Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2021 at 04:15:04 (UTC).

John Garamendi, et al v. Altus Finance S A, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/1999 John Garamendi filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Altus Finance S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carla Woehrle and R. Gary Klausner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:99-CV-02829

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carla Woehrle

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

John Garamendi

Petitioner

RoNo LLC

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

MAAF Vie SA

Francois Pinault

Jean Francois Henin

CDR Enterprises

Jean Irigoin

Consortium De Realisation SA

MAAF Assurances

Alain Mallart

Does 1 to 500 inclusive

Artemis Finance S N C

New California Holdings Inc

Artemis America

Aurora National Life Assurance Company

Sierra National Life Holdings Inc

John Garamendi

Counter Defendants, Intervenors and Intervenor Defendants

National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations

John Garamendi

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Francois Pinault

Artemis Finance S N C

New California Holdings Inc

Artemis America

Aurora National Life Assurance Company

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Jean Francois Henin

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CDR Enterprises

Consortium De Realisation SA

Intervenors

Apollo Advisors LP

National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations

Leon D Black

Craig M Cogut

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

George B Newhouse, Jr

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 2500, 26Fl, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Patricia K Staggs

Attorney at California Department of Insurance

45 Fremont St

San Francisco, CA 94105

Arnold Barba

707 Wilshire Boulevard, 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Karl D Belgum

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

John P Olson

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

555 W 5Th St, Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1024

James P Maniscalco

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

555 W 5Th St, Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1024

Bernard P Simons

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joel A Glover

1200 17Th St, Ste 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Richard J Ney

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke LLP

350 S Grand Ave, Ste 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marshall R King

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Ave, 47Th Fl

New York, NY 10166-0193

Robert C Bonner

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 S Grand Ave, 45Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Robert L Weigel

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Ave, 47Th Fl

New York, NY 10166-0193

Boynton M Rawlings

Attorney at Rawlings & Giles

Mark T Jansen

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

275 Battery Street, 23Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert M Kelly

Attorney at White & Case

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-2787

Juan P Morillo

Attorney at Sidley Austin Brown & Wood

1501 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Mark T Jansen

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

275 Battery Street, 23Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Counter Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

Bernard P Simons

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joel A Glover

1200 17Th St, Ste 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Other Attorneys

Frederick W Acker

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Monica Marquardt Riederer

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Ave, 47Th Fl

New York, NY 10166-0193

Jan Zabriskie

Attorney at CAAG Office of Attorney General of California

1300 I St, Ste 125, P O Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Kathleen Burdette Shields

Attorney at Choate Hall and Stewart

2 International Place

Boston, MA 02100

157 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#4398

(#4398) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4355 filed by Artemis S A, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4344 filed by Steven Poizner, as Insurance Commisioner of the State of California, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #4354 filed by National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, California Life and Health Insurance Guarantee Association. CCA # 13-55567, 13-55684 13-55699. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#4397

(#4397) SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of John Garamendi Against Artemis S A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff John Garamendi. (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#4395

(#4395) Mail Returned addressed to John P. Olson re Order #4387 (pso) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#4392

(#4392) ORDER APPROVING FINAL SETTLEMENT OF ACTION AND PAYMENT INSTRUCTIONS FOR TRANSFER OF FUNDS HELD IN USAO/ARTEMIS SETTLEMENT ACCOUNT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation for Settlement #4389 . See Order For Specifics. (bp) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

4389 #6

Proposed Order

4389 #5

Exhibit D

4389 #4

Exhibit C

4389 #3

Exhibit B

4389 #2

Exhibit A

4389 #1

Declaration

#4389

(#4389) Joint STIPULATION for Settlement Approval filed by Defendant Artemis S A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#4387

(#4393) Mail Returned addressed to Isabelle Hurtubise re Order #4387 (pso) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

#4355

(#4398) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4355 filed by Artemis S A, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4344 filed by Steven Poizner, as Insurance Commisioner of the State of California, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #4354 filed by National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, California Life and Health Insurance Guarantee Association. CCA # 13-55567, 13-55684 13-55699. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#4354

(#4398) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4355 filed by Artemis S A, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4344 filed by Steven Poizner, as Insurance Commisioner of the State of California, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #4354 filed by National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, California Life and Health Insurance Guarantee Association. CCA # 13-55567, 13-55684 13-55699. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#4344

(#4398) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4355 filed by Artemis S A, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4344 filed by Steven Poizner, as Insurance Commisioner of the State of California, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #4354 filed by National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, California Life and Health Insurance Guarantee Association. CCA # 13-55567, 13-55684 13-55699. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#7

(#7) MINUTES: OSC that plf show cause in writing nlt 8/3/99 why actn shld not be dism fr lack of prosc as to all defts by Judge A. H. Matz CR: none (lc) (Entered: 07/19/1999)

