Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 00:35:24 (UTC).

In Re: "Ameriquest Mortgage Co., Mortgage Lending Practices Litigation"

Case Summary

On 12/20/2005 In Re Ameriquest Mortgage Co , Mortgage Lending Practices Litigation was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin E. Aspen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:05-CV-07097

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin E. Aspen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Janet Wakefield

James Craw

Plaintiffs/Individual actions

Jackie Champion

Elmore, AL 36025

Scott Parkhurst

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Metropolitan Title Company

Indiana Title Network Co.

Battersby Title, Inc.

Archer Land Title, Inc.

AMC Mortgage Services Inc.

Saxon Mortgage Services Inc

5 Star Financial Inc.,

Joshua Hiltibidal

The Mortgage Edge Inc.

BAC Home Loan Servicing L.P.

LandAmerica Financial Group, Inc.

Scott Parkhurst

Direct Banc Mortgage LLC

Attorneys' Title Insurance Fund, Inc.

Portnoy & Green, P.C.

Tltle Tech Services, Inc.

897 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

John J. McDonough

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

45 Broadway, Suite 1600

New York, NY 10006

Other Attorneys

Joseph B. Carini, III

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

33 West Monroe Street, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Thomas Reynolds Heisler

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (Chicago)

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Stephen Philip Kikoler

Attorney at Much, Shelist, Freed, Denenberg, Ament & Rubenstein, P.C.

191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60605-1615

Keith James Keogh

Attorney at Keogh Law, Ltd.

101 N. Wacker Dr., Ste. 605

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew D. Matkov

Attorney at Saltz Matkov P.C.

1171 Lancaster Avenue, Suite 101

Berwyn, PA 19312

Matthew L. Kurzweg

Attorney at Kurzweg Law Offices

Gulf Tower, 34Th Floor, 707 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Emily N. Masalski

Attorney at Rooney Rippie & Ratnaswamy LLP

350 W. Hubbard Street, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael Martin Fenwick

Attorney at Molzahn, Reed & Rouse LLC

20 North Clark Steet, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60602

Craig Allen Varga

Attorney at Whyte Hirschboeck Dudek S.C.

125 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606-4473

Brian J Williams

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

123 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Henry M. Baskerville

Attorney at Stelter & Duffy, Ltd.

11 S. Lasalle, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Cheryl M. Lott

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Lost Angeles, CA 90017

Patrick W. Walsh

Attorney at Patrick W. Walsh, P.C.

53 Ogden Avenue

Clarendon Hills, IL 60514

Siobhan M. Murphy

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West Adams Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Kathryn Rose Mackey

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

10 South Lasalle Street, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

Kevin J. Clancy

Attorney at Lowis & Gellen

175 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 950

Chicago, IL 60604

Kristen Alexis Schank

Attorney at Wiedner & McAuliffe, Ltd

1 N. Franklin, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60606

Larry A Hoellwarth

Attorney at Karbal, Cohen, Economou, Silk & Dunne, LLC

200 South Michigan Avenue, 20Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604

Harry N. Arger

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLc

10 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60606

288 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#5805

(#5805) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5804

(#5804) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#5803

(#5803) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Jonathan Lee Riches returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#5802

(#5802) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Veronica McNab returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#5801

(#5801) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Walter J. Manning returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Matthew J. Dunn The Dunn Law Group returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Attorney contacted and directed to file a Notification of Change of Address with the Clerk's Office. Re-mailed to One International Place 10th Floor, Suite 1400 Boston, MA 02043. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#5800

(#5800) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Gail Myers, Janice Long returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

#5799

(#5799) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Dwight Hewatt returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#5798

(#5798) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Kellie Allgood returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Attorney found and notice for entry #5796 will be regenerated. Attorney directed to file a Notification of Change of Address with the Clerk's Office. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#5796

(#5796) ORDER Recommending Termination of Multidistrict Litigation: Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/16/2018. Mailed notice. (bg, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Kelly M. Dermody by Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff (Exhibit) (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#8

(#8) PROOF of Service by U.S. Mail filed by Plaintiffs Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff dated on 01/06/2006 re #5 #6 #7 (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#7

(#8) PROOF of Service by U.S. Mail filed by Plaintiffs Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff dated on 01/06/2006 re #5 #6 #7 (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#6

(#8) PROOF of Service by U.S. Mail filed by Plaintiffs Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff dated on 01/06/2006 re #5 #6 #7 (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#5

(#8) PROOF of Service by U.S. Mail filed by Plaintiffs Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff dated on 01/06/2006 re #5 #6 #7 (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#4

(#6) DECLARATION of Terry A. Smiljanich by Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff re #5 , #4 (Exhibit) (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#3

(#3) LETTER to Mr. Haynes from Caryn Becker, Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP dated 01/06/2006. (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

#2

(#2) LETTER from MDL Panel establising MDL 1715. (dmkf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel establishing MDL 1715. (dmkf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)

7,474 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5805) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5804) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5803) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Jonathan Lee Riches returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5802) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Veronica McNab returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5801) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Walter J. Manning returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Matthew J. Dunn The Dunn Law Group returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Attorney contacted and directed to file a Notification of Change of Address with the Clerk's Office. Re-mailed to One International Place 10th Floor, Suite 1400 Boston, MA 02043. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5800) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Gail Myers, Janice Long returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5799) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Dwight Hewatt returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5798) MAIL RETURNED, for document #5796 sent to Kellie Allgood returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Attorney found and notice for entry #5796 will be regenerated. Attorney directed to file a Notification of Change of Address with the Clerk's Office. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5797) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Status hearing of 2/22/2018 is stricken.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5796) ORDER Recommending Termination of Multidistrict Litigation: Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/16/2018. Mailed notice. (bg, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5,816 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Plaintiffs for provisional certification of rescission class for purposes of preliminary injunction; Notice of filing (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of Kelly M. Dermody by Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff (Exhibit) (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF of Service by U.S. Mail filed by Plaintiffs Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff dated on 01/06/2006 re #5 #6 #7 (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Gary Klein in support of motion for appointment of interim class counsel by Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff re #5 #6 (Exhibit) (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Terry A. Smiljanich by Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff re #5 , #4 (Exhibit) (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams, Adolph Peter Kurt Burggraff in Support of their Motion to appoint intermin class counsel for MDL plaintiffs pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.23(g) #4 (hp, ) Modified on 1/18/2006 (hp, ). (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiffs Duval Naughton, Lynn Gay, David M. Wakefield, Janet Wakefield, Latonya Williams, Daisybel Tolbert, William Tolbert, Cheryl Williams to appoint intermin class counsel for MDL plaintiffs pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.23(g); Notice of motion (hp, ) Modified on 1/18/2006 (hp, ). (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER to Mr. Haynes from Caryn Becker, Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP dated 01/06/2006. (hp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER from MDL Panel establising MDL 1715. (dmkf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel establishing MDL 1715. (dmkf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMC Mortgage Services Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 5 Star Financial Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where The Mortgage Edge Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LandAmerica Financial Group, Inc. is a litigant