Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2018 at 19:57:04 (UTC).

Orange County Water v. Unocal Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2003 Orange County Water filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Unocal Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:03-CV-01742

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2003

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orange County Water District

Defendants, Cross Claimants and 3Rd Party Defendants

BP Products North America Inc

ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation

Ultramar Inc

Exxon Mobil Corporation

John and Jane Does

7-Eleven Inc

Valero Refining Company

Arco Chemical Company [Doe 201]

U.S.A. Gasoline Corporation

Conocophillips Company

Tosco Corporation

Petro Diamond Inc

Does 9-200 and 202-1000, inclusive

Lyondell Chemical Company

Chevrontexaco Corporation

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation

Citgo Petroleum Corporation

Tesoro Petroleum Corporation

Atlantic Richfield Company

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Claimant

Exxon Mobil Corporation

Defendant, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant

John and Jane Does

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victor M Sher

Attorney at Sher Edling LLP

100 Montgomery Street Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Tracey L O'Reilly

Attorney at Miller Axline and Sawyer

1050 Fulton Avenue Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

Todd Eric Robins

Attorney at Sher and Leff LLP

450 Mission Street 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

A Curtis Sawyer, Jr

Attorney at Miller & Sawyer

1651 Response Rd, 2Nd Fl

Sacramento, CA 95815-5253

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Willie J Epps

Attorney at Dowd and Marotta LLC

11520 Nuckols Road Suite 101

Glen Allen, VA 23059

Catherine M Stites

Attorney at Metropolitan Water District of Southern California

700 North Alameda Street 11Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Colleen Patrice Doyle

Attorney at Hunton and Williams LLP

550 South Hope Street Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Peter John Sacripanti

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Craig J DeRecat

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Jaime Lisa Abraham

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres and Friedman LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Matthew David Thurlow

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

James C Macdonald

Attorney at Bois and MacDonald

2030 Main Street Suite 660

Irvine, CA 92614

Alan J Hoffman

Attorney at Blank Rome

One Logan Square, 18Th And Cherry Street

Phildelphia, PA 19103-6998

Arun Subramanian

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Fl.

New York, NY 10019

David L Schrader

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Pamela Reasor Hanebutt

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Jamie Olivia Kendall

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

Peter A Strotz

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Larry M Arnold

Attorney at Cummins and White LLP

2424 Se Bristol Street Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-0757

William D Temko

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson

355 South Grand Avenue, 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

54 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#337

(#337) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (mt) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

#336

(#336) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Cormac J. Carney: Status conference held. The Court confers further with counsel confer regarding the proposed case management order as well as various other trial related matters. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (es) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

#335

(#335) NOTICE OF LODGING filed March 1, 2018 re Order, #334 (Roy, Whitney) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#334

(#334) ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The parties are DIRECTED to file a proposed Case Management Order No. 2 consistent with the above instructions by Friday, March 2, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. See document for further information. (twdb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#333

(#333) STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Roy, Whitney) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#332

(#332) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 03-cv-01742 CJC (DFMx). (esa) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

#331

(#331) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #284 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The MDL Court Orders are VACATED. (twdb) Modified on 2/8/2018 (twdb). Modified on 2/8/2018 (twdb). (Entered: 02/08/2018)

330 #9

Exhibit 15 to 18 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly

#330

(#330) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Negligence Claims filed by Plaintiff Orange County Water District. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #6 Exhibit 5 and 6 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #7 Exhibit 7 to 10 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #8 Exhibit 11 to 14 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #9 Exhibit 15 to 18 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #10 Exhibit 19-22 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #11 Proposed Order) (Axline, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

284 #8

Exhibit 7 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #7

Exhibit 6 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #6

Exhibit 5 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #5

Exhibit 4 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #4

Exhibit 3 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #3

Exhibit 2 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #2

Exhibit 1 to Barnhart Declaration

284 #1

Declaration of Bryan Barnhart

#284

(#331) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #284 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The MDL Court Orders are VACATED. (twdb) Modified on 2/8/2018 (twdb). Modified on 2/8/2018 (twdb). (Entered: 02/08/2018)

609 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#337) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (mt) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#336) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Cormac J. Carney: Status conference held. The Court confers further with counsel confer regarding the proposed case management order as well as various other trial related matters. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (es) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#335) NOTICE OF LODGING filed March 1, 2018 re Order, #334 (Roy, Whitney) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#334) ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The parties are DIRECTED to file a proposed Case Management Order No. 2 consistent with the above instructions by Friday, March 2, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. See document for further information. (twdb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#333) STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Roy, Whitney) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#332) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 03-cv-01742 CJC (DFMx). (esa) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#331) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #284 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The MDL Court Orders are VACATED. (twdb) Modified on 2/8/2018 (twdb). Modified on 2/8/2018 (twdb). (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#330) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Negligence Claims filed by Plaintiff Orange County Water District. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #6 Exhibit 5 and 6 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #7 Exhibit 7 to 10 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #8 Exhibit 11 to 14 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #9 Exhibit 15 to 18 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #10 Exhibit 19-22 to Declaration of Tracey O'Reilly, #11 Proposed Order) (Axline, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#329) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian D Langa counsel for Defendant Petro Diamond Inc. James C. Macdonald will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. James C. Macdonald is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Petro Diamond Inc.. (Langa, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#328) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian D Langa counsel for Defendant Petro Diamond Inc. Brian Donald Langa will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Brian Donald Langa is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Petro Diamond Inc.. (Attorney Brian D Langa added to party Petro Diamond Inc(pty:dft))(Langa, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
324 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#11) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Conocophillips Company (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendants Ultramar Inc, Valero Refining Co pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#9) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Ultramar Inc, Valero Refining Co (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#7) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Atlantic Richfield, BP Products North on 12/5/03 of civil cover sheet; notice of removal; notices of consent to removal; (see document for further details) (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL by defendants Atlantic Richfield, BP Products North (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendants Atlantic Richfield, BP Products North (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#3) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Atlantic Richfield, BP Products North (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-1.4 by defendants Atlantic Richfield, BP Products North (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Orange County Water District. (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendants Atlantic Richfield, BP Products North from Superior Court of California County of Orange Central Justice Center (Case Number: 03CC001776) with copy summons and complaint referred to Discovery Arthur Nakazato. (mt) (Entered: 12/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TESORO PETROLEUM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRONTEXACO is a litigant

Latest cases where USA GASOLINE is a litigant

Latest cases where Valero Refining & Marketing Co is a litigant