Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2014 at 06:51:24 (UTC).

Perez et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2006 Perez filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul Singh Grewal and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:06-CV-01962

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul Singh Grewal

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rachel Hardyck

Michelle Lackney

Sarah Perez

Rachel Stewart

Defendants

Allstate Indemnity Co.,

Allstate Property and Casualty Company

Certified Automotive Parts Assocation

GEICO Casualty Company

GEICO General Insurance Co.,

GEICO Indemnity Company

Government Employees Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.,

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.

State Farm General Insurance Co.

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Un-Named Insurance Conspirators

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven F. Benz

Robert Stephen Berry

Colleen Duffy-Smith

Andrew M. Hetherington

James McManis

Michael Gannon Reedy

Defendant Attorneys

Richard L. Fenton

Steven H. Frankel

Bonnie Lau

Randall Lee Allen

Richard John Zuromski, Jr.

Cari K. Dawson

Brian J. Devine

Raoul Dion Kennedy

Michael P. Kenny

Christopher Allen Riley

Carol A. Rutter

Kenneth Mark Seeger

Melissa Mahurin Whitehead

Sheila K Carmody

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunction and Damages (Summons Issued); jury demand; against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, GEICO, Certified Automotive Parts Ass'n, Un-Named Insurance Conspirators ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 5514174.). Filed by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/21/2006, correct spelling of Automotive not Automobile (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2006)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities and Parties (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2006)

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2006. Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2006 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) (Entered: 03/15/2006)

#4

Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney GREGORY BARUCH by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)

#5

Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice re #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney J. DANIEL LEFTWICH by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)

#6

(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney R. STEPHEN BERRY (fee paid, receipt # 5514231) filed by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2006)

705 #1

Proposed Order

#705

(#731) Statement of Recent Decisions Re: #705 Plaintiffs' Motions to Vacate by Sarah Perez. (Berry, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/19/2013 linking entry to document #705 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2013)

706 #1

Proposed Order

#706

(#733) ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying #705 Motion to Vacate ; denying #706 Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment and to Set Aside or Amend Findings (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013) (Entered: 06/21/2013)

#732

(#732) ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/19/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)

#733

(#733) ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying #705 Motion to Vacate ; denying #706 Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment and to Set Aside or Amend Findings (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013) (Entered: 06/21/2013)

#734

(#734) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Sarah Perez.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7853330 paid.) (Berry, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)

#735

(#735) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Rachel Hardyck, Michelle Lackney, Sarah Perez, Rachel Stewart re #734 Notice of Appeal (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013) (Entered: 07/18/2013)

736 #1

USCA Time Scheduling Order

#736

(#736) USCA Case Number 13-16450 Ninth Circuit for #734 Notice of Appeal filed by Sarah Perez. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/25/2013. Transcript ordered by 08/16/2013. Transcript due 09/16/2013. Appellants Rachel Hardyck, Michelle Lackney, Sarah Perez and Rachel Stewart opening brief due 10/25/2013. Appellees Allstate Indemnity Co., Certified Automotive Parts Ass'n, Geico General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Un-Named Insurance Conspirators answering brief due 11/25/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (Attachments: #1 USCA Time Scheduling Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)

#737

(#737) TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION Form for appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals by Sarah Perez for proceedings held on 3/14/2011, 7/1/2011, 10/31/2011, 4/30/2012, 7/9/2012, 8/6/2012 before Judge James Ware; Paul Grewal.. (Berry, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)

1,149 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#737) TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION Form for appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals by Sarah Perez for proceedings held on 3/14/2011, 7/1/2011, 10/31/2011, 4/30/2012, 7/9/2012, 8/6/2012 before Judge James Ware; Paul Grewal.. (Berry, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#736) USCA Case Number 13-16450 Ninth Circuit for #734 Notice of Appeal filed by Sarah Perez. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/25/2013. Transcript ordered by 08/16/2013. Transcript due 09/16/2013. Appellants Rachel Hardyck, Michelle Lackney, Sarah Perez and Rachel Stewart opening brief due 10/25/2013. Appellees Allstate Indemnity Co., Certified Automotive Parts Ass'n, Geico General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Un-Named Insurance Conspirators answering brief due 11/25/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (Attachments: #1 USCA Time Scheduling Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#735) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Rachel Hardyck, Michelle Lackney, Sarah Perez, Rachel Stewart re #734 Notice of Appeal (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013) (Entered: 07/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#734) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Sarah Perez.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7853330 paid.) (Berry, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#733) ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying #705 Motion to Vacate ; denying #706 Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment and to Set Aside or Amend Findings (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013) (Entered: 06/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Vacate Hearing re #732 Order (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#732) ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/19/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#731) Statement of Recent Decisions Re: #705 Plaintiffs' Motions to Vacate by Sarah Perez. (Berry, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/19/2013 linking entry to document #705 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#730) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Colleen Duffy-Smith (Duffy-Smith, Colleen) (Filed on 6/11/2013) (Entered: 06/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#729) NOTICE by Allstate Indemnity Co., OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Frankel, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2013) (Entered: 04/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
768 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice re #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney J. DANIEL LEFTWICH by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney R. STEPHEN BERRY (fee paid, receipt # 5514231) filed by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney J. DANIEL LEFTWICH (fee paid, receipt # 5514232) filed by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney GREGORY BARUCH by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney GREGORY BARUCH (fee paid, receipt # 5514233) filed by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, . (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) (Entered: 03/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) (Entered: 03/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2006. Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2006 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) (Entered: 03/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities and Parties (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Injunction and Damages (Summons Issued); jury demand; against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, GEICO, Certified Automotive Parts Ass'n, Un-Named Insurance Conspirators ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 5514174.). Filed by Rachel Stewart, Sarah Perez, Michelle Lackney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/21/2006, correct spelling of Automotive not Automobile (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant