Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2019 at 21:17:06 (UTC).

Ryan Rodriguez et al v. West Publishing Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2005 Ryan Rodriguez filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against West Publishing Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James W. McMahon and Manuel L. Real. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:05-CV-03222

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James W. McMahon

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kari Brewer

Ryan Rodriguez

Loredana Nesci

Jennifer Brazeal

Petitioner

Pamela Collins Dunmore

Gainsville, FL 32609

Appellants

Exec/Class Counsel Sandra Disner

Los Angeles, CA 90071

McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor, C/O Sidney Kanazawa

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Finkelstein Thompson LLP

Intervenor

Stephen Stetson

Not Classified By Court

Jonathan M Slomba

Audrey Juranek

Greg Thomas

Kareem Kamal

Andrew Gilman

John Prendergast

Matthew Kavanaugh

David Harris

Emily Grant

George Schneider

Jennifer Brown McElroy

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles A Sturm

Attorney at Sturm Law PLLC

723 Main Street, Suite 325

Houston, TX 77002

Jon M Zimmerman

Attorney at Jon M Zimmerman Law Offices

2825 Eastlake Avenue East, Suite 120

Seattle, WA 98102

Sidney K Kanazawa

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tracy Evans-Moyer

Attorney at McGuire Woods

1800 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Eliot G Disner

Attorney at Van Etten Suzumoto & Becket

1620 26Th Street Suite 6000 North

Santa Monica, CA 90404

Noah E Jussim

11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Garrett Kendrick

Attorney at Kendrick & Nutley

1055 E. Colorado Blvd., 5Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91106

Joseph Darrell Palmer

Attorney at Law Offices of Darrell Palmer

301 Seventh Street

Nocona, TX 76255-2805

Petitioner Attorney

Daniel Scott Brown

Attorney at Daniel Scott Brown Law Offices

131 Lawnview Circle

Danville, CA 94526-5107

Intervenor Attorney

Fredricka Ung

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Other Attorneys

Steven F Molo

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling, LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Lisl Joanne Dunlop

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Edward F Siegel

Attorney at Edward F Siegel Co., LPA

27600 Chagrin Boulevard, Suite 340

Cleveland, OH 44122

Marc D Ashley

Attorney at Sherman & Sterling, LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Rebecca J Trent

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling, LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Carmine Giardino

Attorney at Giardino Law firm Inc, The

8930 Tradewinds Dr Suite 255

San Antonio, TX 78239-1928

Wayne D Collins

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

C Benjamin Nutley

Attorney at Kendrick & Nutley

1055 E Colorado Blvd., 5Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91106

Alan S Gruber

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling, LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Edward A Klein

Attorney at Liner LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3503

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#822

(#822) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES TO COUNSEL FOR SCHNEIDER OBJECTORS by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court finds and ORDERS as follows: Counsel for the Schneider Objectors are hereby awarded $78,879.37 in attorneys' fees--representing the remaining balance due on the award of $315,516.37. Plaintiffs' Counsel are ordered to direct the Escrow Agent, or other appropriate entity, to make payment from the Settlement Fund to Kendrick & Nutley on behalf of Counsel for the Schneider Objectors in the amount of $78,879.37 within 30 days of the entry of this order. (gk) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

