This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2023 at 11:51:06 (UTC).

In re Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/20/2005 In re Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:05-MD-01720

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joe's Crab Shack - Abingdon MD, Inc.

William-Sonoma Inc.

Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO

Reid Petroleum

Joe's Crab Shack - Alabama Private Club, Inc.

Interested Parties

Parkside Movies 14

Hampton Allied Pharmacy

Mon Ami Gabi Development LLC, DBA Mon Ami Gabi - Oakbrook

Medical Center Pharmacy of Durant

Wayside South LLC

G&M Oil Co., Inc.

Patada Retail Consulting

Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Keewatin Sinclair

Valentine Stores, Inc.

Alsaker Corp/Broadway Truck Stops

Coulee View Enterprises LLC

National ATM Council, Inc.

Sunoco APlus Mini Market #5033 (Perwil Inc)

2,964 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Daniel Lawrence Berger

Hae Sung Nam

William A. Gengler

Gary B. Friedman

Justin Collins

Robert N. Kaplan

Ryan G. Kriger

Benjamin R. Nagin

Thomas J. Undlin

Yeshimebet Abebe

Morissa Robin Falk

731 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

8832 #1

Exhibit [PROPOSED] COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

#8832

(#8832) Second MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support by Jack Rabbit LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [PROPOSED] COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) (Bacharach, N.) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

8831 #2

Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitaes

8831 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order Appointing Special Master

#8831

(#8831) Letter from Rule 23(b)(3) Class Counsel in response to the Court's minute entry, ECF No. 8828 by Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Appointing Special Master, #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitaes) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#8830

(#8830) NOTICE by CryoServices, Inc., Dell Fox Jewelry LLC, Hayley Lanning, SBG Designs, LLC (Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Benjamin E. Shiftan) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#8829

(#8829) NOTICE by Plaintiffs in Civil Action Grubhub Holdings Inc., et al. v. Visa, et al., 1:19-cv-06555 re #8097 Notice of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Joinder In Target Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Wilson, James) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#8828

(#8828) Minute entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On May 11, 2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6F North, the Court heard from the parties and objectors. Damages action:The parties will first try to resolve service awards issue in view of the Second Circuit decision, but if they are unable to do so, Class Counsel will advise the Court and file a motion and the Court will give objectors an opportunity to respond. On or before May 18, 2023, the parties shall submit the names of at least two additional potential candidates for special master as well as a proposed order regarding the role of the special master; the Court will give other parties the opportunity to respond to the proposal. The Court will consider requests from counsel to be appointed to represent the franchisees as a class; and Class Counsel will have the opportunity to explain why current counsel can fairly present the issues to the special master and why the Court should delay any appointment of counsel to represent the franchisees. Jack Rabbit will serve a second renewed motion to intervene on or before May 18, 2023; Class Counsel and Old Jericho Plaintiffs (and any other party) will serve a response on or before June 1, 2023; Jack Rabbit will serve and file any reply on or before June 8, 2023. Equitable Relief Action, opt-out actions and actions filed after the (b)(3) settlement:On or before June 11, 2023, the parties will advise the Court as to whether they would like to supplement their response to Defendants' summary judgment motion to address the issue of direct evidence of an anticompetitive effect in the two-sided transaction market. See 1-800 Contacts, Inc., 1 F.4th 102 (2d Cir. 2021); see also Brooke Group Ltd. v. Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corp., 509 U.S. 209, 242 (1993) ("Expert testimony is useful as a guide to interpreting market facts, but it is not a substitute for them."); Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd. V. British Airways PLC, 257 F.3d 256, 264 (2d Cir. 2001) (explaining that expert testimony rooted in hypothetical assumptions cannot substitute for "actual market data"). On or before June 12, 2023, counsel will submit a joint letter with their proposed schedule for supplemental discovery to conclude no later than November 9, 2023. If counsel believe that they need longer than the previously requested 150 days to complete discovery, they should explain their reasons for the additional time requested. To the extent counsel do not agree on the proposed schedule for supplemental discovery, they should explain with specificity the reasons their disagreement(s). Grubhub Plaintiffs will join Target's summary judgment motion and supplemental letters and Defendants will file any summary judgment motions within sixty days of Grubhubs filings; the parties will agree a briefing schedule. On or before June 11, 2023, the parties in Lanning and Camp Coffee Grounds will propose a schedule for discovery. (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB) (Entered: 05/13/2023)

8 #2

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time of Defendants to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Continue All Other Pretrial Deadlines by Bank One Corporation, Bank One Delaware, N.A., Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-CLP,1:05-cv-04677-JG-RLM(Greene, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2005)

