Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2019 at 03:27:20 (UTC).

Roe et al v. Estate of Thomas White et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2003 Roe filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Estate of Thomas White. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:03-CV-04035

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

Jose Roe

Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego

Petitioners

Nanci L. Clarence

Clarence & Dyer LLP (now known as Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP)

Kathleen Dyer

Defendants

Arthur J. Collingsworth

Jack Eugene Teeters

Estate of Thomas F. White

Gerald Rolph

Thomas F. White

Interested Parties

David Replogle

San Francisco, CA 94111

Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP

John D. O'Connor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cristina C. Arguedas

Kaushal Niroula

Indio, CA 92201

James M. Wagstaffe

Attorney John E. Hill

Oakland, CA 94621

Ted W. Cassman

Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego

Trustee

C. Joseph Smith

San Francisco, CA 94126-2928

Not Classified By Court

Bradley Phillip Kaplan

San Francisco, CA 94111

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Replogle

Attorney at Law Offices of David Replogle, APC

550 Montgomery Street, Suite 550

San Francisco, CA 94111

James Matthew Wagstaffe

Attorney at Wagstaffe, von Loewenfeldt, Busch & Radwick LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 725, San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Paul Guta

Attorney at Law Offices of John E. Hill

8105 Edgewater Drive, Suite 100

Oakland, CA 94621

John E. Hill

Attorney at Law Offices of John E. Hill

333 Hegenberger Road, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94621

Thomas H. Kawaii

Attorney at Gwire Law Offices

235 Pine St., Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Eric Mitchell Safire

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric M. Safire

2431 Fillmore Street

San Francisco, CA 94115

Jan Nielsen Little

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

John Dennis O'Connor

Attorney at O'Connor and Associates

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 1020

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nancy Tompkins

Attorney at Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

100 Spear Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

William Martin Gwire

Attorney at Gwire Law Offices

1250 45Th Street, Suite 310

Emeryville, CA 94608

Petitioner Attorneys

Stanley Gracey Roman

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

One Montgomery Street, #3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Tracy M. Clements

Attorney at Keller Sloan Roman & Holland LLP

555 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory F. Wilson

Attorney at Wilson & Quint LLP

250 Montgomery Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Gilbert Eisenberg

Attorney at Law Offices of Gilbert Eisenberg

819 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Geoffrey Rotwein

Attorney at Geoffrey Rotwein, Attorney at Law

400 Montgomery Street, Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kate Dyer

Attorney at Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP

899 Ellis Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Jodi Linker

Attorney at Office of the Federal Public Defender

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 19Th Floor Federal Building - Box 36106

San Francisco, CA 94102

Nanci L. Clarence

Attorney at Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP

899 Ellis Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Bradley P. Kaplan

Attorney at Carlson Calladine & Peterson

353 Sacramento St., 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

William S. Berland

Attorney at Ferguson & Berland

1816 Fifth Street

Berkeley, CA 94710

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1273

(#1273) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2005 before Judge Charles R. Breyer for Court Reporter Rosita Flores. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

#1271

RESTRICTED

1270 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#1270

(#1270) ORDER re payment of Guardian Ad Litem re #1267 Status Report filed by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#1269

(#1269) Proposed Order re Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Invoice #10 by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

1268 #1

Exhibit A

#1268

(#1268) Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #1267 Status Report Guardian ad Litem re: Fees and Costs filed byJose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1267 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) Modified on 6/2/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#1267

(#1267) STATUS REPORT Guardian ad Litem re: Fees and Costs by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

5 #1

Standing Order

#5

(#5) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2003. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4:00 p.m. on 1/5/2004. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2003)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION re #2 of David Replogle in support of Plaintiffs' Application for order permitting filing complaint using fictitious name & appointing Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego guardian ad litem for plaintiff Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (Related document(s) #2 ) (tn, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#3) DECLARATION re #2 of David Replogle in support of Plaintiffs' Application for order permitting filing complaint using fictitious name & appointing Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego guardian ad litem for plaintiff Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (Related document(s) #2 ) (tn, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

#4

(#4) ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/3/03 Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Order Permitting filing complaint using fictitious name & appointing Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Guardian Ad Litem for plaintiff Jose Roe #2 . (tn, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

1 #2

Receipt for filing fee

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages For Childhood Sexual Abuse, etc.; Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Nathan Lovaas & Thomas F. White, [Filing Fee: $150.00, receipt number 3351198]. Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2014: #1 Civil cover sheet) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2019: #2 Receipt for filing fee) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

1,466 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1273) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2005 before Judge Charles R. Breyer for Court Reporter Rosita Flores. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1272) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1271) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1270) ORDER re payment of Guardian Ad Litem re #1267 Status Report filed by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1269) Proposed Order re Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Invoice #10 by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1268) Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #1267 Status Report Guardian ad Litem re: Fees and Costs filed byJose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1267 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) Modified on 6/2/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1267) STATUS REPORT Guardian ad Litem re: Fees and Costs by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1266) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • (#1265) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference held on 12/12/2014.Court Reporter Name - Joanne Farrell. Plaintiff Attorney - James Wagstaff. Defendant Attorney - Geoffrey Rotwein also present Jack Teeters.This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/12/2014) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1264) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,293 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2003
  • SUMMONS (First Amended Complaint) Issued as to Defendants Nathan Lovaas & Thomas F. White (tn, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/17/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (tn, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORIGINAL SUMMONS In A Civil Case Returned Unexecuted Submitted by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (tn, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2003. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4:00 p.m. on 1/5/2004. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • Summons Issued as to Nathan Lovaas ; Thomas F. White (tn, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION re #2 of David Replogle in support of Plaintiffs' Application for order permitting filing complaint using fictitious name & appointing Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego guardian ad litem for plaintiff Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (Related document(s) #2 ) (tn, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION For Order Permitting Filing Complaint Using Fictitious Name & Appointing Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Guardian Ad Litem For Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (tn, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/3/03 Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Order Permitting filing complaint using fictitious name & appointing Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Guardian Ad Litem for plaintiff Jose Roe #2 . (tn, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages For Childhood Sexual Abuse, etc.; Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Nathan Lovaas & Thomas F. White, [Filing Fee: $150.00, receipt number 3351198]. Filed by Plaintiffs Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego & Jose Roe. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2014: #1 Civil cover sheet) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2019: #2 Receipt for filing fee) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less