#786

No Description Available

#813

No Description Available

#783

No Description Available

#764

No Description Available

#748

No Description Available

722 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B, Order Appealed

#695

No Description Available

690 #5

Exhibit E

#644

No Description Available

#614

No Description Available

602 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Bruce Susich

#572

No Description Available

#290

No Description Available

#165

RESTRICTED

#135

RESTRICTED

#46

No Description Available

665 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#827) Mail Returned addressed to Carmine Giardino, The Giardino Law Firm Inc. re Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Third Distribution and Final Distribution to Cy Pres #825 . (gk) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#826) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sidney K Kanazawa counsel for Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Reena B Frailich, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Ryan Rodriguez. Tracy Evans Moyer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff RYAN RODRIGUEZ, REENA B. FRAILICH, LORENDANA NESCI, JENNIFER BRAZIL, and LISA GINTZ. (Kanazawa, Sidney) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#825) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR THIRD DISTRIBUTION AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION TO CY PRES by Judge Manuel L. Real: This Court deems Defendants' failure to oppose consent to grant the Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Third Distribution and Final Distribution to Cy Pres #823 is GRANTED. (gk) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#824) TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Motion for Order for for Third Distribution and Final Distribution to Cy Pres filed by Plaintiffs Kari Brewer, Reena B Frailich, Loredana Nesci, Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez #823 , set for hearing on March 19, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of March 19, 2018 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#823) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for FOR THIRD DISTRIBUTION AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION TO CY PRES filed by Plaintiff Kari Brewer, Reena B Frailich, Loredana Nesci, Lorraine Rimson, Ryan Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Blake) (Attorney Sidney K Kanazawa added to party Kari Brewer(pty:pla), Attorney Sidney K Kanazawa added to party Lorraine Rimson(pty:pla)) (Kanazawa, Sidney) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#822) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES TO COUNSEL FOR SCHNEIDER OBJECTORS by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court finds and ORDERS as follows: Counsel for the Schneider Objectors are hereby awarded $78,879.37 in attorneys' fees--representing the remaining balance due on the award of $315,516.37. Plaintiffs' Counsel are ordered to direct the Escrow Agent, or other appropriate entity, to make payment from the Settlement Fund to Kendrick & Nutley on behalf of Counsel for the Schneider Objectors in the amount of $78,879.37 within 30 days of the entry of this order. (gk) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#821) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Directing Payment of Attorneys' Fees re Status Conference, #819 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kanazawa, Sidney) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#820) Mail Returned addressed to Sandeep Gopalan re Status Conference, #819 (kss) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#819) MINUTES OF HEARING ON U.S.C.A 9th CIRCUIT MANDATE Reversing and Remandingwith Instructions held before Judge Manuel L. Real. The Mandate of the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit Reversing and Remanding is filed and spread upon the Minutes of this Court. The Court awards $315,516.37 in attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit the proposed order. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (lom) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#818) Mail Returned addressed to Jon M Zimmerman re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Hearing, #816 (pg) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
867 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2005
  • (#8) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Brazeal, Lisa Gintz, Loredana Nesci, Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich (shb, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich. re Order, #3 , was served on 5/3/2005. (yc, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • (#6) FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint. Kaplan Inc answer due 6/20/2005. filed by defendant Kaplan Inc. (yc, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed upon Kaplan Inc served on 4/29/2005, answer due 5/19/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by personally deliveing copies service, by Federal statute, upon CT Corporation System Agent, by leaving with Gerome Jones, Process Clerk. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (yc, ) (Entered: 05/17/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Reena B Frailich, upon West Publishing Corporation served on 5/2/2005, answer due 5/22/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by not cited statute, upon Becky DeGeorge at CSC, authorized to accept service of process. Due Dilligence declaration -. Original Summons not returned. (lc, ) (Entered: 05/13/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO COUNSLE ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real. Counsel are advised that the court expects strict compliance with the provisions of the local rules of the Federal rules of civil procedure. NONCOMPLIANCE MAY LEAD TO THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS WHICH MAY INCLUDE THE STRIKING OF PLEADINGS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION. (see document for details)(yc, ) (Entered: 05/05/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • FAX number for Attorneys Noah E Jussim, Sidney K Kanazawa, Colleen M Regan is 310-315-8210. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants West Publishing Corporation, Kaplan Inc. (Filing fee $ 250 paid), jury demand, filed by plaintiffs Ryan Rodriguez, Reena B Frailich.(jp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCGUIREWOODS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. Benjamin Nutley Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc David Ashley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wayne D Collins