#8097

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7,754 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #8831 Letter from Rule 23(b)(3) Class Counsel in response to the Court's minute entry. The Court directs parties and objectors to submit any objection to the proposed special masters or special master procedures on or before May 26, 2023. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/19/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8832) Second MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support by Jack Rabbit LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [PROPOSED] COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) (Bacharach, N.) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8831) Letter from Rule 23(b)(3) Class Counsel in response to the Court's minute entry, ECF No. 8828 by Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Appointing Special Master, #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitaes) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8830) NOTICE by CryoServices, Inc., Dell Fox Jewelry LLC, Hayley Lanning, SBG Designs, LLC (Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Benjamin E. Shiftan) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8829) NOTICE by Plaintiffs in Civil Action Grubhub Holdings Inc., et al. v. Visa, et al., 1:19-cv-06555 re #8097 Notice of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Joinder In Target Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Wilson, James) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8828) Minute entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On May 11, 2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6F North, the Court heard from the parties and objectors. Damages action:The parties will first try to resolve service awards issue in view of the Second Circuit decision, but if they are unable to do so, Class Counsel will advise the Court and file a motion and the Court will give objectors an opportunity to respond. On or before May 18, 2023, the parties shall submit the names of at least two additional potential candidates for special master as well as a proposed order regarding the role of the special master; the Court will give other parties the opportunity to respond to the proposal. The Court will consider requests from counsel to be appointed to represent the franchisees as a class; and Class Counsel will have the opportunity to explain why current counsel can fairly present the issues to the special master and why the Court should delay any appointment of counsel to represent the franchisees. Jack Rabbit will serve a second renewed motion to intervene on or before May 18, 2023; Class Counsel and Old Jericho Plaintiffs (and any other party) will serve a response on or before June 1, 2023; Jack Rabbit will serve and file any reply on or before June 8, 2023. Equitable Relief Action, opt-out actions and actions filed after the (b)(3) settlement:On or before June 11, 2023, the parties will advise the Court as to whether they would like to supplement their response to Defendants' summary judgment motion to address the issue of direct evidence of an anticompetitive effect in the two-sided transaction market. See 1-800 Contacts, Inc., 1 F.4th 102 (2d Cir. 2021); see also Brooke Group Ltd. v. Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corp., 509 U.S. 209, 242 (1993) ("Expert testimony is useful as a guide to interpreting market facts, but it is not a substitute for them."); Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd. V. British Airways PLC, 257 F.3d 256, 264 (2d Cir. 2001) (explaining that expert testimony rooted in hypothetical assumptions cannot substitute for "actual market data"). On or before June 12, 2023, counsel will submit a joint letter with their proposed schedule for supplemental discovery to conclude no later than November 9, 2023. If counsel believe that they need longer than the previously requested 150 days to complete discovery, they should explain their reasons for the additional time requested. To the extent counsel do not agree on the proposed schedule for supplemental discovery, they should explain with specificity the reasons their disagreement(s). Grubhub Plaintiffs will join Target's summary judgment motion and supplemental letters and Defendants will file any summary judgment motions within sixty days of Grubhubs filings; the parties will agree a briefing schedule. On or before June 11, 2023, the parties in Lanning and Camp Coffee Grounds will propose a schedule for discovery. (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB) (Entered: 05/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8827) NOTICE by Capital One Bank, Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corp of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Zavitsanos) (Zavitsanos, John) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8826) NOTICE by Capital One Bank, Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corp of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record (Warshauer, Jordan) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8825 Motion to Appear by Telephone/Video. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/11/2023. (AB) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8825) MOTION to Appear by Telephone/Video by Fikes Wholesale, Inc.. (Eisinger, Jana) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9,996 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time of Defendants to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Continue All Other Pretrial Deadlines by Bank One Corporation, Bank One Delaware, N.A., Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-CLP,1:05-cv-04677-JG-RLM(Greene, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time of Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Stay All Pretrial Deadlines by Mastercard International Incorporated. (Powell, Wesley) (Entered: 11/02/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #6 Stipulation, the stipulation is "so ordered." Defendants will move, answer or otherwise respond on or before December 19, 2005. All other pre-trial deadlines are continued until a coordinated schedule for pre-trial proceedings has been set. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on November 2, 2005. (Gleeson, John) (Entered: 11/02/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time of Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Stay All Pretrial Deadlines by Mastercard International Incorporated. (Powell, Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sammi Malek on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Malek, Sammi) (Entered: 10/31/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Mitchell Jacobson on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/31/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2005
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 10/21/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MDL Panel - Attorney Service List. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 10/20/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Transfer Order rec'd. from the MDL Panel transferring the civil actions listed in Schedule A to EDNY for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 10/20/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Letter from the MDL Panel to the Clerk, EDNY, enclosing a copy of the MDL Panel's Transfer Order placing this MDL action in EDNY and assigning it to Judge Gleeson. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 10/20/2005)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less