Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2017 at 07:37:36 (UTC).

United States of America ex rel v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2006 United States of America ex rel filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:06-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2006

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Victor E. Bibby

Brian J. Donnelly

United States of America Ex Rel

Defendants

Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP

Mortgage Investors Corporation (Ohio)

Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.)

ABN Amro Mortgage Group, Inc.

Alta Financial Corporation

American Home Mortage Corp.

American Home Mortgage Corp (New York)

BB&T Corp.,

BSM Finanical, L.P.,

Bank of America Corporation

Bank of America, N.A.

CMS Mortgage Group Inc.,

Cendant Mortgage

Chase Manhattan Mortage Corporation

Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corp.

Citimortgage Inc.,

Commonwealth United Mortgage

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tyrone M. Bridges

Attorney at Wilbanks & Gouinlock

3414 Peachtree Road Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

Anna White Howard

Attorney at Butler, Wooten & Fryhofer, LLP

2719 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Leigh M May

Attorney at Butler, Wooten & Peak, LLP

2719 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Timothy P. McCormack

Attorney at Phillips & Cohen, LLP

2000 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Brandon L. Peak

Attorney at Butler, Wooten & Peak, LLP - C.GA

P.O. Box 2766, 105 13Th Street

Columbus, GA 31902

Marlan Bradley Wilbanks

Attorney at Wilbanks & Gouinlock

3414 Peachtree Road Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

Joseph Marshall Colwell

Attorney at Butler, Wooten, Fryhofer, LLP

P.O. Box 2766, 105 Thirteenth Street

Columbus, GA 31902

Samantha DiPolito

Attorney at Gilbert, Harrell, Sumerford & Martin

777 Gloucester St.

Brunswick, GA 31520

Mary Louise Cohen

Attorney at Phillips & Cohen, LLP

2000 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

James Edward Butler, Jr.

Attorney at Butler, Wooten & Peak, LLP

2719 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Laura Kennedy Bonander

Attorney at U.S. Attorneys Office-ATL

600 Richard Russell Building, 75 Spring Street, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Daniel A. Caldwell, III

Attorney at Daniel A. Caldwell, Attorney at Law

1210 Newbridge Trace Ne

Atlanta, GA 30319

Amy L. Berne

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

75 Spring Street, S.W., 600 United States Courthouse

Atlanta, GA 30303

Paris A. Wynn

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-ATL

600 U.S. Courthouse, 75 Spring Street, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Robert Rosenkoff

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

David M. Souders

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 Nineteenth Street, N.W., Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20036-1609

Michael Y. Kieval

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 Nineteenth Street, N.W., Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20036-1609

Mitchel H. Kider

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 Nineteenth Street, N.W., Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20036-1609

Scott D. Burke

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 Nineteenth Street, N.W., Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20036-1609

Charles T. Huddleston

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP-ATL

201 17Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

48 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1331

(#1331) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Robert N. Dokson. (Dokson, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

#1330

(#1330) ORDER approving #1327 Motion for Attorney Fees. The payments should be made no later than 20 calendar days from the date of entry of this order. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/21/17. (jpa) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

#1329

(#1329) ORDER approving #1323 Motion for Attorney Fees. The payments should be made no later than 20 days from the date of the entry of this order. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/21/17. (jpa) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

#1327

(#1327) Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 20 by Robert N. Dokson. (Dokson, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2017)

#1326

RESTRICTED

#1325

(#1325) ORDER APPROVING #1316 Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 18. The Relators collectively, Wells Fargo, and Defendants MIC and Edwards collectively are instructed to pay promptly to the Special Master the following sums: Relators - $4,410.00; Wells Fargo - $360.00; and MIC/Edwards - $4,185.00. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 05/05/2017)

#1324

(#1324) ORDER ADVISING the parties that this case will remain on the August 2017 trial calendar despite the number of outstanding motions. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/3/17. (jpa) (Entered: 05/04/2017)

#1323

Submission of #1323 Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 19, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) (Entered: 05/23/2017)

