This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2021 at 05:56:18 (UTC).

Riverside Texaco et al v. Occidental Chemical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2007 Riverside Texaco filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Occidental Chemical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Inge P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:07-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Inge P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Annie R Whiteside

Annie P Thompson

William D Ricks

Zela M Phillips

Jessie J Little

Perry C Burgess

Dean Lesley

Devon King

Mattie Russell

Shelia Pullen

Concettia H Fort

Marion L Martin

Wanda R Mitchell

Margaret Smith

Beverly Ross

Grace M Bates

Herchial Allen

Carol A Lesley

Nazarene T Darrough

Defendant

David Ryskoski

261 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rhon E Jones

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

P O Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

John E Tomlinson

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

Post Office Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Jere L Beasley

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Chenoa B Vick

Attorney at THE VICK LAW FIRM LLC

600 South Hull Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Mary Pat O'Connor

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

218 Commerce Street, Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36104

Christopher D Boutwell

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

P O Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

R Leland Lesley

Attorney at R LELAND LESLEY PC

2908 Crescent Avenue, 870-1986, Fax: 879-2990

Birmingham, AL 35209-2522

David B Byrne, III

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

218 Commerce Street, Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36104

Mark Englehart

Attorney at Englehart Law Offices

9457 Alysbury Place

Montgomery, AL 36117-6005

Alyce Robertson Addison

Attorney at HOME BUILDERS LICENSURE BOARD

445 Herron Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

William J Curtis

Attorney at HUSCH & EPPENBERGER LLC

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105-3441

Gilbert Porterfield Self

Attorney at SELF SMITH BURDINE & KELLEY

408 West Dr Hicks Boulevard

Florence, AL 35630

Michael K Alston

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

736 Georgia Avenue, Suite 300

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Other Attorneys

John K Power

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 6122

Michael H Wetmore

Attorney at HUSCH & EPPENBERGER LLC

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105-3441

Arthur L Smith

Attorney at HUSCH & EPPENBERGER LLC

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105-4341

Henry H Self, Jr

325 Doubletree Lane

Florence, AL 35634

Robyn D Buck

Attorney at HUSCH & EPPENBERGER LLC

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#260

#259

#258

#257

256 #1

Exhibit A

#256

#255

254 #1

Exhibit 1 - Agreed Stipulation of Facts

#254

8 #1

Supplement Notice of Removal to State Court

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

713 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#260) ORDER finding as moot #259 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/13/2009. (KSS, ) (Entered: 10/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#259) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by plas. (Boutwell, Christopher) Modified on 10/15/2009 (ASL ). (Entered: 10/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#258) ORDER due to an error in the dates, the court's #257 Order on Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN and the following substituted therefore as set out; it is ORDERED by the court that said motion is GRANTED, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/5/2009. (KSS, ) (Entered: 10/05/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) ORDER granting #254 Motion to Dismiss; this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 10/1/2009. (KAM, ) (Entered: 10/05/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) NOTICE filed by plas re #255 Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Addison, Alyce) Modified on 9/15/2009 (ASL ). (Entered: 09/15/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #254 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice : Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2009 08:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Inge P Johnson. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/11/09. (ASL ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Stipulation of Facts)(Wetmore, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 9/3/2009 at 01:30 PM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Inge P Johnson. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/27/09. (ASL ) (Entered: 08/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, court retains jurisdiction for purpose of enforcing parties' settlement agreement, parties shall submit formal stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/21/09. (ASL ) (Entered: 04/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) ORDER granting #250 Motion for enlargement of time to reply; plas are allowed an additional 7 days to respond to pending motions. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/17/09. (ASL ) (Entered: 04/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to re #6 the Court's Order Setting Hearing and Notice of Consent to Federal Jurisdiction Under CAFA filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Gladys Pullen. (Robertson, Alyce) (Entered: 02/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, filed by Willie Jones, Riverside Texaco, Gladys Pullen.(Robertson, Alyce) (Entered: 02/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Occidental Chemical Corporation Filing Proof of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Removal to State Court)(Alston, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for extension of time to respond to plas' complaint; dfts have until 3/9/07 in which to file a response . Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/12/07. (ASL, ) (Entered: 02/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal ; Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/27/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Inge P Johnson.. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/12/07. (ASL, ) (Entered: 02/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to pla's complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell. (MAA, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Occidental Chemical Corporation (MAA, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Memorandum to Clek regarding filing of notice of removal in state court(MAA, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Alston on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell (MAA, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Occidental Chemical Corporation, David Ryskoski, Anita Mitchell, from Circuit Court Colbert County, Alabama, case number CV07-12. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 Receipt 200 233664 )(MAA, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John K. Power(Designation Retained)