Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 22:11:33 (UTC).

In re: Intel Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/09/2005 In re Intel Corporation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:05-MD-01717

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

Phil Paul

Petitioner

The National Plaintiffs Group

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Avnet, Inc.

Clerk Jeffery N. Luthi

Washington, DC 20002-8004

Nancy Wolfe

Charles Dupraz

Brian Weiner

Melissa Armbrister

Bill Richards

Dana F. Thibedeau

Michael E. Ludt

JWRE Inc.

Stuart Schupler

James R. Conley

Lazio Family Products

Jay Salpeter

Ronald Konieczka

Matthew Kravitz

3Rd Party Defendants

Apple Inc.

Ingram Micro Inc.

116 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam C. Belsky

Robert J. Bonsignore

Attorney at rbonsignore@class-actions.us

Nathan Cihlar

Attorney at MDL RELATED NOTICING

George Farah

Attorney at MDL RELATED NOTICING

Terry Gross

Jon T. King

Attorney at MDL NOTICING ONLY

44 Montgomery Street, Undeliverable Email 6/2/14

San Francisco, CA 94104

Karina Kosharskyy

Kalpana Kotagal

Attorney at MDL RELATED NOTICING

David E. Kovel

Brent W. Landau

Attorney at MDL RELATED NOTICING

1146 19Th Street Nw, Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Eric P. Mandel

Michael G. McLellan

Attorney at MDL RELATED NOTICING

Ian Otto

Attorney at MDL RELATED NOTICING

Daniel H. Silverman

Daniel A. Small

Attorney at MDL RELATED - NOTICING

Robert J. Wozniak

David A. Young

David William Gregory

Attorney at Prickett, Jones & Elliott, P.A.

1310 King St., P.O. Box 1328

Wilmington, DE 19899

Eric M. Andersen

Attorney at Mark Andersen, P.A.

1201 N. Orange Street, 3Rd Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Allyson B. Baker

Attorney at MDL RELATED - NOTICING

153 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2651

(#2651) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Adam Balick : D.I. # 1349, 1354, 1434, 1546, 1592, 1756 (jcs) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

#2650

(#2650) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of J. Clayton Athey : D.I. # 464, 560, 583, 610, 632, 642, 719, 917, 1563, 1564, 1600, 1613, 1615, 1661, 1871, 1895, 1924, 1991, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2020, 2025, 2026, 2027, 2028, 2069, 2070, 2071, 2073, 2074,2248,2292, 2923, 2297, 2298, 2299, 2300, 2301, 2326, 2393, 2397, 2402, 2428, 2429, 2430, 2431, 2432, 2433, 2434, 2441, 2455, 2463, 2470, 2072, 2477, 2524, 2579, 2580 (jcs) (Main Document 2650 replaced on 4/21/2017) (jcs). Modified on 4/21/2017 (jcs). (Entered: 04/18/2017)

#2649

(#2649) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Frederick L. Cottrell, III : D.I. # 333, 338, 767, 872, 898, 927, 930, 946, 1023, 1086, 1087, 1168, 1169, 1210, 1229, 1243, 1365, 1366, 1442, 1446, 1449, 1450, 1451, 1493, 1502, 1511, 1512, 1513, 1514, 1516, 1533, 1535, 1537, 1552, 1553, 1554, 1585, 1656, 1660, 1723, 1724, 1725, 1726, 1783, 1801, 1802, 1809, 1835, 1838, 1839, 1903, 1904, 1948, 1949, 1950, 1951, 1952, 1953, 1954, 1955, 1956, 1982, 1983, 1996, 2049, 2057, 2083, 2110,2111,2118,2119, 2135, 2160, 2171, 2172, 2193, 2194, 2195, 2196, 2224, 2225, 2226 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

#2648

(#2648) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Richard L. Horwitz : D.I. # 442, 448, 495, 513, 519, 526, 527, 537, 541, 547, 559, 587,588, 677, 775, 857, 896, 897, 830, 1054, 1099, 1100, 1153, 1230, 1245, 1246, 1247, 1248, 1249, 1250, 1251, 1252, 1255, 1256, 1257, 1325, 1326, 1364, 1444, 1445, 1569, 1571, 1608, 1609, 1674, 1666, 1712, 1717, 1739, 1760, 1761, 1792, 1816, 1833, 1879, 1892, 1893, 1894, 1901, 1902, 1958, 1959, 1667, 1980, 1981, 1984, 2048, 2085, 2086, 2102, 2103, 2106, 2107, 2121, 2122, 2156, 2168, 2169, 2170, 2173, 2174, 2178, 2179, 2180, 2181, 2182, 2183, 2191, 2206, 2207, 2208, 2223, 2234, 2271, 2273, 2267, 2268, 2269, 2270, 2271, 2272, 2296, 2310, 2311, 2321, 2322, 2323, 2325, 2346, 2347, 2348, 2349, 2350, 2351, 2352, 2353, 2355, 2357, 2358, 2374, 2391, 2399, 2401, 2416, 2437, 2451, 2458, 2490, 2491, 2496, 2581 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

#2647

(#2647) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Mary B. Graham : D.I. # 576, 578, 697 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

#2646

(#2646) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Lauren E. Maguire : D.I. # 1916 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

2645 #1

Highlighted Docket Sheet

#2645

(#2645) ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 4/27/2017. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Highlighted Docket Sheet)(jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

#2644

(#2644) ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following actions to the District of Delaware: CA 05-2669 (ND/CA), 05-2699 (ND/CA), 05-2700 (ND/CA), 05-2720 (ND/CA), 05-2721 (ND/CA), 05-2743 (ND/CA), 05-2758 (ND/CA), 05-2813 (ND/CA), 05-2818 (ND/CA), 05-2823 (ND/CA); copies to: Clerks of District Court (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

#2

(#2) Letter to Clerk of Court from MDL Panel regarding Transfer of Intel Corporation cases to Delaware. (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

#3

(#3) Letter from Deputy Clerk, USDC, DE to Clerk of Northern District of California, requesting the original files and certified copies of the docket sheets (mwm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2005 (mwm, ). (Entered: 11/10/2005)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#5) OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel and Liason Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Phil Paul.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Holzman, James) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

5 #8

Exhibit H

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#6) Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Robert D. Goldberg regarding Response to Motion for Consolidation Filed on 11/11/05 - re # 5 Opening Brief in Support,. (Goldberg, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2005)

4,175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2651) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Adam Balick : D.I. # 1349, 1354, 1434, 1546, 1592, 1756 (jcs) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2650) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of J. Clayton Athey : D.I. # 464, 560, 583, 610, 632, 642, 719, 917, 1563, 1564, 1600, 1613, 1615, 1661, 1871, 1895, 1924, 1991, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2020, 2025, 2026, 2027, 2028, 2069, 2070, 2071, 2073, 2074,2248,2292, 2923, 2297, 2298, 2299, 2300, 2301, 2326, 2393, 2397, 2402, 2428, 2429, 2430, 2431, 2432, 2433, 2434, 2441, 2455, 2463, 2470, 2072, 2477, 2524, 2579, 2580 (jcs) (Main Document 2650 replaced on 4/21/2017) (jcs). Modified on 4/21/2017 (jcs). (Entered: 04/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2649) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Frederick L. Cottrell, III : D.I. # 333, 338, 767, 872, 898, 927, 930, 946, 1023, 1086, 1087, 1168, 1169, 1210, 1229, 1243, 1365, 1366, 1442, 1446, 1449, 1450, 1451, 1493, 1502, 1511, 1512, 1513, 1514, 1516, 1533, 1535, 1537, 1552, 1553, 1554, 1585, 1656, 1660, 1723, 1724, 1725, 1726, 1783, 1801, 1802, 1809, 1835, 1838, 1839, 1903, 1904, 1948, 1949, 1950, 1951, 1952, 1953, 1954, 1955, 1956, 1982, 1983, 1996, 2049, 2057, 2083, 2110,2111,2118,2119, 2135, 2160, 2171, 2172, 2193, 2194, 2195, 2196, 2224, 2225, 2226 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2648) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Richard L. Horwitz : D.I. # 442, 448, 495, 513, 519, 526, 527, 537, 541, 547, 559, 587,588, 677, 775, 857, 896, 897, 830, 1054, 1099, 1100, 1153, 1230, 1245, 1246, 1247, 1248, 1249, 1250, 1251, 1252, 1255, 1256, 1257, 1325, 1326, 1364, 1444, 1445, 1569, 1571, 1608, 1609, 1674, 1666, 1712, 1717, 1739, 1760, 1761, 1792, 1816, 1833, 1879, 1892, 1893, 1894, 1901, 1902, 1958, 1959, 1667, 1980, 1981, 1984, 2048, 2085, 2086, 2102, 2103, 2106, 2107, 2121, 2122, 2156, 2168, 2169, 2170, 2173, 2174, 2178, 2179, 2180, 2181, 2182, 2183, 2191, 2206, 2207, 2208, 2223, 2234, 2271, 2273, 2267, 2268, 2269, 2270, 2271, 2272, 2296, 2310, 2311, 2321, 2322, 2323, 2325, 2346, 2347, 2348, 2349, 2350, 2351, 2352, 2353, 2355, 2357, 2358, 2374, 2391, 2399, 2401, 2416, 2437, 2451, 2458, 2490, 2491, 2496, 2581 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2647) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Mary B. Graham : D.I. # 576, 578, 697 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2646) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Lauren E. Maguire : D.I. # 1916 (jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2645) ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 4/27/2017. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Highlighted Docket Sheet)(jcs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • CASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2644) ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2643) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Phil Paul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal and Final Judgment)(Athey, J.) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
2,966 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. respectfully request a status conference - re # 6 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 11/18/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Robert D. Goldberg regarding Response to Motion for Consolidation Filed on 11/11/05 - re # 5 Opening Brief in Support,. (Goldberg, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel and Liason Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Phil Paul.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Holzman, James) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel and Liason Counsel , MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Phil Paul, Christian Ambruoso, Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine P A, Law Office of Kwasi Asiedu, HP Consulting Services Inc., Jerome Feitelberg, Robin S. Weeth, Melinda Harr, Henry Kornegay, Bergerson & Associates Inc., Phillip Boeding, Stuart Munson, Lee Pines, Jodi Salpeter, Jay Salpeter, Cheryl Glick-Salpeter, Gabriella Herroeder-Perras, Michael H. Roach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holzman, James) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2005
  • CORRECTING ENTRY: Letter to Clerk of Court for the Northern District of California re: DI #3 replaced with letter that includes the District Court of Delaware's civil action numbers. (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Deputy Clerk, USDC, DE to Clerk of Northern District of California, requesting the original files and certified copies of the docket sheets (mwm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2005 (mwm, ). (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • CA Nos. 05-441 JJF; 05-470 JJF; 05-473 JJF; 05-476 JJF in the District of Delaware are included in this MDL. (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Clerk of Court from MDL Panel regarding Transfer of Intel Corporation cases to Delaware. (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following actions to the District of Delaware: CA 05-2669 (ND/CA), 05-2699 (ND/CA), 05-2700 (ND/CA), 05-2720 (ND/CA), 05-2721 (ND/CA), 05-2743 (ND/CA), 05-2758 (ND/CA), 05-2813 (ND/CA), 05-2818 (ND/CA), 05-2823 (ND/CA); copies to: Clerks of District Court (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • REFERENCE MUST BE MADE TO THE INDIVIDUAL DOCKET SHEET FOR ENTRIES RELATING ONLY TO INDIVIDUAL ACTIONS (mwm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avnet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where INGRAM MICRO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Young