohorelsky regarding Arab Ban

#5

(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order & Letter from Ron Zdrojeski to The Honorable Viktor Pohorelsky regarding Arab Bank, plc's Proposals Concerning Foreign Depositions by Arab Bank, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Ron Zdrojeski to The Honorable Viktor Pohorelsky regarding Arab Bank, plc's Proposals Concerning Foreign Depositions)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

#4

(#4) ORDER re #172 Letter, filed by Courtney Linde, et al. (Plaintiffs),, #171 Letter, filed by Arab Bank, PLC. The parties' proposed briefing schedule is approved. (Signed by Judge Nina Gershon on 04/14/06). Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Coward, Nicole) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

3 #2

Stipulation to Adjourn Defendant's Time to Respond to or Answer Complaint

#3

ORDER re #3 Stipulation filed by Arab Bank, PLC, by electronic endorsement: So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 4/14/2006. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

#2

(#2) Notice of Related Case Assignment (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/10/2006)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arab Bank, PLC $ 250, filed by Talia Weiss, Eli Weiss, David Lahav, Yehudit Lahav, Netta Lahav, Yael Lahav, Liron Lahav, Mark Robinson, Reena Robinson, Yardena Robinson, Dagan Robinson, Itai Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Arye Weiss, Shimon Lev, Noa Lev, Aynat Schur, Nadav Lev, Amichai Lev, Yael Gat, Gitit Lev, Stewart Weiss, Susan Weiss, Yedidya Weiss, Ayelet Weiss, Pnina Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/10/2006)

#250

(#4) ORDER re #172 Letter, filed by Courtney Linde, et al. (Plaintiffs),, #171 Letter, filed by Arab Bank, PLC. The parties' proposed briefing schedule is approved. (Signed by Judge Nina Gershon on 04/14/06). Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Coward, Nicole) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

#249

(#4) ORDER re #172 Letter, filed by Courtney Linde, et al. (Plaintiffs),, #171 Letter, filed by Arab Bank, PLC. The parties' proposed briefing schedule is approved. (Signed by Judge Nina Gershon on 04/14/06). Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Coward, Nicole) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

2,595 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketORDER re: 1576 in 1:04-cv-02799. There is no need for a conference. Mr. Raz does not need to know the amount of the total fees to prove his entitlement to a specific share, whether computed on a percentage or quantum meruit basis. He may file his motion to prove entitlement and the Court will resolve it. We will worry about how much if he prevails in demonstrating entitlement. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/27/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1116) Letter dated 3/13/19 from Alan Kolold, having been retained as counsel for Jackob Raz, a lawyer practicing in Israel regarding legal fees; requesting a conference so that we can determine whether the filing of a formal motion is required. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1115) Letter from Jonathan D. Siegfried to Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding filing of Rule 41 stipulation by Arab Bank, PLC Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-05449-BMC-PK et al. (Siegfried, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1114) Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding Defendant's April 10, 2018 letter by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1113) Letter from Jonathan D. Siegfried to Hon. Brian M. Cogan by Arab Bank, PLC Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Siegfried, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1112) Letter from Jonathan Siegfried to Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding the April 5, 2018 Conference by Arab Bank, PLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Siegfried, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Entry and Order for Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/5/2018. Counsel for both sides appeared telephonically. The parties are to file their settlement agreement under seal. (Court Reporter David Roy.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1111) Letter to Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding Scheduling Conference by Arab Bank, PLC Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Siegfried, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1110) Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Brian M. Cogan regarding Defendant's March 23, 2018 letter by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK et al. (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,249 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter to the Honorable Viktor V. Pohorelsky on behalf of all Plaintiffs in response to Defendant's proposal for the taking of foreign depositions by Courtney Linde, et al. (Plaintiffs). Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Elsner, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter to Honorable Viktor V. Pohorelsky from R. Zdrojeski regarding Arab Bank plc's Proposals Concerning Foreign Depositions by Arab Bank, PLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 04/17/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter to Magistrate Pohorelsky re Foreign Depositions by Adam Averbach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order re Foreign Depositions)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Bonner, James) (Entered: 04/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Scheduling Order & Letter from Ron Zdrojeski to The Honorable Viktor Pohorelsky regarding Arab Bank, plc's Proposals Concerning Foreign Depositions by Arab Bank, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Ron Zdrojeski to The Honorable Viktor Pohorelsky regarding Arab Bank, plc's Proposals Concerning Foreign Depositions)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re #172 Letter, filed by Courtney Linde, et al. (Plaintiffs),, #171 Letter, filed by Arab Bank, PLC. The parties' proposed briefing schedule is approved. (Signed by Judge Nina Gershon on 04/14/06). Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05449-NG-VVP,1:04-cv-05564-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-00365-NG-VVP, 1:05-cv-00388-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03183-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-03738-NG-VVP,1:05-cv-05518-NG-VVP, 1:06-cv-01623-NG-VVP(Coward, Nicole) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER re #3 Stipulation filed by Arab Bank, PLC, by electronic endorsement: So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 4/14/2006. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) (Entered: 04/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION & Letter from R. Zdrojeski to Honorable Judge N. Gershon regarding attached stipulation by Arab Bank, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Adjourn Defendant's Time to Respond to or Answer Complaint)(Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Related Case Assignment (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/10/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • Summons Issued as to Arab Bank, PLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/10/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Arab Bank, PLC $ 250, filed by Talia Weiss, Eli Weiss, David Lahav, Yehudit Lahav, Netta Lahav, Yael Lahav, Liron Lahav, Mark Robinson, Reena Robinson, Yardena Robinson, Dagan Robinson, Itai Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Arye Weiss, Shimon Lev, Noa Lev, Aynat Schur, Nadav Lev, Amichai Lev, Yael Gat, Gitit Lev, Stewart Weiss, Susan Weiss, Yedidya Weiss, Ayelet Weiss, Pnina Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/10/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercantile Discount Bank Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arab Bank, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Israel Discount Bank of New York is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank Hapoalim B.M. is a litigant