Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2019 at 22:36:05 (UTC).

United States of America et al v. J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2006 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:06-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Commonwealth of Virgina

State of Tennessee

State of Delaware

The Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Intervenor Plaintiffs

City of Vallejo

Valley Center Municipal Water District

City of Santa Rosa

Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District

Town of Yountville

Dublin San Ramon Services District

City of Colton

City of Chino

Paradise Irrigation District

Castaic Lake Water Agency

Alameda County Water District

CITY OF SACRAMENTO

Sweetwater Authority

Palmdale Water District

City of San Bernardino, -

Intervenor

City of Pomona

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Intervenor Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

Morris Alexander Bowie, II

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

7 Times Square 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Anna K Milunas

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stuart M Rennert

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

1999 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1011

David W S Lieberman

Attorney at Powderhouse Law LLC

24 Powder House Terr

Somerville, MA 02144

Kirk D Dillman

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan PC

300 South Grand Ave., Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Susan K Stewart

Attorney at Office of the Nevada Attorney General

100 North Carson Street

Carson City, NV 89701-4717

Mary A Inman

Attorney at Phillips and Cohen LLP

100 The Embarcadero Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Harry P Litman

Attorney at Phillips and Cohen LLP

100 The Embarcadero Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Diane Catran Roth

Attorney at San Bernardino City Attorney Office

300 North D Street Room 668

San Bernardino, CA 92418

Other Attorneys

Frederick W Acker

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Howard F Daniels

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Nicklas Arnold Akers

Attorney at CAAG - Attorney General Office

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Mary E Coburn

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

655 West Broadway 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Jeffrey Robert Cox

Attorney at Jeffrey R. Cox

302 West Washington Street 5Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

David M Bernick

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton and Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Jennifer A Short

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

1600 Tysons Boulevard Suite 700

Mclean, VA 22102-4867

Paul Frederick Prather

Attorney at Office of the San Diego City Attorney

1200 Third Avenue Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Russell Hayman

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Vince L Farhat

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

400 South Hope Street, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Sheryl L Schaffner

Attorney at Midpeninsula Regional Open Space District

330 Distel Circle

Los Altos, CA 94022

86 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2875

(#2875) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul S Chan counsel for Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. Neil P. Kelly is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Chan, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#2874

(#2874) NOTICE of Designation of Lead Attorney Claire Hervey Collins for Intervenor-Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District filed by Intervenor-Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District. (Beckwith, Jessica) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#2873

(#2873) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jessica Lienau Beckwith counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District. Changing Address to 633 W. 5th Street, Suite 4000, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing Email to Jessica.Beckwith@lewisbrisbois.com. Filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District. (Beckwith, Jessica) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#2871

(#2871) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/14/18 11:06 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2868

(#2868) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/08/18 11:10 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2867

(#2867) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/07/18 8:17 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2866

(#2866) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/06/18 8:31 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2865

(#2872) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/01/18 10:56 am; 11/02/18 1:40 pm; 11/05/18 10:27 am; 11/06/18 8:31 am; 11/07/18 8:17 am; 11/08/18 11:10 am; 11/09/18 10:45 am; 11/13/18 8:17 am; 11/14/18 11:06 am re Transcript #2870 , #2869 , #2865 , #2868 , #2867 , #2871 , #2863 , #2866 , #2864 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2864

(#2872) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/01/18 10:56 am; 11/02/18 1:40 pm; 11/05/18 10:27 am; 11/06/18 8:31 am; 11/07/18 8:17 am; 11/08/18 11:10 am; 11/09/18 10:45 am; 11/13/18 8:17 am; 11/14/18 11:06 am re Transcript #2870 , #2869 , #2865 , #2868 , #2867 , #2871 , #2863 , #2866 , #2864 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/26/2019)

1 #8

*Restricted*

1 #8

Part 8

1 #7

Part 7

1 #6

Part 6

1 #5

Part 5

1 #4

Part 4

1 #3

Part 3

1 #2

Part 2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Seal A.(Filing fee $ 250) Jury demanded. , filed by plaintiffs Seal 4, Seal 5, Seal 6, Seal 7, Seal 8, Seal 1, Seal 2, Seal 3.(mrgo, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2010: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8) (mat). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2015: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lmh). (Entered: 01/20/2006)

5,329 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2875) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul S Chan counsel for Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. Neil P. Kelly is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Chan, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2874) NOTICE of Designation of Lead Attorney Claire Hervey Collins for Intervenor-Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District filed by Intervenor-Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District. (Beckwith, Jessica) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2873) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jessica Lienau Beckwith counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District. Changing Address to 633 W. 5th Street, Suite 4000, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing Email to Jessica.Beckwith@lewisbrisbois.com. Filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Irvine Ranch Water District. (Beckwith, Jessica) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2872) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/01/18 10:56 am; 11/02/18 1:40 pm; 11/05/18 10:27 am; 11/06/18 8:31 am; 11/07/18 8:17 am; 11/08/18 11:10 am; 11/09/18 10:45 am; 11/13/18 8:17 am; 11/14/18 11:06 am re Transcript #2870 , #2869 , #2865 , #2868 , #2867 , #2871 , #2863 , #2866 , #2864 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2871) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/14/18 11:06 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2870) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/13/18 8:17 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2869) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/09/18 10:45 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2868) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/08/18 11:10 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2867) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/07/18 8:17 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2866) PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/06/18 8:31 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2,783 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District's Notice of Election to Intervene. (mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) City of Coachella's Notice of Election to Intervene. (mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) City of Woodland's Notice of Election to Intervene. (mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Calleguas Municipal Water District's Notice of Election to Intervene.(mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Dublin San Ramon Services District's Notice of Election to Intervene. (mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) City of San Bernardino's Notice of Election to Intervene. (mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) City of San Diego's Notice of Election to Intervene. (mat) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) California Attorney General's Notice of Declination Purusant to The California False Claims ACT. (mat) Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 11/30/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs (mat). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2010: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12) (mat). Modified on 2/19/2010 (mat). (Entered: 10/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Seal A.(Filing fee $ 250) Jury demanded. , filed by plaintiffs Seal 4, Seal 5, Seal 6, Seal 7, Seal 8, Seal 1, Seal 2, Seal 3.(mrgo, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2010: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8) (mat). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2015: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (lmh). (Entered: 01/20/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valley Center-Pauma Teachers Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Palmdale Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where DUBLIN SAN RAMON SERVICES DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where ALAMEDA COUNTY WATER DISTRICT is a litigant