#1316

(#1325) ORDER APPROVING #1316 Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 18. The Relators collectively, Wells Fargo, and Defendants MIC and Edwards collectively are instructed to pay promptly to the Special Master the following sums: Relators - $4,410.00; Wells Fargo - $360.00; and MIC/Edwards - $4,185.00. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 05/05/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 548363.), filed by Victor E. Bibby, Brian R. Donnelly.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (kdw). (Entered: 03/10/2006)

#31

(#31) AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Victor E. Bibby, Brian R. Donnelly.(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/17/2009)

54 #2

Exhibit B

54 #1

Exhibit A

#54

Notification of Docket Correction. Corrected lead counsel; added and terminated parties re #54 Second Amended Complaint. (dfb) (Entered: 10/05/2011)

#59

(#59) NOTICE by United States of America that it is not intervening at this time. (rej) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

#61

Clerks Certificate of Mailing re #61 Order sent to all counsel of record. (rej) (Entered: 10/04/2011)

#62

(#62) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Citimortgage Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., First Tennessee Bank National Association (Inc.), GMAC Mortgage Corporation, Irwin Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Investors Corporation (Ohio), New Freedom Mortgage Corporation, PNC Bank, National Association, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (rej) (Entered: 10/05/2011)

#63

(#63) Return of Service Executed by Brian J. Donnelly, Victor E. Bibby. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) served on 10/5/2011, answer due 10/26/2011. (Butler, James) (Entered: 10/05/2011)

2,815 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1331) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Robert N. Dokson. (Dokson, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1330) ORDER approving #1327 Motion for Attorney Fees. The payments should be made no later than 20 calendar days from the date of entry of this order. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/21/17. (jpa) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1329) ORDER approving #1323 Motion for Attorney Fees. The payments should be made no later than 20 days from the date of the entry of this order. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/21/17. (jpa) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1327 Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 20, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • (#1328) TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 5/1/2017, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw) (Entered: 06/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1327) Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 20 by Robert N. Dokson. (Dokson, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1326) (FILED UNDER SEAL) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 5/25/2017. (Court Reporter: Shannon Welch)(dfb) (Entered: 05/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1323 Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 19, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) (Entered: 05/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1325) ORDER APPROVING #1316 Special Master's Request for Compensation No. 18. The Relators collectively, Wells Fargo, and Defendants MIC and Edwards collectively are instructed to pay promptly to the Special Master the following sums: Relators - $4,410.00; Wells Fargo - $360.00; and MIC/Edwards - $4,185.00. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 05/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1324) ORDER ADVISING the parties that this case will remain on the August 2017 trial calendar despite the number of outstanding motions. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/3/17. (jpa) (Entered: 05/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,413 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Return of Service Executed by Brian J. Donnelly, Victor E. Bibby. Bank of America Corporation served on 10/6/2011, answer due 10/27/2011. (Butler, James) (Entered: 10/06/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Return of Service Executed by Brian J. Donnelly, Victor E. Bibby. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) served on 10/5/2011, answer due 10/26/2011. (Butler, James) (Entered: 10/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Citimortgage Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., First Tennessee Bank National Association (Inc.), GMAC Mortgage Corporation, Irwin Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Investors Corporation (Ohio), New Freedom Mortgage Corporation, PNC Bank, National Association, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (rej) (Entered: 10/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notification of Docket Correction. Corrected lead counsel; added and terminated parties re #54 Second Amended Complaint. (dfb) (Entered: 10/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Certificate of Mailing re #61 Order sent to all counsel of record. (rej) (Entered: 10/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER Unsealing Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint filed by relators Victor E. Bibby and Brian J. Donnelly be unsealed. All other contents of the Court's file in this action shall remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendants, with the exceptions of this Order and the Notice of the United States That It Is Not Intervening At This Time. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 10/3/2011. (rej) Modified on 10/4/2011 to add text to docket (fap). (Entered: 10/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) NOTICE by United States of America that it is not intervening at this time. (rej) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America Ex Rel, Brian R. Donnelly, Victor E. Bibby. (Attachments:#(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B)(hfm) (Entered: 08/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Victor E. Bibby, Brian R. Donnelly.(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 548363.), filed by Victor E. Bibby, Brian R. Donnelly.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (kdw). (Entered: 03/10/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGE INVESTORS CORPORATION ANF is a litigant

Latest cases where CHASE MANHATTAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BB & T BANK 21657 is a litigant