This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2015 at 11:28:14 (UTC).

Miller v. American Home Prod., et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2003 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Home Prod . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth A. Marra. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:03-CV-14331

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth A. Marra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Miller

Arden, NC 28704

Defendants

American Home Products Corp.

Aventis Pasteur, Inc.

Glaxosmithkline

Merck & Co., Inc.

Spectrum Laboratory Products

Eli Lilly And Company

John Doe Corporate Defendants 1-10

M.D. Beau Laguerre

Sigma-Aldrich Corporation

Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ilona M. Demenina

Attorney at The Law Firm of Ilona Demenina Anderson, P.L.

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd., 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33134

L.H. Steven Savola

26919 So. Dixie Hwy.

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Darryl Krevans

Attorney at Conroy Simberg Ganon Krevans Abel Lurvey Morrow & Schefer PA

3440 Hollywood Boulevard, 2Nd Floor

Hollywood, FL 33021

James Pierce Murray

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett

1395 Brickell Avenue, 14Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-3302

Thomas Michael Wood

Attorney at Shumaker Loop & Kendrick

101 E Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 2800 Po Box 172609

Tampa, FL 33672-0609

Barbara Ehrich Locke

6619 S. Dixie Highway, Suite 245

Miami, FL 33143

Francis A. Anania

Attorney at Anania Bandklayder Baumgarten & Torricella

100 Se 2Nd Street, Suite 4300

Miami, FL 33131-2144

Mary Hogan Greer

Attorney at Fullbright & Jaworski

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701-3271

Joshua Royas Levenson

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

515 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Alvin David Lodish

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3400

Miami, FL 33131

Richard Josephson

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Curtis Jay Mase

Attorney at Mase Lara, P.A.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33133

Erich Bernard Neumann

Attorney at Walton Lantaff

9350 S Dixie Highway, 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33156

Natasha K. Alcivar

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1010

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Deborah A. Moeller

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Imogene Lillette Cathey

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon

100 N Tampa Street, Suite 2900 Po Box 898

Tampa, FL 33601-0898

James B. Murphy, Jr.

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon

100 N Tampa Street, Suite 2900 Po Box 898

Tampa, FL 33601-0898

Hugh J. Turner, Jr.

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt & Eidson

350 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-0006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from: Martin County Court FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 222094 ; Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2003)

#2

(#2) MOTION with memorandum in support by Eli Lilly And Compan to dismiss plaintiffs' vaccine-related claims (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2003)

#3

(#3) Notice of court practice in removal cases and ORDER set Removal Status report due on 11/24/03 ( Signed by Judge Donald L. Graham on 11/13/03) [EOD Date: 11/14/03] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2003)

#4

(#4) UNOPPOSED MOTION by Glaxosmithkline to stay proceedings (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

#5

(#5) MOTION with memorandum in support by American Home Prod. etal to dismiss (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Glaxosmithkline for oral argument on [5-1] motion to dismiss (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

#7

(#7) MOTION with memorandum in support by Sigma-Aldrich to dismiss , and alternative to stay (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of joinder in and adoption of vaccine Defts' motion to dismiss and memorandum in support by Sigma-Aldrich (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

#9

(#9) MOTION with memorandum in support by Spectrum Laboratory to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b) (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

#65

(#65) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this cause should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2011. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/11/2011. (ir) (Entered: 07/11/2011)

#67

(#67) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #65 Order to Show Cause by Laura Miller. (Demenina, Ilona) (Entered: 07/30/2011)

68 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#68

(#68) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ilona Demenina. by Laura Miller. Responses due by 10/17/2011 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Demenina, Ilona) (Entered: 09/30/2011)

#69

(#69) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Michael Wood on behalf of Aventis Pasteur, Inc. (Wood, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2011)

#70

(#70) ORDER granting #68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ilona M. Demenina and L.H. Steven Savola terminated. Deadline to obtain new counsel 11/28/2011. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/8/2011. (ir) (Entered: 11/08/2011)

71 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#71

(#71) MOTION to Dismiss #70 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Sigma-Aldrich Corporation. Responses due by 4/16/2012 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 03/28/2012)

#72

(#72) FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #71 Motion to Dismiss. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/1/2012. (ir) (Entered: 05/02/2012)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #71 Motion to Dismiss. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/1/2012. (ir) (Entered: 05/02/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) MOTION to Dismiss #70 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Sigma-Aldrich Corporation. Responses due by 4/16/2012 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 03/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ORDER granting #68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ilona M. Demenina and L.H. Steven Savola terminated. Deadline to obtain new counsel 11/28/2011. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/8/2011. (ir) (Entered: 11/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Michael Wood on behalf of Aventis Pasteur, Inc. (Wood, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ilona Demenina. by Laura Miller. Responses due by 10/17/2011 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Demenina, Ilona) (Entered: 09/30/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #65 Order to Show Cause by Laura Miller. (Demenina, Ilona) (Entered: 07/30/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ilona M. Demenina on behalf of Laura Miller (Demenina, Ilona) (Entered: 07/30/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this cause should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2011. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/11/2011. (ir) (Entered: 07/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE re #63 Status Report filed by Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories. Responses due by 6/17/2011. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/18/2011. (ir) (Entered: 05/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) STATUS REPORT April 2011 by Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories (Anania, Francis) (Entered: 04/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action. by Glaxosmithkline (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION with memorandum in support by Spectrum Laboratory to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b) (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of joinder in and adoption of vaccine Defts' motion to dismiss and memorandum in support by Sigma-Aldrich (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION with memorandum in support by Sigma-Aldrich to dismiss , and alternative to stay (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Glaxosmithkline for oral argument on [5-1] motion to dismiss (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION with memorandum in support by American Home Prod. etal to dismiss (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) UNOPPOSED MOTION by Glaxosmithkline to stay proceedings (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of court practice in removal cases and ORDER set Removal Status report due on 11/24/03 ( Signed by Judge Donald L. Graham on 11/13/03) [EOD Date: 11/14/03] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION with memorandum in support by Eli Lilly And Compan to dismiss plaintiffs' vaccine-related claims (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from: Martin County Court FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 222094 ; Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Home Products Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where SANOFI PASTEUR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sigma-Aldrich Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ELI LILLY AND COMPANY is a litigant