This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2020 at 02:48:40 (UTC).

Perez-Mercado v. Rent-A-Center, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2007 Perez-Mercado filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Rent-A-Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raymond L. Acosta. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:07-CV-01457

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond L. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nilsa Perez-Mercado

Defendant

Rent-A-Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose A. Rios-Rosa

Attorney at Jose A. Rios Rosa Law Office

24 Mariana Bracetti

San Juan, PR 00925-2201

Manuel Duran-Rodriguez

Attorney at Manuel Duran Law Office

1139 Americo Miranda Ave.

San Juan, PR 00921

Defendant Attorneys

Alberto R. Estrella-Arteaga

Attorney at Baerga & Quintana Law Office

Union Plaza Bldg., 416 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 810

San Juan, PR 00918-3426

Doris M. Del Castillo-Garcia

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

111 North Magnolia Ave., Suite 1250

Orlando, FL 32828

Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre

Attorney at Baerga & Quintana Law Office

Union Plaza Bldg., 416 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 810

San Juan, PR 00918-3426

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

#41

#40

#39

#38

#36

#35

#33

1 #10

Current Address Notice

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Category Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B (Answer to Complaint)

1 #2

Exhibit A (Complaint)

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Returned: #40 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, RE: #41 , #44 . (xi) (Entered: 09/04/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MANDATE of USCA as to #40 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc.; VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED. (xi) (Entered: 09/04/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) JUDGMENT Compelling Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims, granted #33 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 7/31/08.(ans) (Entered: 07/31/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) USCA Case Number 08-1729 for #40 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (cm) (Entered: 06/19/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #40 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, (Copies of dkts. 1,...,38-41)(xi) (Entered: 06/03/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #39 Order, Terminate Hearings by Rent-A-Center, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 01040000000001112439.) Appeal Record due by 5/18/2008. (Del Castillo-Garcia, Doris) (Entered: 05/05/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER re #35 Joint Status Report, VACATING STATUS/SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 4/3/08.(ans) (Entered: 04/03/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc. Re: #33 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration re 32 Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, filed byDoris M. Del Castillo-Garcia on behalf of Rent-A-Center (Del Castillo-Garcia, Doris) Modified on 4/1/2008 to correct link(ov). (Entered: 03/31/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 3/31/08. (ans) (Entered: 03/31/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Leave to File Document in Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration (Docket #34) filed byDoris M. Del Castillo-Garcia on behalf of Rent-A-Center, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/11/2008 (Del Castillo-Garcia, Doris) (Entered: 03/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 9/26/2007 at 3:00 PM in RLA's Chambers. A JOINT ISC Memorandum is due by 9/17/2007, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 7/18/07. (ans) (Entered: 07/18/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER NOTED #6 INFORMATIVE motion re CONSENT TO REMOVAL AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 7/3/07. (ans) (Entered: 07/03/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER NOTED #5 Notice of Appearance for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 7/3/07. (ans) (Entered: 07/03/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta on 7/3/07. (ans) (Entered: 07/03/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding CONSENT TO REMOVAL AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed byJose A. Rios-Rosa on behalf of Nilsa Perez-Mercado (Rios-Rosa, Jose) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance as co-counsel for plaintiff by Manuel Duran-Rodriguez on behalf of Nilsa Perez-Mercado (Duran-Rodriguez, Manuel) (Entered: 06/04/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed byAlberto R. Estrella-Arteaga on behalf of Rent-A-Center, Inc. (Estrella-Arteaga, Alberto) (Entered: 05/31/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Procedure by Rent-A-Center, Inc. from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Fajardo Part, case number NICI2007-00129. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Estrella-Arteaga, Alberto) (Entered: 05/31/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed byAlberto R. Estrella-Arteaga on behalf of Rent-A-Center, Inc. (Estrella-Arteaga, Alberto) (Entered: 05/31/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Fajardo Part, case number NICI2007-00129. ( Filing fee $ 350 ), filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint)#2 Exhibit B (Answer to Complaint)#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Category Sheet #8 Civil Cover Sheet #9 Current Address Notice)(Estrella-Arteaga, Alberto) (Entered: 05/31/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rent-A-Center East, Inc. is a litigant