Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2017 at 11:49:21 (UTC).

Linde et al v. Arab Bank, PLC

Case Summary

On 07/02/2004 Linde filed an Other lawsuit against Arab Bank, PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:04-CV-02799

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frederick and Sherri Mandell

Matanya Nathansen

Michael Goldstein

Chana Nathansen

Eliana Mandell

Avraham Mandell

Barbara Ingardia

David Goldstein

Netanel Fenichel

Yehuda Toporowitch

Isabelle Kirschenbaum

Jennifer Hawkinson

Rivka Toporowitch

Michal Honickman

Julie Averbach

Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs

Respondent

Israel Discount Bank, Ltd.

3Rd Party Defendants

Mercantile Discount Bank Ltd.

Israel Discount Bank of New York

Israel Discount Bank Ltd.

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter R. Kolker

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Peter A. Binkow

Attorney at Law Offices of Lionel Z. Glancy

1801 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 308

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William A. Maher

Attorney at Wolmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

500 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Naomi B Weinberg

Attorney at OSEN LLC

David H. Wollmuth

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Mark S Werbner

Attorney at Sayles Werbner

1201 Elm Street, 4400 Renaissance Tower

Dallas, TX 75270

Joshua D. Glatter

565 Fifth Avenue, Seventh Floor

New York, NY 10017

Clyde T. Turner

Attorney at Turner and Associates

4705 Somers Ave, Suite 100

North Little Rock, AR 72116

Shawn Patrick Naunton

Attorney at Zuckerman Spader LLP

399 Park Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Respondent Attorneys

David L. Barres

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.

666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Stephen C. Lee

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

219 S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Jennifer R. Cowan

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Other Attorneys

Eric M. Falkenberry

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

David Grant Hille

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Steven M. Steingard

Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, PC

One South Broad Street, Suite 2100

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Cara Edwards

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Anthony Paul Coles

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Christopher Mark Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 Thirteenth Street

Washington, DC 20005

Michael D. Burrows

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Douglas Walter Mateyaschuk

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1524 #4

Proposed Order

1524 #3

Declaration

1524 #2

Attorney Affirmation

1524 #1

Affidavit

#1524

(#1524) Notice of MOTION for Settlement of Estate Claims by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attorney Affirmation, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 05/24/2017)

#1522

(#1522) REDACTED ORDER granting (1518) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1370) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/18/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

#1521

(#1521) REDACTED ORDER granting (1515) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1367) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/17/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

1518 #4

Proposed Order

1518 #3

Declaration

1518 #2

Attorney Affirmation

1518 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and request for a pre-motion conference, dtd 8/18/2004; filed by Arab Bank, PLC. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 08/27/2004)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Clara Ben-Zaken, Frances Boland, Shoshana Burgette, Deborah Fenichel, Ilanet Fenichel, Moshe Fenichel, Netanel Fenichel, Chana Freedman, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, Gloria Kushner, Courtney Linde, John Linde Sr., Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Naphtali Nevies, Rebecca Nevies, Mathew Parsons, Blumy Rom, Eileen Sapadin, Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chaya Ben-Zaken Zilberstein, Ran Zilberstein re #4 Amended Complaint,,,, (Baron, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2004)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Frances Boland, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, Courtney Linde, Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Blumy Rom, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch. Arab Bank, PLC served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004. (Baron, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2004)

#4

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Clara Ben-Zaken, Frances Boland, Shoshana Burgette, Deborah Fenichel, Ilanet Fenichel, Moshe Fenichel, Netanel Fenichel, Chana Freedman, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, Gloria Kushner, Courtney Linde, John Linde Sr., Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Naphtali Nevies, Rebecca Nevies, Mathew Parsons, Blumy Rom, Eileen Sapadin, Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chaya Ben-Zaken Zilberstein, Ran Zilberstein re #4 Amended Complaint,,,, (Baron, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2004)

#2

(#2) Letter from Randall R. Rainer to Hon. Nina Gershon Regarding scheduling. (Bagdasarian, Sabrina) (Entered: 08/04/2004)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arab Bank, PLC filing fee $ 150, receipt number 296193, filed by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Frances Boland, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, Courtney Linde, Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Blumy Rom, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2004)

3,273 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1524) Notice of MOTION for Settlement of Estate Claims by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attorney Affirmation, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 05/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1522) REDACTED ORDER granting (1518) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1370) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/18/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1521) REDACTED ORDER granting (1515) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1367) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/17/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1518) Notice of MOTION for Settlement of Estate Claims by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attorney Affirmation, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1515) Notice of MOTION for Settlement of Estate Claims by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attorney Affirmation, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1514) REDACTED ORDER granting (1507) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1359) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/26/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1512) REDACTED ORDER granting (1509) Motion for Approval of Infant Compromise in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1361) Motion for Approval of Infant Compromise in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/26/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1509) Notice of MOTION for Approval of Infant Compromise by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attorney Affirmation, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1507) Notice of MOTION for Settlement of Estate Claims by Courtney Linde, et al. Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attorney Affirmation, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 04/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1506) ORDER granting (1499) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK; granting (1351) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/12/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02799-BMC-PK, 1:05-cv-00365-BMC-PK (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,629 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and request for a pre-motion conference, dtd 8/18/2004; filed by Arab Bank, PLC. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 08/27/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2004
  • (#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard T. Marooney, Jr. Esq. returned as attempted not known. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/18/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Clara Ben-Zaken, Frances Boland, Shoshana Burgette, Deborah Fenichel, Ilanet Fenichel, Moshe Fenichel, Netanel Fenichel, Chana Freedman, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, Gloria Kushner, Courtney Linde, John Linde Sr., Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Naphtali Nevies, Rebecca Nevies, Mathew Parsons, Blumy Rom, Eileen Sapadin, Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chaya Ben-Zaken Zilberstein, Ran Zilberstein re #4 Amended Complaint,,,, (Baron, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Frances Boland, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, Courtney Linde, Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Blumy Rom, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch. Arab Bank, PLC served on 7/7/2004, answer due 7/27/2004. (Baron, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arab Bank, PLC, filed by Deborah Fenichel, Naphtali Nevies, Rebecca Nevies, Ilanet Fenichel, Moshe Fenichel, Netanel Fenichel, Danielle Teitelbaum, David Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Shoshana Burgette, Mathew Parsons, Martin Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Gloria Kushner, Clara Ben-Zaken, Chaya Ben-Zaken Zilberstein, Ran Zilberstein, Yehuda Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Chana Freedman, Eileen Sapadin, Michael Averbach, John Linde Sr., Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Frances Boland, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, Courtney Linde, Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Blumy Rom, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch.(Baron, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • (#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER dated 7/28/04 that defendants time to answer on or before 9/9/04. ( Signed by Judge Nina Gershon on 7/28/04 )(Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/05/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter from Randall R. Rainer to Hon. Nina Gershon Regarding scheduling. (Bagdasarian, Sabrina) (Entered: 08/04/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • ECF registration forms have been mailed, so that all filings may be made electronically. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • Summons Issued as to Arab Bank, PLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Arab Bank, PLC filing fee $ 150, receipt number 296193, filed by Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Frances Boland, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Jennifer Hawkinson, Barbara Ingardia, Kimberly Jasper, Courtney Linde, Avraham Mandell, Daniel Mandell, Eliana Mandell, Frederick Mandell, Frederick and Sherri Mandell, Sherri Mandell, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Matanya and Chana Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Blumy Rom, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercantile Discount Bank Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Israel Discount Bank of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony P. Coles Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Grant Hille