Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 06:52:52 (UTC).

In re Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/20/2005 In re Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein, Margo K. Brodie and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:05-MD-01720

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judges

James Orenstein

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joe's Crab Shack - Abingdon MD, Inc.

William-Sonoma Inc.

Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO

Reid Petroleum

Joe's Crab Shack - Alabama Private Club, Inc.

Petitioner

Jonathan Lee Riches

Interested Parties

Parkside Movies 14

Hampton Allied Pharmacy

Mon Ami Gabi Development LLC, DBA Mon Ami Gabi - Oakbrook

Medical Center Pharmacy of Durant

Wayside South LLC

G&M Oil Co., Inc.

Patada Retail Consulting

Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Keewatin Sinclair

Valentine Stores, Inc.

Alsaker Corp/Broadway Truck Stops

Coulee View Enterprises LLC

National ATM Council, Inc.

Sunoco APlus Mini Market #5033 (Perwil Inc)

2,950 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Daniel Lawrence Berger

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.

485 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Sarah S. Rabinovici

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Hae Sung Nam

Attorney at Kaplan, Kilsheimer & Fox, LLP

850 Third Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10022

William A. Gengler

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Gary B. Friedman

Attorney at Friedman Law Group LLP

270 Lafayette St, Suite 1410

New York, NY 10012

Nicole L. Gueron

Attorney at Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP

220 5Th Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Kenneth T. Murata

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Sammi Malek

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10111

Randall A. Hack

Attorney at Lord, Bissell & Brook LLP

111 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Lisl J. Dunlop

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

114 W 47Th Street, Ste Floor 22

New York, NY 10036

Justin Collins

Attorney at Prime Inc.

2740 N. Mayfair Avenue

Springfield, MO 65803

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan, Kilsheimer & Fox, LLP

805 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Ryan G. Kriger

Attorney at Milberg Weiss Bershad & Schulman LLP

One Pennsylvania Plaza

New York, NY 10119

Benjamin R. Nagin

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Karen L Berenthal

Attorney at Facebook, Inc.

1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2400

Thomas J. Undlin

Attorney at Robins Kaplan, L.L.P.

2800 La Salle Plaza, 800 La Salle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Yeshimebet Abebe

Attorney at Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Andrew Corydon Finch

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Joe V. Demarco

Attorney at DeVore & DeMarco LLP

99 Park Avenue, Suite 330

New York, NY 10016

Morissa Robin Falk

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

700 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#8475

(#8475) MOTION for Joinder in Direct Action Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Certification by Breeze Thru Markets, LLC, CGS Sales, Cary Oil Co., Inc., Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Retail Company, Casey's Services Company, CenturyLink Communications LLC, Cheney Bros., Inc., Clipper Petroleum, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Dish Network L.L.C., Energy North, Inc., Epping Forest Yacht Club, Fastrip Oil Company, Gate Fuel Service, Inc., Gate North Carolina, Inc., Gate Petroleum Company, BFC, INC, Basic Properties LP, Level 3 Communications, LLC, Jaco Hill Company, Jaco Oil Company, Jamieson Hill Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Plaid Pantries, Inc., Ponte Vedra Corporation, Ponte Vedra Lodge, Reid Petroleum Corp., Reid Stores, Inc., Sampson-Bladen Oil Company, Inc., Sodexo, Inc., The River Club, Inc., United Energy, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc.. (Yasko, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

8474 #73

*Restricted*

8474 #53

*Restricted*

8474 #52

*Restricted*

8474 #51

*Restricted*

8474 #50

*Restricted*

8474 #49

*Restricted*

8474 #48

*Restricted*

8474 #24

*Restricted*

#1507

(#1507) DVDs with include PDFS attachments of the following documents placed in the vault. re #1506 Rule 56.1 Statement, Sealed,, #1481 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MASTERCARD AND BANK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF KEVIN F. HENRY, #1503 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1504 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Joint Motion of Class Plaintiffs and Individual Plaintiffs to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Professor Kevin M. Murphy, #1502 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF NETWORK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS EXPERT PROFESSOR DAN ARIELY, #1477 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #1500 MOTION to Strike NETWORK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE DAMAGES OPINION OF DR. CHRISTOPHER A. VELLTURO, #1478 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1480 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF VISA AND MASTERCARD DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINION OF DR. JOSEPH STIGLITZ, #1482 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF VICTOR FLEISCHER, #1505 MOTION to Strike CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF J.T. ATKINS and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF J.T. ATKINS (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/11/2011)

#1509

(#1509) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2011: SCHEDULING: The next status conference will be held on July 26, 2011, at 1:00 p.m.THE FOLLOWING RULINGS WERE MADE: I heard from the parties on their competing proposals regarding limits on the volume of evidentiary submissions to be filed in connection with the pending Daubert motions and the motions for summary judgment. Compare DE 1473 with DE 1474. I resolved the disputed issues and the parties will promptly submit an updated stipulation. (Scott-Hayward, Christine) (Entered: 07/12/2011)

1510 #2

Proposed Order

#1510

(#1510) Letter to the Honorable James Orenstein by Visa U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mason, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2011)

1511 #5

Exhibit D

1511 #4

Exhibit C

1511 #3

Exhibit B

1511 #2

Exhibit A

#1511

(#1511) STATUS REPORT Joint Proposed Case Status Report and Proposed Agenda for Case Management Conference No. 38 by Visa U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Mason, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2011)

11,965 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8475) MOTION for Joinder in Direct Action Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Certification by Breeze Thru Markets, LLC, CGS Sales, Cary Oil Co., Inc., Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Retail Company, Casey's Services Company, CenturyLink Communications LLC, Cheney Bros., Inc., Clipper Petroleum, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Dish Network L.L.C., Energy North, Inc., Epping Forest Yacht Club, Fastrip Oil Company, Gate Fuel Service, Inc., Gate North Carolina, Inc., Gate Petroleum Company, BFC, INC, Basic Properties LP, Level 3 Communications, LLC, Jaco Hill Company, Jaco Oil Company, Jamieson Hill Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Plaid Pantries, Inc., Ponte Vedra Corporation, Ponte Vedra Lodge, Reid Petroleum Corp., Reid Stores, Inc., Sampson-Bladen Oil Company, Inc., Sodexo, Inc., The River Club, Inc., United Energy, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc.. (Yasko, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8474) NOTICE by Equitable Relief Class of Service of Hard Drive of Exhibits to Clerk's Office pursuant to this Court's May 5, 2021 Order (Eisler, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Liability Report of Dennis W. Carlton (10-5-18), #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Joseph Stiglitz (10-5-18), #3 Exhibit 3 - Report of Keith Leffler, #4 Exhibit 4 VISA00109997- final, #5 Exhibit 5 - MCW_MDL_01411992, #6 Exhibit 6 - DFS0877488- The Economic Effects Of Interchange Fee- Frankel pdf-a, #7 Exhibit 7 - VUSAMDL1-06308785, at VUSAMDL-06308789 Inter - Overview, #8 Exhibit 8 - Van Ryn Ex. 2- 5.7 & 5.8 - Mastercard rules 2016- excerpts sm pdf-a, #9 Exhibit 9 - VUSAMDL1-06180107-110 pdf-a, #10 Exhibit 10 - Amy Bridge Dep Tr EXCERPT, #11 Exhibit 11 - Bill Sheedy Dep Tr EXCERTP, #12 Exhibit 12 - Sheedy 30b6 Ex. 4, #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from Kathy Hanna Dep 9.3, #14 Exhibit 14 - Gary Flood Dep Tr EXCERPT, #15 Exhibit 15 - VISA14MDL1-15989771, #16 Exhibit 16 - Dittrich Dep Tr EXCERPT 2 days, #17 Exhibit 17 - Visa-Core Rules- 2020, #18 Exhibit 18 - mastercard-rules-2020, #19 Exhibit 19 - Van Ryn Dep Tr EXCERPT - 2 days) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #20 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part1, #21 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part2, #22 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part3, #23 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part4, #24 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part5, #25 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part6, #26 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part7, #27 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part8, #28 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part9, #29 Exhibit 20 - WFINTCHG001588318_Part10) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #30 