Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2020 at 04:14:27 (UTC).

Abarca, et. al. vs. Merck & Co., et.al.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2007 Abarca filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Merck Co . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:07-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Virginia Gonzales

Kerman Eddings

Donna Simmons

Dolores Gonzalez

Henry G. Moreno

Kathy Ramos

Nelba Gonzalez

Jesse Espinosa

Rusty Mileur

Angel Negrete

Earl Brewer

Maria Mendoza

Daisha Mattox

Sergio Avila

Pablo Alvarez

Ashley Ornelas

Dalen Breazeale

Maria Riley

Demetrio Quintero

Defendant

County of Merced

491 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael E Lehman

Attorney at Ericksen Arbuthnot

2440 West Shaw, Suite 101

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant Attorneys

Jeff Coyner

Attorney at Greben & Associates

John Lauchlan Kortum

Attorney at Archer Norris

2033 North Main St., 8Th Floor

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

Eugene Tanaka

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

2001 N. Main Street, Suite 390

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Scott D. Laird

Attorney at Wanger Jones Helsley PC

265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310, Post Office Box 28340

Fresno, CA 93720

Carissa Beecham

Attorney at Kronick Moskovitz Tiedemann & Girard

400 Capitol Mall, 27Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Stephen G. Larson

Attorney at Larson O'Brien LLP

555 S. Flower St., Ste. 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jack Silver

708 Gravenstein Highway North, Suite 407

Sebastopol, Ca, CA 95472

Melanie Donnelly

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP (Walnut Creek)

2001 N. Main St., Suite 390

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

John Frank Barg

Attorney at Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP

350 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1435

Donald Evan Sobelman

Attorney at Barg Coffin Lewis and Trapp LLP

350 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1435

John P. Kinsey

Attorney at Wanger Jones Helsley PC

265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310, P.O. Box 28340

Fresno, CA 93720

Christopher Scott Hall

Attorney at Martin Law Firm

113 Court Street, Suite 208

Hanford, CA 93230

Kathryn L. Oehlschlager

350 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1435

Stephen E. Carroll

113 Court Street, Suite 208

Hanford, CA 93230

Robert Harry Greenfield

Attorney at Greenfield Law

2390 Professional Drive

Roseville, CA 95661

Timothy Jones

Attorney at Wanger Jones Helsley PC

265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310, P.O. Box 28340

Fresno, CA 93720

Thomas Vincent Girardi

Attorney at Girardi and Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Brett Lee Runyon

Attorney at Marderosian, Runyon, Cercone, Lehman & Armo

1260 Fulton Mall

Fresno, CA 93721

Daniel M. Fuchs

Attorney at California Attorney General's Office

1300 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

32 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1951

(#1951) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 1/16/14. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J) (Entered: 01/17/2014)

#1950

(#1950) CIVIL MINUTES- GENERAL for Proceedings held before District Judge David O. Carter on 1/09/2014; ORDER ADOPTING Special Masters' Recommendation Regarding Minor Plaintiffs (Doc. #1948 ). (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 01/10/2014)

#1949

(#1949) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Edna Affholter. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

#1948

(#1948) PROPOSED ORDER re RECOMMENDATION BY SPECIAL MASTERS TO THE HONORABLE DAVID O. CARTER REGARDING THE COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT OF THE CLAIMS OF MINOR PLAINTIFFS by Edna Affholter. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2014)

#1947

RESTRICTED

#1946

RESTRICTED

#1945

(#1945) ORDER for Miscellaneous Relief to File Exhibit Under Seal, Signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/19/2013. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

#1944

(#1944) ORDER ESTABLISHING and APPROVING the Qualified Settlement Fund, Signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/19/2013. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

#1943

(#1943) ORDER FOR PUBLICATION of Notice to Missing Plaintiffs, Signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/19/2013. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

6 #2

VDRP Forms

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *A A & A Associates, Inc., Merced Irrigation District, Merced Irrigation District No. 1, County of Merced, City of Merced, Ranchwood Homes Corp., Franklin County Water District* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Michael G. Marderosian* *Marderosian, Runyon, Cercone, Lehman & Armo* *1260 Fulton Mall* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/13/2007)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of RELATED CASE cv-05979 by Edna Affholter. Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiffs (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2007)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Edna Affholter (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2007)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CLEAN WATER ACT, 33 U.S.C. SECTION 1251 ET SEQ; INVERSE CONDEMNATION; NEGLIGENT MAINTENANCE; DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY; NUISANCE AND UNREASONABLE FLOOD BARRIER against Franklin County Water District, et al. by Edna Affholter. Attorney Marderosian, Michael G. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2007)

4,428 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1951) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 1/16/14. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J) (Entered: 01/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1950) CIVIL MINUTES- GENERAL for Proceedings held before District Judge David O. Carter on 1/09/2014; ORDER ADOPTING Special Masters' Recommendation Regarding Minor Plaintiffs (Doc. #1948 ). (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 01/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1949) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Edna Affholter. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1948) PROPOSED ORDER re RECOMMENDATION BY SPECIAL MASTERS TO THE HONORABLE DAVID O. CARTER REGARDING THE COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT OF THE CLAIMS OF MINOR PLAINTIFFS by Edna Affholter. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1947) SEALED EVENT. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/31/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1946) SEALED EVENT. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1945) ORDER for Miscellaneous Relief to File Exhibit Under Seal, Signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/19/2013. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1944) ORDER ESTABLISHING and APPROVING the Qualified Settlement Fund, Signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/19/2013. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1943) ORDER FOR PUBLICATION of Notice to Missing Plaintiffs, Signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/19/2013. (Arellano, S.) (Entered: 12/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1942) PROPOSED ORDER re RECOOMENDATION BY SPECIAL MASTERS TO THE HONORABLE DAVID O. CARTER REGARDING THE COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMETN OF THE CLAIMS OF MINOR PLAINTIFFS; ORDER by Edna Affholter. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,943 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by Edna Affholter. County of Merced waiver sent on 5/1/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by Edna Affholter. City of Merced waiver sent on 5/1/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Oliver W. Wanger for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony W. Ishii no longer assigned to case Scheduling Conference RE-set for 7/13/2007 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/23/07. (New Case Number 1:07-cv-388 OWW DLB)(Kusamura, W) (Entered: 03/26/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Sylvianna Marquez, Kasey Martin, Mary Martinez, Ralph Martinez, Felix Masasso, Imogene Masasso, Ken Masasso, Angela Barragan, Mater Dei Dairy, Daisha Mattox, Isaiah Mattox, Paige Mattox, Steve Mattox, Linda S. Mays, James B. Mays, Sr, McGarry Property Management, Russell C. McGarry, Jr, Layla Marie McGinty, Juan J. Barragan, Linda McGinty, Chris Meissonnier, Victor Meissonnier, Adriana Mejia, Nelson Mejia, Marcelino Mendoza, Maria Mendoza, Maria Mendoza, Stanley Arceo, Miguel Mendoza, Mike Menssen, Tania Barragan, Socorro Meza, Diane Miguel, Maria Milbourn, Susan Milbourn, Lori Mileur, Rusty Mileur, Meggan Mileur, Cornelio Minor, Virginia Minor, Miguel Cando Montano, Maria O. Barragan, Elvira Montes, Pablo Montes, Rosarito Montes, Stephanie Mora, Gandy Edwin Moreno, Henry G. Moreno, Jaime Moreno, Jaime R. Moreno, Janet G. Moreno, Maria Moreno, James Batchelor, Marla Moss, Amy Moua, Kou Moua, Gabriela Arciega, Narry Moua, Steven Moua, Tony Moua, Ka Moua, Pang Moua, Isidora Munoz, Cirilo Najera, Juan Najera, Lauriana Najera, Maria C. Najera, Alejandro Nava, Graciela Nava, Alejandro Nava, Jr, Francisco Navarro, Jasmine Navarro, Rosalva Navarro, Trinidad Navarro, Sandra Beammer Batchelor, Angel Negrete, Juana Negrete, Juan M. Nunez, Francisco Ochoa, Gabriela Ochoa, Jose Ochoa, Maria Ochoa, Ximena Ochoa, Audie Armstrong, Adrian Ornelas, Ashley Ornelas, Stephanie Belden, Destinee Ornelas, Linda Ornelas, Ray Ornelas, III, Ray Ornelas, Jr, Isabel Christina Orosco, Rafael Orosco, Brianna M. Orozco, Jose Orozco, Juanita Orozco, Manuel S. Orozco, Michael Bettencourt, Jesus M. Orozco, Juanita Orozco, Candelaria Ortega, Herbert Ortega, Mario Ortega, Phillip Parga, Sheila Parga, Carnell Parrish, Sandra Parrish, Steve Pattison, Yensy Bonilla, Everett Penfold, Laverne Penfold, Lenora Penfold, George Armstrong, Kristy L. Perez, Alice Peterson, Morris Peterson, Cristy Posada, Loan Kim Quach, Miguel A. Cando Quezada, Demetrio Quintero, Carrie Borges, Demetrio Quintero, III, Lizbeth Ramirez, Maria Linda Ramirez, Michael Ramirez, Rigoberto Ramirez, Sandra Noemi Ramirez, Teresa Ramirez, Arturo Ramirez, Jr, Arturo Ramirez, Sr, John Ramos, Tiphanie Borges, Kathy Ramos, Cassie Real, Gregory Real, Joshua Real, Meagan Real, Nick Regla, Abigail Reyes, Lucy Armstrong, Norma Reyes, Valentine Reyes, Sr, Maria Riley, Ashley Brauchler, Paul Riley, Jerist Roberts, Gabriel D. Romo, Anastacio Rosales, Angel Salas, Jailene Salas, Juan Salas, Carmelita Sanchez, Gustavo Sanchez, Jimmy Sanchez, Audra Brauchler, Maria Sanchez, Andres Sandoval, Ari Sandoval, Carlos Sandoval, Gerardo Sandoval, J.J. Sandoval, Jackie Sandoval, Josie Sandoval, Juan Sandoval, Michael Sandoval, Diana Brauchler, Rafael Sandoval, Rosario Sandoval, Mercedes D. Avalos, Selene Sandoval, Tania Sandoval, Paul Schindler, Frances Schlinder, Michael Schreiber, Curtis Scott, Chey Simmons, Connie Simmons, John T. Brauchler, Donna Simmons, Tagen Simmons, Scott Skinner, Daniel Snell, Josie Snell, Xavier Snell, Ron Snethen, Caden N. Soares, Carol A. Soares, Conner D. Soares, Kristen Brauchler, Courtney D. Soares, Laurie Soares, Manuel Soares, Toby Soares, Veronica Solis, Earllisha Storey, Hazel Stultz, Alejandro Avila, Lillie Tate, Alvin Tate, Jr, Alvin Tate, III, Dalen Breazeale, Alexandria Taylor, Gregory Taylor, Mary Katherine Taylor, Antonio Terra, Kelly Thomas, Nancy Thomas, Minh Van Trieu, Bruce Trindade, John Vanderploeg, Ignacio Vega, Earl Brewer, Maria Vega, Marilynn Vega, Tereza Villareal de Orosco, Rosalie Ward, William Ward, Gary Warner, Darla J. Webb, Heather E. Webb, Mary A. Webb, Miranda White, Bertha M. Brizendine, Carmen R. Yanez, Jesus Zamarripa, Luis J. Avila, Mariceilia Zamarripa, Virginia Zamarripa, Martha E. Zuniga, Harvel Brizendine, Timothy H. Brizendine, Sergio Avila, Burnetta Brown, Robert - Brown, Angelina Bryant, Sergio J. Avila, Christie Bryant, James Bryant, Jamiee Bryant, Jeanette Bryant, Virginia Bryant, Rafael K. Burguette, Maria Magdalena Camacho, Roberto Campos, Roberto III Campos, Etta L. Capers, Alfredo Cardoza, Guadalupe G. Cardoza, Bertha Castaneda, David Castaneda, Isidro Castaneda, Ricardo Castaneda, Maria Cerna, Caydense Chanthavongsor, Ben Chavez, Patsy Clayton, Mike Codd, Jelisa Cortez, Leanna Counts, Michelle Crider, Sydney Dalmaso, Edna Affholter, Tony Dalmaso, Zachary Dalmaso, Beatrice Dart, Dalton Jay Dart, Edward Davis, Sheila Davis, Leila Davis-Lear, Nadine M. Dhanju, Discount Auto Finance, LLC, Samuel Douthit, Juan Arnolfo Barajas, Susan Douthit, Kerman Eddings, Kimberly Barcellos, Brandon Ellison, Kaydence Ellison, Irma M. Espinosa, Josef Espinosa, William J. Espinosa, Jesse Espinosa, Martin Esquivel, Sabas Esquivel, Jaime Farias, Jaime II Farias, Isabel Christina Felix, Rudolph John Felix, Bobbie Felling, Jerry Affholter, Gene E. Felling, Angel Fernandez, Edith Fernandez, Jonathan Fernandez, Ulysses Fernandez, Abraham H. Figueroa, Ana Itzel Figueroa, Ivan Sergio Figueroa, James M. Flagg, Mary Lou Flagg, Maria A. Flores, Rodolfo Flores, Denise Fontenette, Gilbert Fontenette, Louvenia Fontenette, Hildegard Fordon, Brenda Frank, Dennis Frank, Elijah Franklin, Ishmael Franklin, Susan Fril, Alan Gallardo, Alex Gallardo, Allison Gallardo, Angelina