This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2022 at 18:51:07 (UTC).

United States Department of Justice vs. Rajendra Jamnadas

Case Summary

On 03/28/2007 United States Department of Justice filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Rajendra Jamnadas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence J. O'Neill and Michael J. Seng. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:07-CV-00491

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. O'Neill

Referral Judge

Michael J. Seng

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

United States of America

Intervenor Plaintiff

Ecology and Environment, Inc.

Defendants, 3Rd Party Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Rajendra Jamnadas

Stephen C. Lyon

Suzanne S. Lyon

Diane M. Tonda

Russell R. Tonda

BOWE PERMAC, INC.

3Rd Party Defendant, Cross Claimant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant

M.B.L., INC.

3Rd Party Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Legacy Vulcan Corp.

Rajendra Jamnadas

Stephen C. Lyon

Suzanne S. Lyon

Diane M. Tonda

Russell R. Tonda

R.R. Street & Co., Inc.

BOWE PERMAC, INC.

M.B.L., INC.

ECHCO SALES AND EQUIPMENT CO., INC.

United States of America

Dow Chemical Company

E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company

Vulcan Materials Company

Occidental Chemical Corporation

PPG Industries, Inc.

Goss Jewett Co. of Northern California

American Laundry Machinery Inc

Technichem

74 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela O'Connell

Attorney at Environmental and Natural Resources

301 Howard Street, Suite 1050

San Francisco, CA 94105

Elise S. Feldman

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

301 Howard Street, Suite 1050

San Francisco, CA 94105

David Taylor Shelledy

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Matthew J. McKeown

Attorney at Environment and Natural Resources Division

601 D Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 2004

Ann C. Hurley

Attorney at United States Department Of Justice

301 Howard Street, Suite 1050

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew D Thurlow, GOVT

Attorney at Department Of Justice, Enrd

Po Box 7611

Washington, DC 20004

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy John Buchanan

Attorney at McCormick Barstow Sheppard Wayte & Carruth, LLP

7647 N. Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

3Rd Party Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant, Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Keith Douglas Chidlaw

Attorney at Schuering Zimmerman Scully & Doyle, LLP

400 University Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825-6502

David Kevin Shipp

Attorney at Hartman King PC

520 Capitol Mall, Suite 750

Sacramento, CA 95814

Robert Cedric Goodman

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'Donnell

311 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Aaron P. Silberman

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'donnell

Robert Dollar Building, 311 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Blanca F. Young

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

James H. Colopy

Attorney at Farella Braun and Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jeffrey S. Wolff, PHV

Attorney at Fulbright and Jaworski, LLP

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Patrick J. Cafferty

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Stephen C. Dillard, PHV

Attorney at Fulbright and Jaworski, LLP

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Ruth Ann E. Castro

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Angela O'Connell

Attorney at Environmental and Natural Resources

301 Howard Street, Suite 1050

San Francisco, CA 94105

Elise S. Feldman

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

301 Howard Street, Suite 1050

San Francisco, CA 94105

David Taylor Shelledy

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Matthew J. McKeown

Attorney at Environment and Natural Resources Division

601 D Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 2004

Daniel J. Nichols

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Llp

121 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 1575

Portland, OR 97204

Richard V. Normington

Attorney at Filice Brown Eassa and McLeod

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1800

Oakland, CA 94612

John Garret Deal

Attorney at Filice Brown Eassa and McLeod

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1800

Oakland, CA 94612

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#509

(#509) ORDER Regarding Court's Intent to Dismiss all Remaining Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/23/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E) (Entered: 06/23/2011)

#508

(#508) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/2011 on court's intent to dismiss all remaining claims re #504 Status Report. ( Filing Deadline: 6/15/2011). (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/25/2011)

#507

(#507) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/2011 for dismissal without prejudice of Cross-Claims against Rajendra Jamnadas, Personal Representative of the Estate of Shantalil Jamnadas and Third Party Complaint against Rajendra Jamnadas. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/25/2011)

#506

(#506) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re #504 Status Report, #505 Proposed Order. (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

#505

(#505) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order re #504 Status Report by United States of America. (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

#504

(#504) JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

#503

(#503) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL and PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CROSS-CLAIMS AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMS by Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda, Russell R. Tonda. (Shipp, David) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

#502

(#502) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/20/11 dismissing claims of Ecology and Environment, Inc. re #498 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

#498

(#502) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/20/11 dismissing claims of Ecology and Environment, Inc. re #498 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Civil New Case Documents for LJO,. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-135(a) (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/15/2007)

3 #3

VDRP Forms

3 #2

Consent Forms

3 #1

Notice of Temporary Assignment

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Russell R. Tonda, Rajendra Jamnadas, Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Angela O'Connell* *Environmental and Natural Resources* *301 Howard Street Ste 1050* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/28/2007)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certificate Certificate of Service

1 #1

Main Document

584 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#509) ORDER Regarding Court's Intent to Dismiss all Remaining Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/23/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E) (Entered: 06/23/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#508) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/2011 on court's intent to dismiss all remaining claims re #504 Status Report. ( Filing Deadline: 6/15/2011). (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/25/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#507) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/2011 for dismissal without prejudice of Cross-Claims against Rajendra Jamnadas, Personal Representative of the Estate of Shantalil Jamnadas and Third Party Complaint against Rajendra Jamnadas. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/25/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#506) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re #504 Status Report, #505 Proposed Order. (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#505) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order re #504 Status Report by United States of America. (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#504) JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#503) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL and PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CROSS-CLAIMS AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMS by Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda, Russell R. Tonda. (Shipp, David) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#502) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/20/11 dismissing claims of Ecology and Environment, Inc. re #498 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#501) ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/2011 re dismissal without prejudice of Counter Claim of M.B.L., Inc. against Cross-Defendants Occidental Chemical Corporation and PPG Industries, Inc. only. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#500) JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/2011 for voluntary dismissal without prejudice of Cross-Complaint against Cross-Defendants Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Russell R. Tonda and Diane M. Tonda. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 05/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
527 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE RE ANSWER to COMPLAINT ; CROSS-COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Russell R. Tonda, Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda, Russell R. Tonda, Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda. Attorney Silberman, Aaron P. added.(Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 05/25/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFENDANT RUSSELL R. TONDA'S ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Rajendra Jamnadas by Russell R. Tonda. Attorney Silberman, Aaron P. added.(Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 05/25/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFENDANT DIANE M. TONDA'S ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Rajendra Jamnadas by Diane M. Tonda. Attorney Silberman, Aaron P. added.(Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 05/25/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFENDANT SUZANNE S. LYON'S ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Rajendra Jamnadas by Suzanne S. Lyon. Attorney Silberman, Aaron P. added.(Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 05/25/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFENDANT STEPHEN C. LYON'S ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Rajendra Jamnadas by Stephen C. Lyon. Attorney Silberman, Aaron P. added.(Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 05/25/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America. Russell R. Tonda waiver sent on 3/28/2007, answer due 5/29/2007; Rajendra Jamnadas waiver sent on 3/28/2007, answer due 5/29/2007; Stephen C. Lyon waiver sent on 3/28/2007, answer due 5/29/2007; Suzanne S. Lyon waiver sent on 3/28/2007, answer due 5/29/2007; Diane M. Tonda waiver sent on 3/28/2007, answer due 5/29/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Civil New Case Documents for LJO,. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-135(a) (Feldman, Elise) (Entered: 05/15/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2007 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Temporary Assignment #2 Consent Forms #3 VDRP Forms) (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Russell R. Tonda, Rajendra Jamnadas, Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Angela O'Connell* *Environmental and Natural Resources* *301 Howard Street Ste 1050* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rajendra Jamnadas, Stephen C. Lyon, Suzanne S. Lyon, Diane M. Tonda, Russell R. Tonda by United States Department of Justice. Attorney O'Connell, Angela added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Certificate of Service#2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Connell, Angela) (Entered: 03/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LAUNDRY MACHINERY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where M.B.L., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEGACY VULCAN LLC FKA VULCAN MATERIAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY is a litigant