Exhibit 21 - MCI_MDL02_00018358_Part1, #31 Exhibit 21 - MCI_MDL02_00018358_Part2, #32 Exhibit 21 - MCI_MDL02_00018358_Part3, #33 Exhibit 22 - Will Sheedy Dep Tr EXCERTP - 2 day, #34 Exhibit 23 - 2019.10.11 - Reply Report of Joseph Stiglitz, #35 Exhibit 24 - Billy Knupp Dep Tr EXCERPT, #36 Exhibit 25 - PeterZuercherVisa_52, #37 Exhibit 26 - VDOJAMEX00367202, #38 Exhibit 27 - WFINTCHG000035066, #39 Exhibit 28 - MCI_MDL02_11423231) pdf-a, #40 Exhibit 29 - MCW_MDL_02739111 -Edward McLaughlin_Ex 23, #41 Exhibit 30 - VISA14MDL1-01748158 pdf-a, #42 Exhibit 31 - Thom Dep Tr EXCERPT, #43 Exhibit 32 - Excerpt Sheedy, William - Nov. 21. 08, #44 Exhibit 33 - Bruce McElhinney Dep Tr EXCERPT, #45 Exhibit 34 - Kresge Dep Tr EXCERPT, #46 Exhibit 35 - CO0003-00033287 pdf-a, #47 Exhibit 36 - Anderson-excerpt 4-24-2018, #48 Exhibit 37 - Jonathon King Dep Tr EXCERPT, #49 Exhibit 38 - Frank Christian Dep Tr EXCERPT, #50 Exhibit 39 - Ralph Andretta Dep Tr EXCERPT 6-29-17, #51 Exhibit 40 - MCI_MDL02_10638645 pdf-a, #52 Exhibit 41 - MCI_MDL02_10138647_Part1, #53 Exhibit 41 - MCI_MDL02_10138647_Part2, #54 Exhibit 41 - MCI_MDL02_10138647_Part3) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #55 Exhibit 42 - Craig Petersen Dep Tr EXCERPT 2-16-18, #56 Exhibit 43 - Doug Hambry Dep Tr Excerpt 3-28-17, #57 Exhibit 44 - DFS045603 pdf-a, #58 Exhibit 45 - Elizabeth Buse Dep Tr EXCERPT, #59 Exhibit 46 - MCW_MDL_08226153 pdf-a, #60 Exhibit 47 - 2007.10.08 Expert report of G. Hubbard (Discover), #61 Exhibit 48 - MCI_MDL03_00022242 pdf-a, #62 Exhibit 49 - AmerExpMDL1720_0030683 pdf-a, #63 Exhibit 50 - VISASUPP00007657 pdf-a, #64 Exhibit 51 - Towne-excerpt (9-5-2008), #65 Exhibit 52 - Baxter-excerpts (5-29-2008), #66 Exhibit 53 - 2008-04-28 Dep Tr (EXCERPT)of Paul Gallo, #67 Exhibit 54 - VISA14MDL1-00058033 pdf-a, #68 Exhibit 55 - 2008-07-29 Dep Tr EXCERPT of McElhinney, Bruce, #69 Exhibit 56 - VISASUPP00007657 pdf-a, #70 Exhibit 57 - 2017-03-28 Dep Tr of Douglas Hambry (EXCERPT)) (Marziliano, August). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #71 3. [confidential] Exhibits to Final Declaration of Steve Shadowen in Support of Rep, #72 3. Exhibits to Mason declaration in support of Reply, #73 4. [confidential] Exhibits to Declaration of Wilson, #74 C:\SDNY\3. [confidential] 2021-03-26 Exhibits to Shinder Declaration.pdf) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8473) Letter to The Honorable Margo K. Brodie regarding Courtesy Copies of Walmart, Inc.s Motion to Intervene by Walmart Inc. (Schoeman, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8442 Motion for Leave to File. The Court adopts the Equitable Relief Class Plaintiffs' proposal set forth in #8442 regarding filing of certain papers related to the class certification motion under seal. Consistent with the filing plan set forth for the summary judgment and Daubert motions, the parties shall submit the hard drive containing all the exhibits to the Clerk of Court to be docketed as a filing under seal. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/5/2021. (Carrero, Jacquellena) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8445 Motion for Leave to File. The Court grants the Merchant Trade Groups' request for leave to file a single sur-reply brief of no more than 15 pages on or before May 14, 2021. The Court also grants the Merchant Trade Groups' request for an extension of time to file the motions and for sending courtesy copies until May 18, 2021. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/4/2021. (Carrero, Jacquellena) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8472) REPLY in Support re #8466 Notice(Other) of Merchant Trade Groups' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Class Certification -- filed by Equitable Relief Class Plaintiffs. (Freed, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8471) REPLY in Support re #8463 Notice(Other) of Walmart's Motion to Intervene -- filed by Equitable Relief Class Plaintiffs. (Freed, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8470) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8466 Notice(Other), #8463 Notice(Other) Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motions to Intervene filed by Equitable Relief Class Plaintiffs. (Freed, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8469) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merchant Trade Groups (Freed, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8443 Motion for Leave to File. The Court grants the Direct Action Plaintiffs' request to file a single sur-reply brief of up to 15 pages by May 14, 2021. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/4/2021. (Carrero, Jacquellena) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7,733 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1513) Letter to Judge Orenstein regarding summary judgment argument by Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO (Blechman, William) (Entered: 07/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1512) Letter Responding to Item 2 of Court's Minute Order of May 19, 2011 by Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation (Wildfang, K.) (Entered: 07/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1511) STATUS REPORT Joint Proposed Case Status Report and Proposed Agenda for Case Management Conference No. 38 by Visa U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Mason, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • ORDER denying as moot #1474 Motion for Leave to File -- See Order dated July 14, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/14/2011. (Scott-Hayward, Christine) (Entered: 07/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • ORDER re #1510 Letter filed by Visa U.S.A. Inc. -- The proposed stipulation is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/14/2011. (Scott-Hayward, Christine) (Entered: 07/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1510) Letter to the Honorable James Orenstein by Visa U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mason, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1509) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2011: SCHEDULING: The next status conference will be held on July 26, 2011, at 1:00 p.m.THE FOLLOWING RULINGS WERE MADE: I heard from the parties on their competing proposals regarding limits on the volume of evidentiary submissions to be filed in connection with the pending Daubert motions and the motions for summary judgment. Compare DE 1473 with DE 1474. I resolved the disputed issues and the parties will promptly submit an updated stipulation. (Scott-Hayward, Christine) (Entered: 07/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1507) DVDs with include PDFS attachments of the following documents placed in the vault. re #1506 Rule 56.1 Statement, Sealed,, #1481 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MASTERCARD AND BANK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF KEVIN F. HENRY, #1503 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1504 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Joint Motion of Class Plaintiffs and Individual Plaintiffs to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Professor Kevin M. Murphy, #1502 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF NETWORK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS EXPERT PROFESSOR DAN ARIELY, #1477 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #1500 MOTION to Strike NETWORK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE DAMAGES OPINION OF DR. CHRISTOPHER A. VELLTURO, #1478 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1480 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF VISA AND MASTERCARD DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINION OF DR. JOSEPH STIGLITZ, #1482 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF VICTOR FLEISCHER, #1505 MOTION to Strike CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF J.T. ATKINS and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF J.T. ATKINS (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G&M Oil Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Reid Petroleum is a litigant