Gallardo, Zachariah Aliej-Amayu, Audra Gallardo, Alex Gallardo, Jr, Michael C. Garces, Daniel M.J. Garces, Adrian Garcia, Adriana Garcia, Alfredo Garcia, Damaris Garcia, Ernesto Garcia, Gabriel F. Garcia, Henry Garcia, John S. Garcia, Jonathon Garcia, Jose P. Garcia, Maria Garcia, Medelia Garcia, Raul Garcia, Sandyra Belen Garcia, Victalina Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Enrique Garcia, Dolores Garcia, Amanda Gates, Donald Gates, Syrinity Gates, Leanne Allen, Zoey Gates, Philip Gauthier, Allys Gonzales, Manuel F. Gonzales, Mary Gonzales, Virginia Gonzales, Reinaldo Gonzales, Jr, Daniel Gonzalez, Dolores Gonzalez, Elijah Gonzalez, Emmanuel Gonzalez, Jesus Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Krystal Gonzalez, Liliana Gonzalez, Martiza Gonzalez, Nelba Gonzalez, Rodrigo Gonzalez, Teresa Gonzalez, Zenaida Gonzalez, Barbara Guth, Heinz Guth, Lizette Gutierrez, Alvino Guzman, Marina Guzman, Jesus Alvarez, Marlen Guzman, Raul Guzman, Santiago Guzman, Stephen Guzman, Salvador Guzman, Sr, Michael Haarmeyer, Chris Hammond, Dustin Hammond, Josh Hammond, Steve Hammond, Virginia Hammond, Lovey Hartman, Donaven Hern, Mee Her, Ramona Herkert, John J. Herkert, Jr, Avaceli Hernandez, Francisco Hernandez, Leah Hernandez, Luis Hernandez, Luis A. Hernandez, Margarita Hernandez, Maria Hernandez, Rosemary Hernandez, Sheryl Herring, Maribel Alvarez, Arturo Higareda, Maria Guadalupe Higareda, Martha Higareda, Nancy Higareda, Rosario Higareda, Arturo Higareda, Jr, Jane Hinman, Diana Lee Holt, Albert Huerta, Albert Huerta, Jr, Alicia Huerta, Denice Huggins, Doug Huggins, Joyce Hunwardsen, Remus Hunwardsen, Summer Hunwardsen, Remus Hunwardsen, Jr, Steven Jacot, Roger Lee Janz, Roger S. Janz, Graciela Jimenez, Maria Jimenez, Rafael Jimenez, Charles - Jones, Ritchy Keeney, Pablo Alvarez, Debbie Kelley, Joshua Kelley, Sean Kelley, Brian Kleinert, Lynda Kleinert, Babette Lane, Virgil Lane, Frank Lara, Maria Lara, Leticia Lazaro, Anna Maria Licea, Paula Lindo, Melanie Barcellos, Adrian Lopez, Sonia Lopez, Bobby Lumley, Eufracia Lumley, Knute Lund, Jeanette Macias, Richard Macias, Carmen R. Macias, Max Maldonado, Maria Marquez, Ricardo Marquez, Rigoberto Marquez, Rogelio Marquez, Pablo I. Alvarez.(Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2007 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms #2 VDRP Forms) (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/13/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *A A & A Associates, Inc., Merced Irrigation District, Merced Irrigation District No. 1, County of Merced, City of Merced, Ranchwood Homes Corp., Franklin County Water District* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Michael G. Marderosian* *Marderosian, Runyon, Cercone, Lehman & Armo* *1260 Fulton Mall* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/13/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • RECEIPT number 100 204715 for $350.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Runyon Marderosian. (Timken, A) (Entered: 03/13/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of RELATED CASE cv-05979 by Edna Affholter. Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiffs (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Edna Affholter (Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CLEAN WATER ACT, 33 U.S.C. SECTION 1251 ET SEQ; INVERSE CONDEMNATION; NEGLIGENT MAINTENANCE; DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY; NUISANCE AND UNREASONABLE FLOOD BARRIER against Franklin County Water District, et al. by Edna Affholter. Attorney Marderosian, Michael G. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Marderosian, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Silver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel M. Fuchs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Frank Barg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P. Kinsey