Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 16:09:47 (UTC).

MDL No. 1917 In Re: Cathode Ray Tube (CRT) Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 11/26/2007 MDL No 1917 In Re Cathode Ray Tube CRT Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:07-CV-05944

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2007

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ABC Appliance, Inc.

Janet Ackerman

James E. Allee

Patricia Andrews

Arch Electronics, Inc

Art's TV & Appliance

Adrienne Belai

Charles Benson

Best Buy Co., Inc.

Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.

Best Buy Purchasing LLC

Best Buy Stores, L.P.

Best Buy.com LLC

Edward Breivik

Lawrence, NJ 08648

James Brown

Jim Brown

Travis Burau

Barbara Caldwell

Paula Call

San Francisco, CA 94111

Carroll Cut-Rate Furniture

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

Carroll Cut-Rate Furniture

313 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip J Iovieno

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

William A. Isaacson

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jennifer Milici

Attorney at Boies Schiller and Flexner LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20015

Anne M. Nardacci

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

Christopher V. Fenlon

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

Andrew J. Morganti

Attorney at Milberg LLP

One Pennsylvania Plaza

New York, NY 10119-0165

Peter G.A. Safirstein

Attorney at Safirstein Metcalf LLP

1250 Broadway, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Shpetim Ademi

3620 E. Layton Ave.

Cudahy, WI 53110

Guri Ademi

Attorney at Ademi & O'Reilly LLP

3620 East Layton Avenue

Cudahy, WI 53110

Jayne A. Goldstein

Attorney at Mager & Goldstein LLP

1640 Town Center Circle, Suite 216

Weston, FL 33326

Manfred Patrick Muecke

Attorney at Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman, & Balint, P.C.

600 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Jeff S. Westerman

Attorney at Westerman Law Corp

1875 Century Park East, Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gary L. Halling

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4106

Gregory K Arenson

Attorney at Kaplan Fox and Kilsheimer LLP

850 Third Ave., 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Joshua H. Grabar

Attorney at Grabar Law Office

1500 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 320

Philadelphia, PA 19102

James P. McCarthy

Attorney at Lindquist & Vennum

Linda Phyllis Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-8718

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP

805 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Kevin Bruce Love

Attorney at Hanzman Criden & Love, P.A.

7301 Sw 57Th Court, Suite 515

South Miami, FL 33143

Anthony J. Bolognese

Attorney at Bolognese & Associates LLC

1500 Jfk Boulevard

Philadelphia, PA 19102

702 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

5584 #2

B - Proposed IPP Second Amended Class Action Complaint

5584 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed IPP Fifth CAC

#5584

(#5584) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONDITIONALLY AMEND COMPLAINTS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed IPP Fifth CAC, #2 B - Proposed IPP Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/13/2019) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

5583 #4

*Restricted*

5583 #3

Redacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint

5583 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal

5583 #1

Declaration Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro ISO Administrative Motion to File D

#5583

(#5583) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro ISO Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/13/2019) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#5582

(#5582) NOTICE of Change of Address by Anna Marie Konradi (Konradi, Anna) (Filed on 9/12/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#5581

(#5581) ORDER TERMINATING MOTION TO INTERVENE re #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Motions terminated: #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

5564 #1

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (summons issued); against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611012787.). Filed byCrago, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (aaa, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/27/2007)

2 #1

standing order and cmc order

#2

(#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/29/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2008 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 standing order and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

#3

(#6) ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #3 Motion to Relate Case C-07-5944 and C-07-5981. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)

#4

(#5) Proposed Order re #3 MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED], #4 Declaration in Support, [PROPOSED ORDER RELATING CASES] by Nathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

#5

(#5) Proposed Order re #3 MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED], #4 Declaration in Support, [PROPOSED ORDER RELATING CASES] by Nathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #3 Motion to Relate Case C-07-5944 and C-07-5981. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)

13,399 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5584) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONDITIONALLY AMEND COMPLAINTS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed IPP Fifth CAC, #2 B - Proposed IPP Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/13/2019) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5583) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro ISO Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/13/2019) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5582) NOTICE of Change of Address by Anna Marie Konradi (Konradi, Anna) (Filed on 9/12/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5581) ORDER TERMINATING MOTION TO INTERVENE re #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Motions terminated: #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5580) Joinder re #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, by Tatung Company of America, Inc.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5579) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5578) ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF LIAISON COUNSEL FOR NON-REPEALER STATES re #5576 NOTICE filed by Non-Repealer State Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5577) ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF LIAISON COUNSEL FOR STATES OF ARKANSAS, MASSACHUSETTS, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NEW HAMPSHIRE, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, SOUTH CAROLINA, AND UTAH. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5576) NOTICE re Submission of [Proposed] Order Appointing Liaison Counsel by Non-Repealer State Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kirkham, Tracy) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5575) NOTICE of submission of [proposed] order appointing liaison counsel by Omitted Repealer State Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5,627 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2007
  • Amended Summons Issued as to Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Orion Electric Co., Ltd., Orion America, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samtel Color, Ltd., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hitachi, Ltd. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/06/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • (#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Crago, Inc. as to Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Orion Electric Co., Ltd., Orion America, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samtel Color, Ltd., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hitachi, Ltd.. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/06/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #3 Motion to Relate Case C-07-5944 and C-07-5981. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Order re #3 MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED], #4 Declaration in Support, [PROPOSED ORDER RELATING CASES] by Nathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration of ERIC B. FASTIFF in Support of #3 MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] [DECLARATION OF ERIC B. FASTIFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] filed byNathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Relate Case [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] filed by Nathan Muchnick, Inc.. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • Summons Issued as to Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Orion Electric Co., Ltd., Orion America, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samtel Color, Ltd., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hitachi, Ltd.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/29/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2008 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 standing order and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (summons issued); against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611012787.). Filed byCrago, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (aaa, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/27/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC Appliance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST BUY STORES L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant