Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 05:58:02 (UTC).

Burnett, et al v. Al Baraka Investment

Case Summary

On 08/01/2003 Burnett filed an Other lawsuit against Al Baraka Investment. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George B. Daniels and Sarah Netburn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:03-CV-05738

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

Referral Judge

Sarah Netburn

 

Party Details

Defendants

Ayadi Chafiq Bin Muhammad

Abu Rida Al Suri

Mohrez Amdouni

Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil

Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr

Ali Atwa

Youssef Abdaoui

Society of Islamic Cooperation

Abu Qatada Al-Filistini

Haji Abdul Manan Agha

Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad

Ali Saed Bin Ali El-Hooric

Sanabel Al Kheer, Inc.

Abdalrahman Alarnout Abu Aljer

Ansar Al-Islam (AI)

Saar Foundation

Musti Rashid Ahmad Ladehyanoy

Mondher Baazzoui

Nurjaman Riduan Ismuddin

The Global Relief Foundation

4,341 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Darin John McMullen

Attorney at Anderson Kill P.C. (P.A.)

1600 Market Street, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Hugh D Higgins

Attorney at Lauro Law Firm

101 E. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

Mark Joseph MacDougall

Attorney at Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP (DC)

Robert S. Strauss Building, 1333 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Thomas Peter Steindler

Attorney at McDermott, Will & Emery (DC)

500 N. Capitol Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Mark E. Gottlieb

Attorney at Anderson Kill P.C. (P.A.)

1600 Market Street, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William Herbert Pillsbury

Attorney at Anderson Kill P.C. (P.A.)

1600 Market Street, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nicole Hagenbach Sprinzen

Attorney at Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP (DC)

Robert S. Strauss Building, 1333 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

John F. Lauro

Attorney at Lauro Law Firm

101 E. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

Justin Braun Kaplan

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC (SC)

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, P.O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Viet D. Dinh

Attorney at Bancroft PLLC

500 New Jersey Avenue, Nw, 7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Joseph John Saltarelli

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

James Joseph McGuire

Attorney at Barton LLP

711 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Felice Beth Galant

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10103

Mara Beth Zusman

Attorney at Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP (DC)

Robert S. Strauss Building, 1333 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Paul J. Hanly, Jr

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC

415 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

T. Barry Kingham

Attorney at Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt and Mosle LLP

101 Park Avenue South 35Th Floor

New York, NY 10178

William Horace Jeffress, Jr

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP (DC)

1299 Pennsylvania Ave N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Jeffrey Scott Thompson

Attorney at Deputy Attorney General

Elizabeth S. Smith

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC (SC)

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, P.O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Omar T. Mohammedi

Attorney at Mark E. Thabet

975 Craigville Rd.

Chester, NY 10918

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#78

(#497) LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#169

(#496) Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#168

(#495) Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office (Entered: 07/15/2019)

494 #16

Exhibit 16

494 #14

Exhibit 14

494 #13

Exhibit 13

494 #12

Exhibit 12

494 #11

Exhibit 11

494 #4466

(#494) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from WAMY SA and WAMY INT'L.Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth, World Assembly of Muslim Youth (Falls Church, Virginia, USA), World Assembly of Muslim Youth of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

