This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2021 at 07:44:06 (UTC).

Gobeli Research LTD v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/29/2006 Gobeli Research LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard Davis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:06-CV-00562

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard Davis

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Gobeli Research LTD

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Microsoft Corporation

Not Classified By Court

Robert W Faulkner

Dallas, TX 75225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry C Barnett

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Gretchen Sims Sween

Attorney at Beck Redden & Secrest, LLP

515 Congress Ave, Ste 1750

Austin, TX 78701

Garrick Brandon Pursley

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP - Dallas

901 Main St, Suite 5100

Dallas, TX 75202-3775

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Robert P Courtney

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Minneapolis

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Shari Fleishman Esfahani

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC - Washington DC

1000 Maine Ave., Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Ruffin B Cordell

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC - Washington DC

1000 Maine Ave., Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Indranil Mukerji

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP - Washington DC

1875 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#50

49 #3

Text of Proposed Order

49 #2

Exhibit A

#49

#48

47 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#47

#46

#40

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

1 #3

List of Parties

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER granting #49 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this civil acion are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/14/08. cc:attys 8-14-08(mll, ) (Entered: 08/14/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Motion with attached Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice) by Gobeli Research LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnett, Barry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2008: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ). (Entered: 08/11/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/22/08. cc:attys 7-23-08 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE by Gobeli Research LTD re #40 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Pursley, Garrick) (Entered: 05/13/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/13/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim by Gobeli Research LTD.(Barnett, Barry) (Entered: 05/01/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Disclosure by Gobeli Research LTD (Pursley, Garrick) (Entered: 04/22/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation Defendant's Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/22/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Gobeli Research LTD by Microsoft Corporation.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2007
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Microsoft Corporation answer due 6/18/2007. (mjc ) (Entered: 04/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff. Microsoft's answer is due by 6/18/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/16/07. (mjc) (Entered: 04/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Indranil Mukerji for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-9423. Approved 4/16/07. (mjc ) (Entered: 04/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shari Fleishman Esfahani for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-9423. Approved 4/16/07. (mjc ) (Entered: 04/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/13/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gretchen Sims Sween on behalf of Gobeli Research LTD (Sween, Gretchen) (Entered: 04/05/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed as to Microsoft Corporation on 3/27/2007, answer due: 4/16/2007. (mjc ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (mjc ) (Entered: 03/27/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Gobeli Research LTD Gobeli Patent US5418968 (Barnett, Barry) (Entered: 12/29/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Microsoft Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 979265.), filed by Gobeli Research LTD.(Barnett, Barry) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2006 (fnt, ). (Entered: 12/29/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Courtney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Indranil Mukerji

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruffin B. Cordell Esq.