This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2015 at 12:42:36 (UTC).

Barker, et al v. Wyeth, et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2004 Barker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wyeth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam Sparks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:04-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam Sparks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barbara J. Barker

Patricia A. Berry

Edward M. Cavuto

Suzette M. Gwynne

Cynthia T. Price

Relinda G. Spicer

Defendants

Wyeth

Michael Bogdanovich

Lewis W. Zingery

Charles D. Valadez

Vladimir Rizov

Samuel Coles Bennett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George M. Fleming

Attorney at Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.L.P.

2800 Post Oak Blvd., #4000

Houston, TX 77056-6109

James Louis Doyle, II

Attorney at Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas, LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway - Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017-5051

Mike O'Brien

Attorney at Mike O'Brien, PC

1330 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2960

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

David S. Lill

Attorney at Lill Firm, P.C.

4407 Bee Caves Road, Suite 111 Building 1

Austin, TX 78746

Kenneth J. Ferguson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Leslie A. Benitez

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

816 Congress Ave., Ste 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Susan E. Burnett

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke, LLP

2901 Via Fortuna Dr., Suite 500

Austin, TX 78746

Debra L. Elmore

Attorney at Cruse, Scott, Henderson & Allen, L.L.P.

2777 Allen Parkway, 7Th Floor

Houston, TX 77019-2133

Jay H. Henderson

Attorney at Cruse, Scott, Henderson & Allen, L.L.P.

2777 Allen Parkway, 7Th Floor

Houston, TX 77019-2133

Pegi S. Block

Attorney at Cruse, Scott, Henderson & Allen, LLP

2777 Allen Parkway, 7Th Floor

Houston, TX 77019

T. Scott Allen, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of T. Scott Allen, PC

440 Louisiana St., Ste 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Mark A. Keene

Attorney at Keene & Seibert, PC

2700 Bee Cave Road, Suite 120

Austin, TX 78746

Paul C. Velte, IV

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1122 Colorado St., Suite 2320

Austin, TX 78701-1643

Rockne W. Onstad

Attorney at The Onstad Law Firm

119 Ranch Road 620 South

Austin, TX 78734-3920

Ace Pickens

Attorney at Brown, McCarroll, L.L.P.

1400 One Congress Plaza, 111 Congress Ave.

Austin, TX 78701

Mary Hunnell Smith

Attorney at Smith & Smith

4900 Woodway, Suite 1030

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Order withdrawing status report [31-1] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks for filing and docketing in A-04-CA-502 SS. (mc2) (Entered: 02/07/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Written bankruptcy status report by Charles D. Valadez (withdrawn per Order filed 2/7/05 and filed and docketed under A-04-CA-502). (mc2) Modified on 02/07/2005 (Entered: 12/06/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • Received, confirmation of receipt of transfer by Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Philadelphia Div. on 11/4/04, and assigned their case #04-27320. (mc2) (Entered: 11/08/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • Sent copy of state court petition and certified copy of docket sheet to the Clerk of U.S. District Court, Eastern District of PA, Philadelphia, PA this date. (mc2) (Entered: 11/01/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2004
  • Case closed (mc2) (Entered: 11/01/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Certified Copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order (mc2) (Entered: 11/01/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2004
  • Copy of Letter by MDL to Clerk, Philadelphia, PA regarding: pending conditional transfer order. Copy to Court 10/13/04. (mc2) (Entered: 10/13/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Written status report on anticipated transfer to the MDL court by Wyeth (mh) (Entered: 09/23/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Motion by Charles D. Valadez to dismiss (mc2) (Entered: 09/15/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Order granting motion to withdraw his motion for certification... and for entry of judgment [26-1], withdrawing motion for certification under FRCP 54(b) [25-1], withdrawing motion for entry of judgment [25-2] signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (mc2) (Entered: 08/25/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Response in opposition by Pltfs Barbara J. Barker, Patricia A. Berry, Edward M. Cavuto, Suzette M. Gwynne, Cynthia T. Price, Relinda G. Spicer to Dft Wyeth's motion for stay of proceedings pending tranfer to MDL (Dft's motion for stay not filed in this case but filed in A:04-CA-290) (tdk) Modified on 06/09/2004 (Entered: 06/09/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion by Barbara J. Barker, Patricia A. Berry, Edward M. Cavuto, Suzette M. Gwynne, Cynthia T. Price, Relinda G. Spicer for leave to exceed page limit on Pltfs' motion to remand and memorandum (tdk) (Entered: 06/09/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • Letter to attorneys Velte, Smith, Allen, Block, Elmore, and Henderson regarding non-admissions status (tdk) (Entered: 06/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • Court file prepared and forwarded to Judge Sparks (tdk) (Entered: 06/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order to supplement record with state court filings; signed by Honorable Sam Sparks (tdk) (Entered: 06/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Demand for jury trial by Wyeth (tdk) (Entered: 06/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of filing by Wyeth of disclosure statement (tdk) (Entered: 06/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Appendix of pleadings filed in state court for removal petition [1-1] by Wyeth (tdk) (Entered: 06/02/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice for Removal by Wyeth Filing Fee: $ 150.00 Receipt # 360367 (Pages: 41 + 520) (jk) (Entered: 05/28/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • Case assigned to Honorable Sam Sparks (jk) (Entered: 05/28/2004)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pegi Sue Block

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rockne W. Onstad

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Harrison Henderson, III(Designation Retained)