This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 14:00:12

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 12/28/1994 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by Practice Mgmt Info against AMA in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details

  • Case Number 94-56774
  • Filing Date 12/28/1994
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Copyright
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Courts Of Appeals
  • Courthouse U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

Party Details

  • Undetermined The American Medical Association, An Illinois Nonprofit Corporation
  • Represented By
    • Jack R. Bierig
    • Peter I. Ostroff Esquire
    • Henry L. Mason Esquire Iii
  • Undetermined Practice Management Information Corporation, A California Corporation
  • Represented By
    • Paul A. Stewart
    • Joseph R. Re

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2001
  • (#99) RECORD RETURNED. (See control card for details.) (Sefarian, Steve) [Entered: 09/13/2001 09:34 AM]
  • 09/27/1999
  • (#98) MANDATE ISSUED [94-56774] (CW) [Entered: 09/27/1999 07:39 AM]
  • 10/26/1998
  • (#97) Filed Supreme Court order, certiorari denied on 10/5/98. Supreme Court No. 97-1254 [94-56774] (GV) [Entered: 10/26/1998 03:10 PM]
  • 10/08/1998
  • (#96) Filed Supreme Court order ( SC Date: 10/5/98) The pet for rhrg is DENIED [94-56774] (MF) [Entered: 10/15/1998 02:59 PM]
  • 07/09/1998
  • (#93) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: sa) recalling the mandate as having issued prematurely (still pending in part before the Sup. Ct.) [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 07/09/1998 01:21 PM]
  • 07/01/1998
  • (#92) Filed Supreme Court order, certiorari denied on 6/26/98, Supreme Court No. 97-1567. MANDATE ISSUED [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 07/02/1998 03:36 PM]
  • 04/09/1998
  • (#91) Received notice from Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed, Supreme Court No. 97-1567 filed on 3/20/98. [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 04/13/1998 10:13 AM]
  • 02/13/1998
  • (#90) Received Paul A. Stewart for Appellant Practice Mgmt. Info. letter dated 2/11/98 re: Practice Management filed its petion for cert w/ Sup. Ct. on 1/29/98 (CASE FILES); served 2/11/98 [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 02/17/1998 03:18 PM]
  • 02/09/1998
  • (#89) Received notice from Supreme Court: petition for certiorari Supreme Court No. 97-1254 filed on 2/2/98. [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 02/12/1998 02:53 PM]
  • 01/16/1998
  • (#88) Filed order ( James R. BROWNING, ): Deft-Aple AMA's mtn for stay of mdt pending petition for cert is granted. The mdt is stayed pending the deft-aple's and pltf-aplt's respective petitions to the SC for a writ of cert. [94-56774] (XX) [Entered: 01/16/1998 07:45 AM]
  • 01/09/1998
  • (#85) Filed order ( James R. BROWNING, Stephen R. REINHARDT): The opinion file 8/6/97 is amended as follows: 1. The second sentence in the past paragraph of Section III is stricken, and the third sentence is amended to read: " Because the AMA did not lobby HCFA to adopt the CPT, the AMA's First Amendment right to petition the govt is not at stake." 121 f.3d 516, 521 (9th Cir. 1997) 2. The words "on its copyright misuse claim" are added to the last sentence of the opinion. 121 F.3d at 521. [94-56774] (CW) [Entered: 01/12/1998 09:35 AM]
  • 12/31/1997
  • (#83) Filed Appellant Practice Mgmt. Info. response supporting appellee's motion to stay the mandate [AUTHOR]; served on 12/30/97 [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 12/31/1997 01:34 PM]
  • 12/30/1997
  • (#82) Filed aple AMA motion to stay the mandate (AUTHOR) [94-56774] served on 12/29/97 [3366668] (SA) [Entered: 12/30/1997 01:42 PM]
  • 12/23/1997
  • (#80) Filed order ( James R. BROWNING, Stephen R. REINHARDT, ): denying petition for enbanc rehearing [73] [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 12/23/1997 08:42 AM]
  • 10/23/1997
  • (#79) Rcvd notice of Supreme Court order, certiorari denied on 10/20/97, Supreme Court No. 97-401 (CASE FILES) [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 10/28/1997 02:51 PM]
  • 09/24/1997
  • (#77) Filed Appellant Practice Mgmt. Info.'s response to petition opposing petition for enbanc rehearing, 10 pages (PANEL AND ALL ACTIVE JUDGES); served on 9/23/97 [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 09/25/1997 01:52 PM]
  • 09/23/1997
  • (#78) Filed aple AMA additional citations (PANEL & ALL ACTIVE JUDGES), served on 9/22/97 [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 09/25/1997 02:23 PM]
  • 09/17/1997
  • (#76) Received notice from Supreme Court: petition for certiorari Supreme Court No. 97-401 filed on 9/4/97. [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 09/18/1997 02:39 PM]
  • 09/10/1997
  • (#75) Filed order (James R. BROWNING, John T. NOONAN, Stephen R. REINHARDT): Aplt is requested to file a response to aple's petition for enbc rhrg. The resp shall be filed no later than 14 days from the date of this order and shall consist of no more than 10 pages. [94-56774] (SA) [Entered: 09/10/1997 03:56 PM]
  • 08/20/1997
  • (#73) [3289217] Filed original and 40 copies Appellee AMA petition for rehearing with suggestion for rehearing en banc 15 p.pages, served on 8/20/97 (PANEL AND ALL ACTIVE JUDGES) (SM) [Entered: 08/21/1997 04:26 PM]

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.