Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2021 at 19:10:45 (UTC).

Lehman Brothers Bank v. Beverly Hills Estate, et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2003 Lehman Brothers Bank filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Beverly Hills Estate. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marc L. Goldman and Dean D. Pregerson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:03-CV-02702

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Marc L. Goldman

Presiding Judge

Dean D. Pregerson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

John Z. Jeppesen

Defendants, Intervenor Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Nicole LaViolette

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Charles Elliott Fitzgerald

Gregory Van Orman

Wilshire Equipment Rentals, Inc

Beverly Hills Construction Management, LLC

Beverly Hills Developement Corporation

J Gregory Van Orman

A-1 Appraisal Service

Prudential California Realty-John Aaroe Division

Erica Bastiaans

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Michael Fitzgerald

Alpine, UT 84004

Matthew Todd Compton

Clayton, NC 27527

Beverly Hills Estates Funding Inc

Eoin Kreditor

John Greg Van Orman

Del Fern LLC

Lila Rizk

2601 Bowmont Drive LLC

Summit Ridge LLC

Intervenor Defendants, Counter Claimants and Cross Claimants

Eoin Kreditor

Michael Fitzgerald

Alpine, UT 84004

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Intervenor Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Charles Elliott Fitzgerald

Wilshire Equipment Rentals, Inc

Beverly Hills Developement Corporation

Michael Fitzgerald

Alpine, UT 84004

Beverly Hills Estates Funding Inc

146 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Intervenor Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michael S Wildermuth

