This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2015 at 12:33:02 (UTC).

Scofield v. Wyeth et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2004 Scofield filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wyeth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia A. Crone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:04-CV-00330

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Ann Scofield

Defendants

Wyeth

Wyeth-Ayerst Pharmaceuticals Inc

Wyeth-Ayerst International Inc

Wyeth Pharmaceuticals

SmithKline Beecham Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline

EON Labs Manufacturing Inc

Medeva Pharmaceuticals Inc

Fisons Corporation

Gate Pharmaceuticals

Leigh-An G Chiasson

Eric Lofstrom

Jeffrey P Phillips

Jeries I Rajabi

Scholars Drug Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Scott Nabers

Attorney at Blizzard McCarthy & Nabers

440 Louisiana, No.1710

Houston, TX 77002

Edward Francis Blizzard

Attorney at Blizzard McCarthy & Nabers

440 Louisiana, No.1710

Houston, TX 77002

John Eddie Williams, Jr

Attorney at Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017-5051

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Joseph Ferguson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Christopher B Bradford

Attorney at Clark Thomas & Winters

P O Box 1148

Austin, TX 78767-1148

Karen Renee Bennett

Attorney at Germer Gertz - Beaumont

Po Box 4915, 550 Fannin, Suite 400

Beaumont, TX 77704

Lawrence Louis Germer

Attorney at Germer Gertz

550 Fannin St, Suite 400P. O. Box 4915

Beaumont, TX 77704

Leslie Anne Benitez

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Paul Edward Stallings

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins

1001 Fannin St, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002-6760

Robert M Schick

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins - Houston

1001 Fannin St, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Susan E Burnett

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP - Austin

2901 Via Fortuna Drive, Suite 500

Austin, TX 78746

Stephanie Ann Smith

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

98 San Jacinto Boulevard, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Stacey Ann Martinez

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

98 San Jacinto Boulevard, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Karen F Stallings

Attorney at Shell Oil Co Legal Department

Po Box 2463

Houston, TX 77252-2463

Kenneth E Tekell

Attorney at Tekell Book Matthews & Limmer LLP

1221 Mckinney, Suite 4300

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Andrew Walsh

Attorney at Strasburger & Price LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4300

Dallas, TX 75202

Eve Shatteen Bell

Attorney at Attorney at Law

3721 Camden Ln.

Addison, TX 75001

Randal Girard Cashiola

Attorney at Cashiola & Bean

2090 Broadway, Ste A

Beaumont, TX 77701

Alfredo G Ramirez

Attorney at Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer, LLP - Dallas

8750 North Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

12 #4

Exhibit

12 #3

Exhibit

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#15

16 #2

#16

#17

#18

#19

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the ED/PA of notice of removal and docket sheet on 1/26/05.(case number 05-20446) (bjc, ) (Entered: 02/07/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • DocketNotified Attorney, Eve Shatteen Bell, Edward Francis Blizzard, Kenneth E Tekell, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • DocketMailed certified copy of docket sheet and certified copy of notice of removal to United States District Ct ED/PA for inclusion in MDL 1203. (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-134) transferring case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for inclusion in MDL 1203 in re: Diet Drugs Products Liability Litigation and assigned to the Honorable Harvey Bartle III (signed by Clerk of the Panel) (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Administratively Closing Case. In light of the conditional transfer order (CTO-134) filed by the Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 12/14/04 in the USDC E/D PA, this case is administratively closed pending further order of this Court. Any outstanding motions are denied as premature without prejudice to the right of counsel of record to re-urge them upon issuance of the final transfer order by the Judicial Panel. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/21/04. (mrp, ) (Entered: 12/21/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Randal Cashiola by Scholars Drug Company. (Attachments: #1)(Ramirez, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/17/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Reconsideration of Order denying Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until it is either transferred to USDC E/D PA in re: MDL 1203, or the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer the case . Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/13/04. (mrp, ) (Entered: 07/15/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendants Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's #9 MOTION to Remand. Unscanned Exhibits located in Clerk's Office File (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(mrp, ) (Entered: 07/14/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion to Stay by Wyeth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(Bradford, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Deadlines. All deadlines in this case shall be continued until further order of this Court . Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/8/04. (mrp, ) (Entered: 07/09/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand by Mary Ann Scofield. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(mrp, ) (Entered: 06/25/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2004
  • DocketLetter from Leslie Benitez regarding problems with service of process. (mrp, ) (Entered: 06/28/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER 04-14 re: Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/22/04. (rll) (Entered: 06/25/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL1203. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/18/04. (mrp, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Stay filed by Mary Ann Scofield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(pkb, ) (Entered: 06/17/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 8/9/2004. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/31/04. (fbc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc & Wyeth-Ayerst International Inc (bst, ) (Entered: 05/26/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay all proceedings pending transfer to MDL 1203 & brief in support by Wyeth including its Wyeth Pharmaceuticals division (bst, ) Modified on 5/26/2004 (bst, )(unscanned exhibits located in The Clerk's Office) (Entered: 05/26/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals & Wyeth-Ayerst International Inc (bst, ) (Entered: 05/26/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc & Wyeth-Ayerst International Inc w/Pla's orig pet, cert copy of St Ct Dkt Sheet, & List of parties & attorneys ( Filing fee $ 150, receipt #108178) (unscanned exhibits filed in The Clerk's Office)(bst, ) (Entered: 05/26/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYETH AYERST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fisons Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SmithKline Beecham Corporation is a litigant