3 #7

Amended Complaint - part 7 of 7

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al Jomaith, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Youssef Abdaoui, Salahuddin Abduljawad, Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah, Ibrahim S. Abdullah, Hussein Mahmud Abdullkadir, Mohammed Iqbal Abdurrahman, Abu Hafs The Mauritanian, Additional Defendants 1-1000, Abdirasik Aden, Ibrahim Muhammed Afandi, African Muslim Agency, Haji Abdul Manan Agha, Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad, Syed Suleman Ahmer, Akida Bank Private Limited, Akida Investment Co. LTD., Mohammed Amine Akli, Ghasoub Al Abrash, Wadi Al Aqiq, Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Al Barakaat Exchange LLC, Al Farooq Mosque, Al Haramain Foundation, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Ahmad Al Harbi, Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi, Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa, Mohammed Al Massari, Mohammed Ali Hasan Al Moayad, Al Qaeda, Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Al Rajhi Banking and Investment, Essam Al Ridi, Mohammad Khair Al Saqqa, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Abu Rida Al Suri, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Al Taqwa Trade Property and Industry Company Limited, Hassan Al Turabi, Sayf Al-Adl, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Mohammed Hussein Al-Amoudi, Asbat Al-Ansar, Aqueel Al-Aqueel, Al-Baraka Bankcorp, Inc., Al-Barakat Bank of Somalia (BSS), Al-Barakat Finance Group, Al-Barakat Financial Holding Co., Al-Barakat Global Telecommunications, Al-Barakat Group of Companies Somalia Limited, Al-Barakat International, Al-Barakat Investments, Al-Barakat Wiring Service, Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Khalid Al-Fawwaz, Abu Qatada Al-Filistini, Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi, Muhammad Al-Hamati, Al-Hamati Sweets Bakeries, Amin Al-Haq, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Safar Al-Hawali, Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Lujain Al-Iman, Ansar Al-Islam (AI), Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya, Al Gama'a Al-Islamiyya, Mohammed Al-Issai, Mansour Al-Kadi, Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr, Makhtab Al-Khidamat, Ibn Al-Shaykh Al-Libi, Anas Al-Liby, Abdullah M. Al-Mahdi, Abu Hamza Al-Masri, Abu Ibrahim Al-Masri, Abdul Al-Moslah, Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil, Abdelkarim Hussein Mohamed Al-Nasser, Al-Nur Honey Press Shops, Salman Al-Ouda, Abdullah Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Al-Rashid Trust, Saqar Al-Sadawi, Sa'd Al-Sharif, Al-Shifa' Honey Press for Industry and Commerce, Yassir Al-Sirri, Tareq M. Al-Swaidan, Hisham Al-Talib, Ibrahim Salih Mohammed Al-Yacoub, Abu Musab Al-Zarqawi, Ayman Al-Zawahiri, Abdurahman Alamoudi. Related document: #1 Complaint.(ae, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 12/30/2003)

1 #7

Complaint - part 7 of 7

1 #6

Complaint - part 6 of 7

1 #5

Complaint - part 5 of 7

1 #4

Complaint - part 4 of 7

1 #3

Complaint - part 3 of 7

1 #2

Complaint - part 2 of 7

#1

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al Jomaith, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Youssef Abdaoui, Salahuddin Abduljawad, Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah, Ibrahim S. Abdullah, Hussein Mahmud Abdullkadir, Mohammed Iqbal Abdurrahman, Abu Hafs The Mauritanian, Additional Defendants 1-1000, Abdirasik Aden, Ibrahim Muhammed Afandi, African Muslim Agency, Haji Abdul Manan Agha, Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad, Syed Suleman Ahmer, Akida Bank Private Limited, Akida Investment Co. LTD., Mohammed Amine Akli, Ghasoub Al Abrash, Wadi Al Aqiq, Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Al Barakaat Exchange LLC, Al Farooq Mosque, Al Haramain Foundation, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Ahmad Al Harbi, Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi, Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa, Mohammed Al Massari, Mohammed Ali Hasan Al Moayad, Al Qaeda, Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Al Rajhi Banking and Investment, Essam Al Ridi, Mohammad Khair Al Saqqa, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Abu Rida Al Suri, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Al Taqwa Trade Property and Industry Company Limited, Hassan Al Turabi, Sayf Al-Adl, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Mohammed Hussein Al-Amoudi, Asbat Al-Ansar, Aqueel Al-Aqueel, Al-Baraka Bankcorp, Inc., Al-Barakat Bank of Somalia (BSS), Al-Barakat Finance Group, Al-Barakat Financial Holding Co., Al-Barakat Global Telecommunications, Al-Barakat Group of Companies Somalia Limited, Al-Barakat International, Al-Barakat Investments, Al-Barakat Wiring Service, Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Khalid Al-Fawwaz, Abu Qatada Al-Filistini, Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi, Muhammad Al-Hamati, Al-Hamati Sweets Bakeries, Amin Al-Haq, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Safar Al-Hawali, Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Lujain Al-Iman, Ansar Al-Islam (AI), Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya, Al Gama'a Al-Islamiyya, Mohammed Al-Issai, Mansour Al-Kadi, Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr, Makhtab Al-Khidamat, Ibn Al-Shaykh Al-Libi, Anas Al-Liby, Abdullah M. Al-Mahdi, Abu Hamza Al-Masri, Abu Ibrahim Al-Masri, Abdul Al-Moslah, Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil, Abdelkarim Hussein Mohamed Al-Nasser, Al-Nur Honey Press Shops, Salman Al-Ouda, Abdullah Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Al-Rashid Trust, Saqar Al-Sadawi, Sa'd Al-Sharif, Al-Shifa' Honey Press for Industry and Commerce, Yassir Al-Sirri, Tareq M. Al-Swaidan, Hisham Al-Talib, Ibrahim Salih Mohammed Al-Yacoub, Abu Musab Al-Zarqawi, Ayman Al-Zawahiri, Abdurahman Alamoudi. Related document: #1 Complaint.(ae, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 12/30/2003)

