This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2022 at 12:29:14 (UTC).

MDL No. 1917 In Re: Cathode Ray Tube (CRT) Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 11/26/2007 MDL No 1917 In Re Cathode Ray Tube CRT Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon S. Tigar and Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:07-CV-05944

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2007

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABC Appliance, Inc.

Janet Ackerman

Patricia Andrews

Arch Electronics, Inc

Adrienne Belai

Best Buy Co., Inc.

Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.

Best Buy Purchasing LLC

Best Buy Stores, L.P.

Best Buy.com LLC

Edward Breivik

James Brown

Travis Burau

357 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip J Iovieno

William A. Isaacson

Kevin Bruce Love

Linda Phyllis Nussbaum

Anthony J. Bolognese

Robert N. Kaplan

Joshua H. Grabar

822 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#6117

(#6117) NOTICE of Appearance of Melanie Ann Porter as Counsel, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class (Porter, Melanie) (Filed on 12/13/2022) Modified on 12/14/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#6116

(#6116) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #6067 Motion.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

#6115

(#6115) ORDER ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6112 Notice (Other), filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 6, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#6114

(#6114) ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO PUBLISH NOTICE OF IPPS' SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP. by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #6111 Stipulation. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#6112

(#6112) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON IRICO'S FAILURE TO PRODUCE SU XIAOHUA FOR DEPOSITION by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #6107 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - Special Master, #6101 Statement, (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#6111

(#6111) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO PUBLISH NOTICE OF IPPS SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP re #6104 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/17/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

6101 #6101

Main Document

6067 #2

Proposed Order Granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Disseminate

6067 #1

Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs

6067 #6067

Main Document

#6042

(#6113) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is the Motion to Disseminate Notice of Direct Purchaser Class Certification re #6042 Order on Motion to Certify Class. ECF No. #6067 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, December 8, 2022 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#1

2 #1

standing order and cmc order

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

12,805 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6117) NOTICE of Appearance of Melanie Ann Porter as Counsel, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class (Porter, Melanie) (Filed on 12/13/2022) Modified on 12/14/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6116) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #6067 Motion.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6115) ORDER ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6112 Notice (Other), filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 6, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6114) ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO PUBLISH NOTICE OF IPPS' SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP. by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #6111 Stipulation. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6113) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is the Motion to Disseminate Notice of Direct Purchaser Class Certification re #6042 Order on Motion to Certify Class. ECF No. #6067 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, December 8, 2022 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6112) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON IRICO'S FAILURE TO PRODUCE SU XIAOHUA FOR DEPOSITION by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #6107 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - Special Master, #6101 Statement, (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6111) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO PUBLISH NOTICE OF IPPS SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP re #6104 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/17/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6110) Transcript Designation Form re #6080 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit by Bonsignore Trial Lawyers, PLLC. Transcript due by 11/4/2022. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2022) Modified on 11/7/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6109) Transcript Designation Form - No Transcripts Designated re #6079 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit by Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla. Transcript due by 11/4/2022. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 11/4/2022) Modified on 11/7/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6108) Transcript Designation Form - No Transcripts Designated re #6081 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit. Transcript due by 12/2/2022. (Kirkham, Tracy) (Filed on 11/4/2022) Modified on 11/7/2022 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6,182 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2007
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued as to Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Orion Electric Co., Ltd., Orion America, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samtel Color, Ltd., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hitachi, Ltd. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/06/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Docket(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Crago, Inc. as to Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Orion Electric Co., Ltd., Orion America, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samtel Color, Ltd., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hitachi, Ltd.. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/06/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #3 Motion to Relate Case C-07-5944 and C-07-5981. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Order re #3 MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED], #4 Declaration in Support, [PROPOSED ORDER RELATING CASES] by Nathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration of ERIC B. FASTIFF in Support of #3 MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] [DECLARATION OF ERIC B. FASTIFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] filed byNathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] filed by Nathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • DocketCASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Orion Electric Co., Ltd., Orion America, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samtel Color, Ltd., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hitachi, Ltd.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/29/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2008 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 standing order and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (summons issued); against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611012787.). Filed byCrago, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (aaa, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less