Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2019 at 16:04:13 (UTC).

Unencumbered Assets Trust et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2004 Unencumbered Assets Trust filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James L Graham and Mark R. Abel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:04-CV-01090

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L Graham

Referral Judge

Mark R. Abel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erwin I. Katz, LTD

Unencumbered Assets Trust

Defendants

Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.

Intercontinental Investment Associates

Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP

Flohaz Partners, L.L.C.

Deloitte & Touche, LLP

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP

Donald H Ayers

Credit Suisse (USA), Inc.

Credit Suisse, New York Branch

Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC

Lance K Poulsen

Bank One, N.A.

Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C.

Rebecca S Parrett

Barbara L. Poulsen

Interested Party

PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon T Allen

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

1100 Louisiana, Suite 5300

Houston, TX 77002

H. Ritchey Hollenbaugh

Attorney at Carlile Patchen & Murphy - 2

366 E Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Stephanie Michelle Rawlings

Attorney at United States District Court

85 Marconi Blvd

Columbus, OH 43215

Sydney Gibbs Ballesteros

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns LLP

1100 Louisiana, Suite 5300

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Colby Allsbrook

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-4003

Jeffrey Q Smith

Attorney at Bingham McCutchen LLP

339 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4689

Jennifer Temchine

Attorney at Fellig Feingold Edelblum & Schwartz LLC

Two University Plaza, Suite 307

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Sarah Loomis Cave

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004-1482

Brian Edward Dickerson

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress, LPA

155 E Broad Street, National City Center, 12Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

C William Phillips

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Edward H Rippey

Attorney at Covington and Burling

1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., P.O. Box 7566

Washington, DC 20044

Stephen P Anthony

Attorney at Covington & Burling

1201 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2401

David Warren Alexander

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

41 S High Street, 2000 Huntington Center

Columbus, OH 43215

Other Attorneys

Matthew B Andelman

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Matthew L Fornshell

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

250 West Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Roger John Makley

Attorney at Boucher & Boucher Co., L.P.A.

12 West Monument Avenue, Suite 200

Dayton, OH 45402

Robert M Cary

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

William Chester Wilkinson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

341 S. Third Street, Suite 10

Columbus, OH 43215

Craig D Singer

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Theodore E Tsekerides

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153-0119

45 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#389

(#389) ORDER Terminating Case. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/3/11. (ds) (Entered: 11/03/2011)

#388

(#388) ORDER re APPROVED Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of the UAT's Claims against Credit Suisse. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/3/11. (ds) (Entered: 11/03/2011)

#387

(#387) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of the UAT's Claims Against Credit Suisse and (Proposed) Order) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott) (Entered: 11/02/2011)

#386

(#386) REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] (The UAT's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of The Court's Opinion and Order Granting Summary Judgment on The UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims) filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2011)

#385

(#385) RESPONSE in Opposition re #381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] -- Credit Suisse Defendants' Opposition to the UAT's Motion for Reconsideration -- filed by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch. (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2011)

#384

(#384) STIPULATION of Dismissal [The UAT'S Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendants Lance Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen, Donald Ayers, Intercontinental Investment Advisors, Healthcare Capital, LLC, FLorhaz Partners, LLC, South Atlantic Investments, LLC., Thor Capital Holdings, LLC, and Kachina, Inc.] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/12/2011)

#383

(#383) NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The UAT'S Statement of Intent Regarding its Claims Against the NCFE Founders] (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

#382

(#382) NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The UAT'S Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Rebecca Parrett] (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

#381

(#381) MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

1 #15

Exhibit C Part 3

1 #14

Exhibit C Part 2

1 #13

Exhibit C Part 1

1 #11

Exhibit B Part 2

1 #10

Exhibit B Part 1

1 #7

Exhibit A Part 1

1 #6

Complaint 294-349

1 #4

Complaint 197-240

1 #1

Complaint - pp 36-92

815 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#389) ORDER Terminating Case. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/3/11. (ds) (Entered: 11/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#388) ORDER re APPROVED Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of the UAT's Claims against Credit Suisse. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/3/11. (ds) (Entered: 11/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#387) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of the UAT's Claims Against Credit Suisse and (Proposed) Order) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott) (Entered: 11/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#386) REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] (The UAT's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of The Court's Opinion and Order Granting Summary Judgment on The UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims) filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#385) RESPONSE in Opposition re #381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] -- Credit Suisse Defendants' Opposition to the UAT's Motion for Reconsideration -- filed by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch. (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#384) STIPULATION of Dismissal [The UAT'S Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendants Lance Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen, Donald Ayers, Intercontinental Investment Advisors, Healthcare Capital, LLC, FLorhaz Partners, LLC, South Atlantic Investments, LLC., Thor Capital Holdings, LLC, and Kachina, Inc.] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#383) NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The UAT'S Statement of Intent Regarding its Claims Against the NCFE Founders] (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#382) NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The UAT'S Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Rebecca Parrett] (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#381) MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#380) ORDER granting Credit Suisse's motion for summary judgment in the UAT case; granting #345 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #356 Motion to Strike; granting #358 Motion for briefing schedule; finding as moot #361 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 4/12/2011. (jlg6) (Entered: 04/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
393 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Lance K Poulsen waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry) (Entered: 01/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Barbara L. Poulsen waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry) (Entered: 01/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/31/2005 for moving defts to answer the complaint, and until 5/31/2005 for pltf to file responses to motion and to 6/30/2005 for moving defts to file reply briefs. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/10/2005. (bw) (Entered: 01/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/31/2005. by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James) (Entered: 01/04/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER to pltf that a RICO statement is not required to be filed. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/3/2005. (bw) (Entered: 01/04/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. Amendment to #3 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information [AMENDED EXHIBIT O]. (Cotner, Jeffry) (Entered: 12/23/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B#2 Exhibit C#3 Exhibit D#4 Exhibit E-I#5 Exhibit J-M#6 Exhibit N-R)(Cotner, Jeffry) (Entered: 12/23/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER of TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge James L Graham for all further proceedings. Judge Edmund A Sargus no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James L Graham and Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/23/04. (aq) (Entered: 11/23/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number 200 244155. (dms ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs The Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, LTD against Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, CSFB USA, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers, Rebecca S Parrett, and Task Holdings, LTD. (Filing fee $ 150.00). (Attachments: #1 Complaint - pp 36-92 #2 Complaint 93-149 #3 Complaint 150-196 #4 Complaint 197-240 #5 Complaint 241-293 #6 Complaint 294-349 #7 Exhibit A Part 1 #8 Exhibit A Part 2 #9 Exhibit A Part 3 #10 Exhibit B Part 1 #11 Exhibit B Part 2 #12 Exhibit B Part 3 #13 Exhibit C Part 1 #14 Exhibit C Part 2 #15 Exhibit C Part 3)(dms ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK ONE-PLATINUM ETAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit Suisse AG is a litigant

Latest cases where DELOITTE TOUCHE TOHMATSU SERVICES, INC. is a litigant