#5

(#5) Proof of service of subst atty and A/C executed on 6/17/99 by mail on Richard J Ney & Susan St Denis of Chadbourne & Parke, on Donald I Strauber, Whitney I Gerard, Rachel L Simon of Chadbourne & Parke (NY); on Travers D Wood and C Randolph Fisburn of White & Case; on Richard J Holwell & thomas McGanney of White & Case(NY); on Lawrence B Friedman, Mitchell A Lowenthal & Jennifer L Kroman of Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton; on Clerk of Sup Crt LA, Central (lc) (Entered: 06/21/1999)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Strumwasser & Woocher for Chuck Quackenbush by plaintiff Chuck Quackenbush and substituting Thelen Reid & Priest by Judge A. H. Matz (lc) (Entered: 06/21/1999)

2,302 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4398) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4355 filed by Artemis S A, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #4344 filed by Steven Poizner, as Insurance Commisioner of the State of California, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #4354 filed by National Organization of Life & Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, California Life and Health Insurance Guarantee Association. CCA # 13-55567, 13-55684 13-55699. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4397) SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of John Garamendi Against Artemis S A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff John Garamendi. (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4396) Notice of Electronic Filing re Mail Returned #4395 e-mailed to Harriet B Leva at hleva@jonesday.com bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to harriet.leva@gmail.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4395) Mail Returned addressed to John P. Olson re Order #4387 (pso) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4392) ORDER APPROVING FINAL SETTLEMENT OF ACTION AND PAYMENT INSTRUCTIONS FOR TRANSFER OF FUNDS HELD IN USAO/ARTEMIS SETTLEMENT ACCOUNT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation for Settlement #4389 . See Order For Specifics. (bp) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4391) Notice of Electronic Filing re Mail Returned #4388 , Stipulation for Settlement #4389 e-mailed to Robert A Holland bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted - not a registered user. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4390) Notice of Electronic Filing re Mail Returned #4388 , Stipulation for Settlement #4389 e-mailed to Harriet B Leva bounced due to invalid email address. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to harriet.leva@gmail.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4394) Mail Returned addressed to George Terwilliger re Order #4387 (pso) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4393) Mail Returned addressed to Isabelle Hurtubise re Order #4387 (pso) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4389) Joint STIPULATION for Settlement Approval filed by Defendant Artemis S A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
4,442 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/1999
  • (#9) RESPONSE by plaintiff Chuck Quackenbush to OSC for lack of prosecution [7-1] (jag) (Entered: 08/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/1999
  • (#8) Proof of service of sms & A/C executed upon defendant Credit Lyonnais S A by srv Cheryl James, administrative asst, for Diane Scott, agent for srv of process, personally on 6/21/99 & by mail 6/25/99 (lc) (Entered: 07/29/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTES: OSC that plf show cause in writing nlt 8/3/99 why actn shld not be dism fr lack of prosc as to all defts by Judge A. H. Matz CR: none (lc) (Entered: 07/19/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1999
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Chuck Quackenbush terminating defendant - Mutuelle Assurance, defendant Mutuelle Assurance; adding Consortium De Real, MAAF Assurances, MAAF Vie SA; jury demand. sms issd (lc) Modified on 06/22/1999 (Entered: 06/22/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proof of service of subst atty and A/C executed on 6/17/99 by mail on Richard J Ney & Susan St Denis of Chadbourne & Parke, on Donald I Strauber, Whitney I Gerard, Rachel L Simon of Chadbourne & Parke (NY); on Travers D Wood and C Randolph Fisburn of White & Case; on Richard J Holwell & thomas McGanney of White & Case(NY); on Lawrence B Friedman, Mitchell A Lowenthal & Jennifer L Kroman of Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton; on Clerk of Sup Crt LA, Central (lc) (Entered: 06/21/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Strumwasser & Woocher for Chuck Quackenbush by plaintiff Chuck Quackenbush and substituting Thelen Reid & Priest by Judge A. H. Matz (lc) (Entered: 06/21/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • (#3) PROOF OF SERVICE by Credit Lyonnais S A on 4/29/99 of ntc to adv pty of removal by mail (lc) (Entered: 04/30/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/1999
  • NOTICE; Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to counsels Lawrence B Friedman and Mitchell A Lowenthal on 3/19/99 (jp) (Entered: 03/19/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1999
  • (#2) JOINDER by defendant Mutuelle Assurance, defendant - Mutuelle Assurance, defendant Jean-Claude Seys, defendant Jean Irigoin joining not of removal [1-1] (lori) (Entered: 03/26/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1999
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant CDR Enterprises, defendant Credit Lyonnais S A from LA Cnty Sup Ct, Central District ( Case Number: BC 205570) with copy summons and complaint referred to Discovery Carla M. Woehrle . (jp) (Entered: 03/19/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less