Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/25/2015 at 10:16:26 (UTC).

Miller et al v. E I DuPont DeNemours and Company Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2006 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against E I DuPont DeNemours and Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thad Heartfield. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:06-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thad Heartfield

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephens E Miller

Cynthia Miller

Defendants

E I DuPont DeNemours and Company Inc

Ashland Inc

Atlantic Richfield Company

Aristech Chemical Corporation

Berryman Products Inc

BP Products North America Inc

BP Corporation North America Inc

BP Amoco Chemical Company

ConocoPhillips Company

Conoco Inc

CRC Industries Inc

Delaware USS Corporation

ExxonMobil Corporation

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Marvel Oil Company Inc

Mobil Chemical Company Inc

PPG Inc

PPG Industries Inc

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance Henry Lubel

Attorney at Lubel Voyles, LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Joseph Donald Carona, Jr

Attorney at Law Offices of Martin Dies

1009 W Green

Orange, TX 77630-5619

Defendant Attorneys

Morris C Carrington

Attorney at Mehaffy & Weber - Beaumont

P.O. Box 16

Beaumont, TX 77704-0016

Andrew C Schirrmeister, III

Attorney at Schirrmeister Diaz-Arrastia Brem LLP

700 Milam, 10Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

James Gene Martingano

Attorney at Mehaffy Weber, PC - Houston

500 Dallas, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77002

Ricky Anthony Raven

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP - Houston

333 Clay St, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002-4499

Lakesha Deneen Harris

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP - Houston

333 Clay St, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002-4499

James B Galbraith

Attorney at McLeod Alexander Powel & Apffel - Galveston

P O Box 629, 802 Rosenberg

Galveston, TX 77553-0629

Robert Philip Scott

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

700 Louisiana, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Michael L Baker

Attorney at Strong Pipkin Bissell & Ledyard - Beaumont

595 Orleans, 1400 San Jacinto Bldg

Beaumont, TX 77701

Vic Houston Henry

Attorney at Henry Oddo Austin & Fletcher

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Rosalyn Renee Tippett

Attorney at Henry Oddo Austin & Fletcher, PC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Raymond Lyn Stevens

Attorney at Stevens Baldo, Freeman & Lighty LLP

550 Fannin St, Suite 700

Beaumont, TX 77701-4950

Andre M Landry, III

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. - Houston

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Other Attorneys

James Michael Riley, Jr

Attorney at Coats Rose Yale Ryamn & Lee PC - Houston

9 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77046

James Jonathan McGoldrick

Attorney at Jones Carr McGoldrick

5307 E Mockingbird Ln, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75206

Kevin Allen Koudelka

Attorney at Richardson Koudelka, LLP

4144 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1260

Dallas, TX 75204

David W Ledyard

Attorney at Strong Pipkin Bissell & Ledyard LLP - Beaumont

595 Orleans, 1400 San Jacinto Bldg

Beaumont, TX 77701-3255

Lance Dion Leisure

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

700 Louisiana, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Marquel Sautural Jordan

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

700 Louisiana, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #7

State court docket & Pleadings

1 #6

List of Counsel

1 #5

Index

1 #4

Ntc to State Court of Removal

1 #3

Pltf's Original Petition w/ Jury Demand

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, from Orange County, TX, case number A060292-C. (Filing fee $ 350/Receipt # 1-1-2735). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Pltf's Original Petition w/ Jury Demand#3 Ntc to State Court of Removal#4 Index#5 List of Counsel#6 State court docket & Pleadings)(dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Pltf's Original Petition) by BP Amoco Chemical Company. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Pltf's Original Petition) by Atlantic Richfield Company. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

20 #9

Exhibit H

20 #2

Exhibit A

#20

(#34) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Remand. Ordered that this civil action shall be remanded to the 128th Judicial District Court of Orange County, TX.The Court futher orders the following motions denied as moot #25 Motion to Dismiss; #26 Motion to Dismiss; #28 Motion to Dismiss; #29 Motion to Dismiss and #32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 10/26/06. (fbc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

#25

(#34) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Remand. Ordered that this civil action shall be remanded to the 128th Judicial District Court of Orange County, TX.The Court futher orders the following motions denied as moot #25 Motion to Dismiss; #26 Motion to Dismiss; #28 Motion to Dismiss; #29 Motion to Dismiss and #32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 10/26/06. (fbc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

#26

(#34) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Remand. Ordered that this civil action shall be remanded to the 128th Judicial District Court of Orange County, TX.The Court futher orders the following motions denied as moot #25 Motion to Dismiss; #26 Motion to Dismiss; #28 Motion to Dismiss; #29 Motion to Dismiss and #32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 10/26/06. (fbc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

28 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#29

(#29) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Aristech Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Imp Venue Dismissal)(Scott, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2006)

#35

(#35) Letter of remand to the Orange County District Clerk with e-notifcation to attorneys. (fbc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

#36

(#36) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the District Clerk of Orange, TX of remand order and docket sheet on 10/27/06.. (bjc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the District Clerk of Orange, TX of remand order and docket sheet on 10/27/06.. (bjc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Letter of remand to the Orange County District Clerk with e-notifcation to attorneys. (fbc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Remand. Ordered that this civil action shall be remanded to the 128th Judicial District Court of Orange County, TX.The Court futher orders the following motions denied as moot #25 Motion to Dismiss; #26 Motion to Dismiss; #28 Motion to Dismiss; #29 Motion to Dismiss and #32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 10/26/06. (fbc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • Magistrate Consent Form e-mailed to attorney James McGoldrick for Safety-Kleen Systems Inc (tkd, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safety-Kleen Systems Inc.(McGoldrick, James) (Entered: 10/26/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Marvel Oil Company Inc. (Stevens, Raymond) (Entered: 10/25/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ***PROPOSED ORDER FILED IN ERROR AS A MOTION; TERMINATED MOTION.*** MOTION to Dismiss Failure to State A Claim by Aristech Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Failure to State A Claim dismissal)(Scott, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2006 (mrp, ). (Entered: 10/20/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Aristech Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Imp Venue Dismissal)(Scott, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION to Dismiss Failure to State Claim by Aristech Chemical Corporation. (Scott, Robert) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2006 (mrp, ). Modified on 10/20/2006 (mrp, ). (Entered: 10/20/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aristech Chemical Corporation.(Scott, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2006
  • ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 8, answer. WRONG PDF ATTACHED PER ATTY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by CRC Industries Inc.(Henry, Vic) (Entered: 08/31/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG PDF ATTACHED PER ATTY. SEE CORRECTED DOC# 12.*** Original ANSWER to Complaint by E I DuPont DeNemours and Company Inc.(Carrington, Morris) Modified on 9/6/2006 (bjc, ). (Entered: 08/31/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Consent Form electronically sent to Ricky Anthony Raven atty for Ashland Inc (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Plaintiffs' Original Petition) by Ashland Inc.(Raven, Ricky) (Entered: 08/25/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Consent Form electronically sent to counsel for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Conoco Inc, PPG Inc, PPG Industries Inc, Stephens E Miller, Cynthia Miller (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Pltf's Original Petition) by Atlantic Richfield Company. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Pltf's Original Petition) by BP Amoco Chemical Company. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, from Orange County, TX, case number A060292-C. (Filing fee $ 350/Receipt # 1-1-2735). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Pltf's Original Petition w/ Jury Demand#3 Ntc to State Court of Removal#4 Index#5 List of Counsel#6 State court docket & Pleadings)(dlc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marvel Oil Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Conoco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PPG Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant