Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 23:52:37 (UTC).

Hyun Park et al v. Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2007 Hyun Park filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Korean Air Lines Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alicia G. Rosenberg and S. James Otero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:07-CV-05107

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

Presiding Judge

S. James Otero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Consolidated Plaintiffs

Howard Ree

Eddie Moon

Hee Ho Chung

Jong Su Kim

James Van Horn

Bernard Jung Kim

Sooyeon Kim

R. Stan Morris

Eun Chun Lim

Leeva Chung

Sook Yung Lee

Hyun Park

Edward Yoo

Ki Won Lee

Joo Yong Jin

Wide World Tours of Mission Valley, Inc.

Yoong Kim

Issun K Park

Petitioners

Bu Soon Chon

Los Angeles, CA 90018

Burnshik Eom

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andy Sohrn

Attorney at Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bruce E Gerstein

Attorney at Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP

1501 Broadway Suite 1416

New York, NY 10036

Lori S Brody

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Noah H Silverman

Attorney at Garwin Gerstein & Fisher

1501 Broadway, Ste 1416

New York, NY 10036

Linda P Nussbaum

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Steve W Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Frank J Janecek, Jr

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Elizabeth Lee Beck

Attorney at Beck & Lee Trial Lawyers

12485 Sw 137Th Ave., Suite 205

Miami, FL 33186

Eddie Yoon

Attorney at Attorney at Law

732 Pacific Avenue

Tacoma, WA 98402

Other Attorneys

Joseph Brooks

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

R Alexander Saveri

Attorney at Saveri and Saveri, Inc

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Kovel

Attorney at Kirby McInerney

825 Third Avenue 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Predita Rostomian

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street N W

Washington, DC 20006-4001

John M Boylston

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius

300 South Grand Avenue 22 Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Jill M Manning

Attorney at Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez and Smith LLP

One California Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark Reinhardt

Attorney at Reinhardt Wendorf and Blanchfield

First National Bank Building, 332 Minnesota St, E-1000

St Paul, MN 55101

R Reid LeBeau, II

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Daniel E Gustafson

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel Walker

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101-3000

Jason S Hartley

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

500 West C Street Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

149 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#743

(#743) Mail Returned addressed to Andrew M Leavitt re Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds #742 (lc) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#742

(#742) ORDER GRANTING CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NET CASH AND COUPON SETTLEMENT FUNDS #732 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court approves the claims allocation process as described in the Botzet Declaration and affirms the recommended denial of the claim of Four Seasons Tours & Travel, Inc. The Court finds and concludes that Four Seasons did not purchase airline tickets for its own account, is not a Class member and is not entitled to share in the Settlement Funds. Four Seasons claim to share in the Settlement Funds is hereby denied. The Court further orders that $1,075,000 shall be set aside from the cash portion of the Settlement Funds and $1,350,000 in face amount of coupons shall be set aside from the coupon portion of the Settlement Funds as a reserve for payments to the Settlement Administrator and Chicago Clearing Corporation, the Court-appointed Administrator of the coupon portion of the Settlement Funds, for their services incurred and to be incurred for claims and coupon administration. Settlement Class Counsel is authorized to pay up to these amounts upon approval of their invoices. This Order is without prejudice to granting further applications for costs and expenses for additional administrative services. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#740

(#740) NOTICE of Change of address by David E Azar attorney for Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. Changing attorneys address to 10866 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 600, Los Angeles, CA 90024. Filed by Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#739

(#739) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Laura Albee et al, re Reply (Motion related) #738 served on PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUNDS AND RELATED MATTERS; AND DECLARATION OF MARC M. SELTZER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

738 #2

Proposed Order

738 #1

Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer

#738

(#738) REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 Settlement Funds filed by Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer, #2 Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#737

(#737) NOTICE of Change of address by Jeff S Westerman attorney for Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. Changing attorneys address to 1875 Century Park East, Suite 2200, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

734 #2

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer (Case No. 15-7105-SJO)

#734

(#734) DECLARATION of Susan G. Kupfer In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 filed by Plaintiffs Laura Albee, Timothy S Murphy, Sungshic Park, Yoon Park, Howard Ree, Leon Song, Edward Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum in Support of MTD (Case No. 15-7105-SJO), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer (Case No. 15-7105-SJO))(Kupfer, Susan) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

#733

(#735) Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #733 , Declaration (Motion related) #734 e-mailed to Kevin C McCann at kevinmccann@paulhastings.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2016)

732 #2

Declaration of Joel Botzet Regarding Claims Administration

732 #1

Proposed Order

#732

(#734) DECLARATION of Susan G. Kupfer In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 filed by Plaintiffs Laura Albee, Timothy S Murphy, Sungshic Park, Yoon Park, Howard Ree, Leon Song, Edward Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum in Support of MTD (Case No. 15-7105-SJO), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer (Case No. 15-7105-SJO))(Kupfer, Susan) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge S. James Otero, ORDERING notice of change of attorney information submitted by Plaintiffs Hyun Park, Howard Ree received on 10/5/07 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: no copy provided for judge.(bp) (Entered: 10/18/2007)

#5

(#5) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge S. James Otero : Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 10/29/2007 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(bp) (Entered: 10/18/2007)

#4

(#4) INITIAL STANDING ORDER for cases assigned to Judge S. James Otero,(bp) (Entered: 09/28/2007)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(rrey) (Entered: 08/14/2007)

1,021 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#743) Mail Returned addressed to Andrew M Leavitt re Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds #742 (lc) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#742) ORDER GRANTING CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NET CASH AND COUPON SETTLEMENT FUNDS #732 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court approves the claims allocation process as described in the Botzet Declaration and affirms the recommended denial of the claim of Four Seasons Tours & Travel, Inc. The Court finds and concludes that Four Seasons did not purchase airline tickets for its own account, is not a Class member and is not entitled to share in the Settlement Funds. Four Seasons claim to share in the Settlement Funds is hereby denied. The Court further orders that $1,075,000 shall be set aside from the cash portion of the Settlement Funds and $1,350,000 in face amount of coupons shall be set aside from the coupon portion of the Settlement Funds as a reserve for payments to the Settlement Administrator and Chicago Clearing Corporation, the Court-appointed Administrator of the coupon portion of the Settlement Funds, for their services incurred and to be incurred for claims and coupon administration. Settlement Class Counsel is authorized to pay up to these amounts upon approval of their invoices. This Order is without prejudice to granting further applications for costs and expenses for additional administrative services. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#741) The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Class Plaintiffs Laura Albee, Yoon S Chang, Timothy S Murphy, Sungshic Park, Yoon Park, Howard Ree, Leon Song, Edward Yoo. #732 , set for hearing on February 8, 2016. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#740) NOTICE of Change of address by David E Azar attorney for Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. Changing attorneys address to 10866 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 600, Los Angeles, CA 90024. Filed by Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#739) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Laura Albee et al, re Reply (Motion related) #738 served on PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUNDS AND RELATED MATTERS; AND DECLARATION OF MARC M. SELTZER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#738) REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 Settlement Funds filed by Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer, #2 Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#737) NOTICE of Change of address by Jeff S Westerman attorney for Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. Changing attorneys address to 1875 Century Park East, Suite 2200, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Laura Albee et al. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#736) Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #733 , Declaration (Motion related) #734 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail 735 e-mailed to William Thomas Lacy Jr at tlacy@lacysnyder.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#735) Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #733 , Declaration (Motion related) #734 e-mailed to Kevin C McCann at kevinmccann@paulhastings.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#734) DECLARATION of Susan G. Kupfer In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds #732 filed by Plaintiffs Laura Albee, Timothy S Murphy, Sungshic Park, Yoon Park, Howard Ree, Leon Song, Edward Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum in Support of MTD (Case No. 15-7105-SJO), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer (Case No. 15-7105-SJO))(Kupfer, Susan) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
627 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2007
  • (#11) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: changing Firm Address to One Embarcadero Center, Suite 760, San Francisco, CA 94111 for attorney Susan G. Kupfer. Filed by plaintiff Hyun Park, Howard Ree (cbr) (Entered: 11/13/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge S. James Otero, ORDERING notice of change of attorney information submitted by Plaintiffs Hyun Park, Howard Ree received on 10/5/07 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: no copy provided for judge.(bp) (Entered: 10/18/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge S. James Otero : Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 10/29/2007 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(bp) (Entered: 10/18/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2007
  • (#8) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Sylvie K Kern on behalf of Plaintiffs Hyun Park, Howard Ree. Filed by plaintiffs Hyun Park and Howard Ree (bb) (Entered: 10/30/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL STANDING ORDER for cases assigned to Judge S. James Otero,(bp) (Entered: 09/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • FAX number for Attorney Lionel Z Glancy, Michael M Goldberg, Andy Sohrn is 310-201-9160. (rrey) (Entered: 08/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(rrey) (Entered: 08/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Hyun Park, Howard Ree. (rrey) (Entered: 08/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • 20 Day Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd.. (rrey) (Entered: 08/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd..(Filing fee $ 350 Paid) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Hyun Park, Howard Ree.(rrey) (Entered: 08/14/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Walker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R Reid LeBeau, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Brooks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Michelle Manning