This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 09:16:35 (UTC).

Minow v. Carey, et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2001 Minow filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Carey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Owen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:01-CV-02471

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Owen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vernon Minow

Defendants

Wally Music

Sony Music Publishing, Inc.

Roy Wunsch

Rye Songs

Sony Music Entertainment Inc.

Walter Afanasieff

Mariah Carey

Tommy Mottola

Rye Music

Sony Songs, Inc.

Columbia Records, Inc.

Tracy Gershon

Sony Tunes, Inc.

Sony Corporation of America

CBS Music, Inc.

Wallyworld Music

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edmund John Ferdinand, III

Attorney at Jeffers Cowherd P.C.

55 Walls Drive

Fairfield, CT 06824

Leora Herrmann

Attorney at Grimes & Battersby, L.L.P.

Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Stuart Leslie Sanders

Attorney at Kazlow & Kazlow

19 West 34Th Street, Suite 905

New York, NY 10001

Steven A. Soulios

Attorney at Ruta & Soulios LLP

1500 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

David Robert Baum

Attorney at Dentons US LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Orin Snyder

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

144 W. Houston Street., Apt 3.

New York, NY 10012

 

Court Documents

#27

#31

#32

#36

#37

#38

#40

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Returned [2 VOL]. Indexed record on Appeal Files for #40 USCA Mandate, Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge, Appeal Record Sent to USCA - File USCA Case Number 09-5131-cv, returned from the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 09/07/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #40 USCA Mandate,. (nd) (Entered: 06/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernon Minow USCA Case Number 09-5131-cv. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as unnecessary because the Appellant has since paid his filing fee, the remaining motions are DENIED, and the appeal is DISMISSED because it lacks an arguable basis in law or fact. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 06/15/2010. (nd) (Entered: 06/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • DocketReceived returned mail: Mail was addressed to Vernon Minow at 4205 Tropacana Ave, Apt. 2078 Las Vegas, NV 89103 and was returned for the following reason(s): Attempted - Not Known. (eef) (Entered: 03/09/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number E 894795 on 2/22/10 at 4:13:53 PM re: #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernon Minow. (tp) (Entered: 02/24/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER: This is a closed case in which Plaintiff asserted copyright infringement and related claims. Plaintiff now moves pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) for the Court to reconsider and reverse its decision denying his earlier motion to reopen the case based on principles of equitable tolling. (See Dkt. No. 32.) For the following reasons the motion is DENIED, as set forth herein.. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/8/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 02/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Reconsideration re; #32 Order. Document filed by Vernon Minow.(mbe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2010: #1 Notice, #2 Notice) (mbe). (Entered: 02/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA Case Number 09-5131-cv from the US Court of Appeals, Second Circuit assigned to #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernon Minow. (nd) (Entered: 12/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (File)[2 VOL]. Indexed record on Appeal Files for #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernon Minow were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 12/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernon Minow 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (nd). (Entered: 12/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2001
  • Docket(#8) RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Sony Music, CBS Music, Inc., Sony Songs, Inc., Sony Tunes, Inc., Columbia Records. (sn) (Entered: 07/25/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2001
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and ORDER; reset answer due for 7/20/01 for CBS Music, Inc., for Columbia Records, for Wallyworld Music, for Wally Music, for Sony Music, for Sony Tunes, Inc., for Sony Songs, Inc., for Sony Music, for Sony Corporation, for Tommy Mottola, for Tracy Gershon, for Roy Wunsch, for Walter Afanasieff . ( signed by Judge Richard Owen ) (djc) (Entered: 06/22/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 6/22/01 for CBS Music, Inc., for Columbia Records, for Wallyworld Music, for Wally Music, for Sony Music, for Sony Tunes, Inc., for Sony Songs, Inc., for Sony Music, for Sony Corporation, for Tommy Mottola, for Tracy Gershon, for Roy Wunsch, for Walter Afanasieff ( signed by Judge Richard Owen ) (lam) (Entered: 05/10/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 6/22/01 for CBS Music, Inc., for Columbia Records, for Wallyworld Music, for Wally Music, for Sony Music, for Sony Tunes, Inc., for Sony Songs, Inc., for Sony Music, for Sony Corporation, for Tommy Mottola, for Tracy Gershon, for Roy Wunsch, for Walter Afanasieff ( signed by Judge Richard Owen ) (lam) (Entered: 05/03/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 5/11/01 for CBS Music, Inc., for Columbia Records, for Wallyworld Music, for Wally Music, for Sony Music, for Sony Tunes, Inc., for Sony Songs, Inc., for Sony Music, for Sony Corporation, for Tommy Mottola, for Tracy Gershon, for Roy Wunsch, and for Walter Afanasieff . ( signed by Judge Richard Owen ) (kw) (Entered: 05/03/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2001
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT by Vernon Minow (Answer due 4/9/01 for CBS Music, Inc., for Columbia Records, for Wallyworld Music, for Wally Music, for Sony Music, for Rye Songs, for Rye Music, for Sony Tunes, Inc., for Sony Songs, Inc., for Sony Music, for Sony Corporation, for Tommy Mottola, for Tracy Gershon, for Roy Wunsch, for Walter Afanasieff, for Mariah Carey ) amending [1-1] complaint; Summons issued. (cd) (Entered: 03/27/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • DocketMailed notice to Register of Copyrights. (tp) (Entered: 03/26/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • Docket(#2) RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Vernon Minow. (tp) (Entered: 03/26/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (tp) (Entered: 03/26/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 400523. (tp) (Entered: 03/26/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart L. Sanders