Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 02:59:33 (UTC).

The Facebook, Inc. v. Connectu, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2007 The Facebook, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Connectu, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria-Elena James and James Ware. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:07-CV-01389

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria-Elena James

Presiding Judge

James Ware

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Defendants

The Facebook, Inc.

Mark Zuckerberg

Defendants

David Gucwa

Divya Narendra

Cameron Winklevoss

Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.

Winston Williams

ConnectU LLC

Tyler Winklevoss

Wayne Chang

Not Classified By Court

Fenwick & West LLP

Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.

3300 Hillview Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304

R. Gregory Roussel

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Divya Narendra

Cameron Winklevoss

Tyler Winklevoss

Special Master

Special Master George C. Fisher

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Interested Party

Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP

Trustee

Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP

Intervenor

CNET Networks, Inc.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean Alan Lincoln, Esq.

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Theresa Ann Sutton

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Yvonne Penas Greer

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Monte M.F. Cooper

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 Marshall St.

Redwood City, CA 94063

Warrington S. Parker, III

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

The Orrick Building, 405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Trustee Attorneys

Valerie Margo Wagner

Attorney at GCA Law Partners LLP

2570 W. El Camino Real, Suite 400

Mountain View, CA 94040

Jerome B. Falk, Jr.

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Florr

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Mark Andrew Byrne

Attorney at Byrne & Nixon LLP

800 West Sixth Street, Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Evan A. Parke

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP

5301 Wisconsin Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20015

Jonathan M. Shaw

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20015

Alison Paige Buchanan

Attorney at Attorney at Law

60 South Market Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Steven Christopher Holtzman

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

David A. Barrett

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

D. Michael Underhill

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP

5301 Wisconsin Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20015

Special Master Attorney

George C. Fisher

Attorney at George C. Fisher Law Office

2600 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Merri Anne Baldwin

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'Donnell

311 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

John Gerard Heller

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'Donnell

311 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Lisa Barclay

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 "M" Street, N.W. Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Interested Party Attorney

Randall Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, P.C.

44 N. San Pedro Road

San Rafael, CA 94903

Intervenor Attorney

Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#803

(#803) NOTICE by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP Notice of Satisfaction of Attorneys' Lien (Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (Entered: 12/14/2011)

#802

(#802) NOTICE by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P. of Satisfaction and Extinguishment of Attorneys' Lien (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)

#800

(#800) ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot #776 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot #778 Motion (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)

#798

(#798) REDACTED Proposed Order. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)

#778

(#795) Minute Entry: Arguments heard. Trustee to submit proposed order of disbursal (under seal). Defendants to notify Court whether Massachusetts case is going forward. Case continued to 12/5/11 at 9:00 am.Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) re #790 MOTION Administrative Relief to Attend Hearing by Telephone filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP, #791 MOTION to Appear by Telephone , Administrative Request for Relief, filed by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P., #778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. Status Conference set for 12/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/28/2011)

776 #5

Proposed Order

776 #4

Exhibit

776 #1

Declaration

#776

(#795) Minute Entry: Arguments heard. Trustee to submit proposed order of disbursal (under seal). Defendants to notify Court whether Massachusetts case is going forward. Case continued to 12/5/11 at 9:00 am.Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) re #790 MOTION Administrative Relief to Attend Hearing by Telephone filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP, #791 MOTION to Appear by Telephone , Administrative Request for Relief, filed by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P., #778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. Status Conference set for 12/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/28/2011)

5 #2

Exhibit Answer

5 #1

Exhibit complaint

#4

(#4) Index of State Court Pleadings filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

2 #3

Judge Seeborg's Standing Order re Initial Case Management

2 #2

Standing Order for all Judges of the Northern District of California

2 #1

Standing Order Regarding Case Management In Civil Cases for San Jose Judges

#2

(#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2007. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2007 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # ( #2 ) bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

#1

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

1,372 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2013
  • Remarks: Case files returned from Court of Appeals (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013) (Entered: 06/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#803) NOTICE by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP Notice of Satisfaction of Attorneys' Lien (Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (Entered: 12/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#802) NOTICE by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P. of Satisfaction and Extinguishment of Attorneys' Lien (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#801) FILED UNDER SEAL ORDER re #798 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#800) ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot #776 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot #778 Motion (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#799) ORDER (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#798) REDACTED Proposed Order. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#797) Transcript of Proceedings held on November 28, 2011, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/1/2011) (Entered: 12/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#796) NOTICE by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss Of Withdrawal Of All Pending Motions In Massachusetts District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#795) Minute Entry: Arguments heard. Trustee to submit proposed order of disbursal (under seal). Defendants to notify Court whether Massachusetts case is going forward. Case continued to 12/5/11 at 9:00 am.Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) re #790 MOTION Administrative Relief to Attend Hearing by Telephone filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP, #791 MOTION to Appear by Telephone , Administrative Request for Relief, filed by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P., #778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. Status Conference set for 12/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
941 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2007
  • (#10) Index of State Court Pleadings #66 - 75 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • (#9) Index of State Court Pleadings #51 - 65 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • (#8) Index of State Court Pleadings #50 filed byConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • (#7) Index of State Court Pleadings #33 - 49 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • (#6) Index of State Court Pleadings #18 - 33 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Index of State Court Pleadings #1 - 17 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2009: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to complaint) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Index of State Court Pleadings filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2007. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2007 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # ( #2 ) bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS) from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 105CV047381. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611000604). Filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CNET NETWORKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Boies Schiller Flexner LLP is a litigant