1,012 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#497) LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#496) Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#495) Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#494) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from WAMY SA and WAMY INT'L.Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth, World Assembly of Muslim Youth (Falls Church, Virginia, USA), World Assembly of Muslim Youth of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#493) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from WAMY.Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth, World Assembly of Muslim Youth (Falls Church, Virginia, USA), World Assembly of Muslim Youth of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Mohammedi, Omar) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#492) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#491) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • (#490) ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#489) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
533 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Answer Due Date purs. to #5 Memo Endorsement as to Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi answer due on 3/1/2004. (jsa, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMO ENDORSEMENT that the defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi's time to answer the third amended complaint is extended to 3/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2004) (jsa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 01/30/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Answer Due Date purs. to #4 Memo Endorsement as to Yousef Jameel answer due on 3/1/2004. (jsa, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMO ENDORSEMENT Defendant Yousef Jameel's time to answer the third amended complaint is extended to 3/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2004) (jsa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 01/30/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (gf) (Entered: 10/20/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case to Judge Richard C. Casey . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Paul J. Hanly Jr., Jayne Conroy . (gf) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 10/20/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • Case accepted as related to 1:02cv6977 . Notice of assignment to follow. (gf) (Entered: 10/20/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al Jomaith, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Youssef Abdaoui, Salahuddin Abduljawad, Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah, Ibrahim S. Abdullah, Hussein Mahmud Abdullkadir, Mohammed Iqbal Abdurrahman, Abu Hafs The Mauritanian, Additional Defendants 1-1000, Abdirasik Aden, Ibrahim Muhammed Afandi, African Muslim Agency, Haji Abdul Manan Agha, Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad, Syed Suleman Ahmer, Akida Bank Private Limited, Akida Investment Co. LTD., Mohammed Amine Akli, Ghasoub Al Abrash, Wadi Al Aqiq, Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Al Barakaat Exchange LLC, Al Farooq Mosque, Al Haramain Foundation, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Ahmad Al Harbi, Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi, Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa, Mohammed Al Massari, Mohammed Ali Hasan Al Moayad, Al Qaeda, Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Al Rajhi Banking and Investment, Essam Al Ridi, Mohammad Khair Al Saqqa, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Abu Rida Al Suri, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Al Taqwa Trade Property and Industry Company Limited, Hassan Al Turabi, Sayf Al-Adl, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Mohammed Hussein Al-Amoudi, Asbat Al-Ansar, Aqueel Al-Aqueel, Al-Baraka Bankcorp, Inc., Al-Barakat Bank of Somalia (BSS), Al-Barakat Finance Group, Al-Barakat Financial Holding Co., Al-Barakat Global Telecommunications, Al-Barakat Group of Companies Somalia Limited, Al-Barakat International, Al-Barakat Investments, Al-Barakat Wiring Service, Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Khalid Al-Fawwaz, Abu Qatada Al-Filistini, Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi, Muhammad Al-Hamati, Al-Hamati Sweets Bakeries, Amin Al-Haq, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Safar Al-Hawali, Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Lujain Al-Iman, Ansar Al-Islam (AI), Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya, Al Gama'a Al-Islamiyya, Mohammed Al-Issai, Mansour Al-Kadi, Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr, Makhtab Al-Khidamat, Ibn Al-Shaykh Al-Libi, Anas Al-Liby, Abdullah M. Al-Mahdi, Abu Hamza Al-Masri, Abu Ibrahim Al-Masri, Abdul Al-Moslah, Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil, Abdelkarim Hussein Mohamed Al-Nasser, Al-Nur Honey Press Shops, Salman Al-Ouda, Abdullah Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Al-Rashid Trust, Saqar Al-Sadawi, Sa'd Al-Sharif, Al-Shifa' Honey Press for Industry and Commerce, Yassir Al-Sirri, Tareq M. Al-Swaidan, Hisham Al-Talib, Ibrahim Salih Mohammed Al-Yacoub, Abu Musab Al-Zarqawi, Ayman Al-Zawahiri, Abdurahman Alamoudi. Related document: #1 Complaint.(ae, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 12/30/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2003
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Richard C. Casey as possibly related to 1:02-cv-6977. (gmo) Modified on 09/05/2003 (Entered: 08/07/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 481060. (gmo) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ). (Entered: 08/07/2003)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Global Relief Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases where Saar Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Omar T. Mohammedi