This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2015 at 13:18:40 (UTC).

Monsevais, et al v. Wyeth, et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2004 Monsevais filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wyeth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayden Head. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:04-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Hayden Head

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olga Monsevais

Yolanda Monsevais

Defendants

Wyeth

Clayton Lacey

Christopher David Golden

Rafael Sanchez

Jose Pujol, MD

Alejandro Lopez, MD

Rushing & Gonzalez Pharmacy

Jill Hicks

John Does 1-9

Rento Concencion, MD

John Does 10-12

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick J Mulligan

Attorney at The Mulligan Law Firm

2911 Turtle Creek, Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth J Ferguson

Attorney at Gordon Rees LLP

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

David Stanley Lill

Attorney at Bowman Brooke LLP

600 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

J A Tony Canales

Attorney at Canales Simonson PC

2601 Morgan Ave

Corpus Christi, TX 78465

Leslie A Benitez

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Susan E Burnett

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke

2901 Via Fortuna Dr., Suite 500

Austin, TX 78746

Jay Hodges Henderson

Attorney at Henderson Block & Elmore

5020 Montrose Blvd, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77006

Debra Lynn Elmore

Attorney at Henderson Block And Elmore PLLC

5020 Montrose, Ste 300

Houston, TX 77006-6533

Pegi Sue Block

Attorney at Henderson Block & Elmore PLLC

5020 Montrose Blvd, Ste 300

Houston, TX 77006-6533

Thomas Scott Allen, Jr

Attorney at Attorney At Law

440 Louisiana St, Ste 2100

Houston, TX 77002

W Richard Wagner

Attorney at Wagner Cario LLC

7705 Broadway

San Antonio, TX 78229

Ray B Jeffrey

Attorney at Jeffrey & Mitchell PC

2631 Bulverde Rd, Ste 105

Bulverde, TX 78163

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

30 #5

Proposed Order

30 #4

30 #3

30 #2

30 #1

Exhibit

#30

#31

#32

#33

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2005
  • ***Certified copy of docket sheet and certified copy of DE #1 sent to Clerk, Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Philadelphia Division via UPS , filed. (lcayce, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Certified Copy of TRANSFER ORDER from the JPML.() Parties notified.(lcayce, ) (Entered: 04/26/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Letter from Clerk, Eastern District of Pennsylvania re: transfer of this case to MDL 1203 , filed. (lcayce, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER granting #30 Motion to Stay .( Signed by Judge Hayden Head ) Parties notified.(lcayce, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) AGREED MOTION to Stay Proceedings to Permit Settlement Negotiations by Olga Monsevais, Yolanda Monsevais, Wyeth, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 #3 #4 #5 Proposed Order)(lcayce, ) (Entered: 03/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Certified Copy of ORDER re: Notice of Hearing Session from JPML Panel.() Parties notified.(lcayce, ) (Entered: 02/16/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE STAY, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Chief Judge Hayden W. Head Jr ) (drodrigues) (Entered: 07/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER denying [22-1] motion to reconsider [21-1] order to stay , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Chief Judge Hayden W. Head Jr ) (drodrigues) (Entered: 06/04/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER denying as moot [16-1] motion to continue all deadlines under federal rules of civil procedure 26 and 16, local rule and this court's March 5, 2004 order for conference , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Chief Judge Hayden Head Jr ) (drodrigues) (Entered: 05/26/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RESPONSE by Wyeth in opposition to [22-1] motion to reconsider [21-1] order to stay , filed (drodrigues) (Entered: 05/13/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rushing & Gonzalez , filed. (drodrigues) (Entered: 03/26/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE LISTING OF ALL FINANCIALLY INTERESTED PARTIES/ENTITIES by Olga Monsevais, Yolanda Monsevais , filed. (drodrigues) (Entered: 03/24/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alejandro Lopez MD , filed. (drodrigues) (Entered: 03/24/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jose Pujol MD , filed. (lcayce) (Entered: 03/17/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION with brief in support to stay all proceedings pending transfer to MDL-1203 by Wyeth, Motion Docket Date 3/25/04 [6-1] motion , filed (dterrell) (Entered: 03/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 1:15 5/26/04 before Chief Judge Hayden W. Head Jr and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. (dterrell) (Entered: 03/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wyeth ,filed. (dterrell) (Entered: 03/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Demand for jury trial by Wyeth , filed (dterrell) (Entered: 03/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Exhibits to Notice of Removal by Wyeth , filed (dterrell) (Entered: 03/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wyeth filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 2 231466 (located in expanding folders--2 volumes)(dterrell) Modified on 03/10/2004 (Entered: 03/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pegi Sue Block

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J A Tony Canales(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Hodges Henderson