Attorney at Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth and Wynner PC

31248 Oak Crest Drive Suite 100

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Victor A Sahn

Attorney at SulmeyerKupetz APC

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1406

Israel Saperstein

Attorney at Saperstein Law Firm

625 25Th St

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

John L Hosack

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer APC

18400 Von Karman Avenue Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-0514

James Robert Evans, Jr

Attorney at Fulbright and Jaworski

555 South Flower Street, 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Nancy E Encarnacion

Attorney at Anderson McPharlin & Conners

444 S Flower St, 31St Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

Cecilia A Perkins

Attorney at Cadden & Fuller

114 Pacifica, Suite 150

Irvine, CA 92618-3326

Suzanne M Hankins

Attorney at Severson and Werson APC

19100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Ernest E Price

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Cathy Q T Pham Zotti

Attorney at Wellman and Warren LLP

24411 Ridge Route Suite 200

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Mark Andrew Byrne

Attorney at Byrne and Nixon

800 West 6Th Street Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David W Wiechert

Attorney at Law Office of David W Wiechert

27136 Paseo Espada Building B Suite 1123

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

Kendra S McNally

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

Brian T Glennon

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Jennifer Anne Carmassi

Attorney at Latham and Watkins

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Stanley I Greenberg

6080 Center Drive Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90045-1574

Alexander Rufus-Isaacs

9601 Wlshire Boulevard Suite 710

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Michael H Rosenstein

Attorney at Michael H Rosenstein Law Offices

433 North Camden Drive Suite 400

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Douglas B Schwab

Attorney at Douglas B Schwab Law Offices

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 2410

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stephen D Miller

360 North Bedford Drive, Suite 204

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

81 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1706

No Description Available

#1643

No Description Available

#1551

No Description Available

#2023

No Description Available

1909 #4

Exhibit 3

1874 #2

Proposed Order

1743 #1

Second Declaration of Arnold E. Sklar

#1763

RESTRICTED

#1527

No Description Available

#1448

No Description Available

#1318

No Description Available

#1124

No Description Available

#397

No Description Available

#38

No Description Available

797 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2173) RECEIVER'S FINAL FINANCIAL REPORT filed by Receiver David J Pasternak. (Pasternak, David) (Entered: 05/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2172) Mail Returned addressed to Jamison Matykowski re #2165 (jre) (Entered: 11/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2171) Mail Returned addressed to Jan van Orman re order #2165 (lc) (Entered: 11/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2170) Mail Returned addressed to Kyle Grasso re Minutes #2164 (lc) (Entered: 11/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2169) Mail Returned addressed to Kyle Grasso re Order #2165 (lc) (Entered: 11/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2168) Mail Returned addressed to Jamieson Matykowski re minutes #2164 (lc) (Entered: 11/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2167) Mail Returned addressed to Jan Van Orman (Deceased) re Order on Motion for Order, Motion Hearing,, #2164 (jre) (Entered: 11/02/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2166) NOTICE of Entry of RULING filed by RECEIVER David J Pasternak. (Pasternak, David) (Entered: 10/25/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2165) ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT, ETC. by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:Fees and reimbursement of costs for the Receiver for the time period since November 1, 2006 are hereby approved and settled in the total amount of $506,200.80 (which includes a bonus in the amount of $62,500), of which theamount of $400,641.15 has been paid and the amount of $105,559.65 is unpaid.Fees and reimbursement of costs for the Receivers attorneys, Buchalter Nemer, P.C. for the time period since November 1, 2006 are hereby approved and settled in the total amount of $818,755.98 (which includes a bonus in theamount of $31,250), of which the amount of $768,641.84 has been paid and the amount of $50,114.14 is unpaid;Fees and reimbursement of costs for theReceivers Utah attorney, Julian D. Jensen, PC for the time period since November 1, 2006 are hereby approved and settled in the total amountof $4,297.09, all of which has been paid;Fees and reimbursement of costs for theReceivers tax attorneys, the Law Offices of A. Lavar Taylor for the time period since November1, 2006 are hereby approved and settled in thetotal amount of $49,921.65, all of which has been paid;Fees and reimbursement of costs for the Receivers forensic accountants/tax preparers, Crowe Horwath LLP for the time period since November 1, 2006 are hereby approved andsettled in the total amount of $532,777.94 (which includes a bonus in the amount of $31,250), of which the amount of $491,921.94 has been paid and the amount of $40,856.00 is unpaid;Fees and reimbursement of costs for theReceivers computer consultants, System Integration Consultants, for the time period since November 1, 2006 are hereby approved and settled in the total amount of $26,424.40, all of which has been paid;The Receiver shall disburse the balance of the funds in this receivership in accordance with his Final Report and Account as follows: The Receiver shall disburse $469,769.50 to Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB or its successors or assigns (collectively "Lehman") for the Lehman portion of collected property taxes refunds; The Receiver shall disburse $474,769.50 to RBC Mortgage Company of California, Inc. or its successors or assigns for its portion of collected property tax refunds. (see document for other specifics).The judgment in favor of the Receiver andagainst David Eisenberg and all of the Receiver's rights under the Settlement and Release Agreement executed on or about February 2, 2012 by David Eisenberg are hereby assigned in full to Lehman;The Receiver is discharged from any further duties or responsibilities, and the receivership is hereby terminated;11. All bonds posted herein are hereby exonerated with respect to this action only. (lc) (Entered: 10/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2164) MINUTES OF HEARING OF RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT AND MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS (DOCKET NUMBER #2151 ) held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court and counsel confer as reflected on the record. The motion is granted with an order to be issued hereafter. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jre) (Entered: 10/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,740 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#10) DECLARATION of ALEJANDRO VENEZUELA by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#9) DECLARATION of JENNIFER NORRIS by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#8) DECLARATION of ANDREA QUINONES by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#7) DECLARATION of RUTH DIXON by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#6) DECLARATION of SUZANNE M HANKINS by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#5) DECLARATION of SUSAN K MILLER by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#4) DECLARATION of JON DAVIS by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank in support of ex parte application for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents [3-1], ex parte application appointment of a temporary receiver [3-2], ex parte application issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed [3-3] (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#3) EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank for issuance of a temporary restraining order to freeze the assets of the company defendants and to prohibit the defendants from destroying pertinent documents , appointment of a temporary receiver , issuance of an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued and a permanent receiver should not be appointed Lodged propsd order (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Lehman Brothers Bank (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) issued referred to Discovery Paul L. Abrams (jag) (Entered: 04/18/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-1 Appraisal Service is a litigant

Latest cases where Summit Ridge LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Beverly Hills Construction Management, LLC is a litigant