This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2018 05:22:38

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 04/25/2002 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by John G Danielson, Inc against Winchester-conant in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit.

Case Details

  • Case Number 02-1452
  • Filing Date 04/25/2002
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Property - Personal Property Fraud
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Courts Of Appeals
  • Courthouse U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

Party Details

  • Plaintiff / Appellee John G. Danielson, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Anthony Eugene Battelle
    • Charles R. Heuer
  • Defendant / Appellant Winchester-conant, Winchester-conant Properties, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Judith Ashton
    • Gary S. Matsko
    • Paul L. Feldman
  • Defendant / Appellant Willows At Winchest, The Willows At Winchester, Llc
  • Represented By
    • Judith Ashton
    • Gary S. Matsko
    • Paul L. Feldman

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2007
  • RECORD ARCHIVES LOCATION - Court of Appeals record held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. Accession No. 276- 060007 Box No. 44 of 183 Archive Date 08-21-06 Brief/File: complete record. [02-1452] (RL) [Entered: 02/13/2007 09:30 AM]
  • 02/13/2007
  • RECORD ARCHIVES LOCATION - Court of Appeals record held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. Accession No. 276- 060007 Box No. 43 of 183 Archive Date 08-21-06 Brief/File: complete record. [02-1452] (RL) [Entered: 02/13/2007 09:29 AM]
  • 04/01/2003
  • RECORD returned to originating court. (SU) [Entered: 04/01/2003 11:28 AM]
  • 03/28/2003
  • MANDATE ISSUED. [02-1452, 02-1533] (SU) [Entered: 03/28/2003 09:46 AM]
  • 03/06/2003
  • JUDGMENT filed by Judge Lynch, Judge Stahl and Judge Howard. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The district court's decisions dismissing Winchester-Conant Properties' affirmative defenses and John G. Danielson, Inc.'s 's unfair competition claims are affirmed. The damages award is vacated and the case is remanded for proceedings to calculate damages consistent with the opinion issued this day. [731435-1] [02-1452, 02-1533] (FJP) [Entered: 03/06/2003 03:11 PM]
  • 03/06/2003
  • OPINION filed by Judge Lynch, Judge Stahl and Judge Howard. Signed Judge Sandra L. Lynch, Authoring Judge. PUBLISHED [731434-1] [02-1452, 02-1533] (FJP) [Entered: 03/06/2003 03:10 PM]
  • 11/07/2002
  • SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD consisting of 94, 95 & 96 filed. [701319-1] [701319-1] in 02-1452, [666849-1] in 02-1452, [651554-1] in 02-1452, [701319-1] in 02-1533, [666850-1] in 02-1533, [655939-1] in 02-1533 [02-1452, 02-1533] (DB) [Entered: 11/07/2002 03:57 PM]
  • 10/11/2002
  • CASE ARGUED 10/11/02. Lynch, Stahl, Howard, JJ. (SU) [Entered: 10/11/2002 12:02 PM]
  • 09/25/2002
  • ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT filed by Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1452, Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1533. [02-1452, 02-1533] (SU) [Entered: 10/01/2002 08:23 AM]
  • 09/18/2002
  • REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1452, Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1533. Length: 30 pages/6500 words, Copies: 9, delivered by hand. Certificate of service date 9/18/02. [687698-1] [02-1452, 02-1533] (SU) [Entered: 09/19/2002 08:49 AM]
  • 09/12/2002
  • Assigned for the month of October, ( 10-11-02 ). [02-1452] (SU) [Entered: 09/12/2002 11:20 AM]
  • 09/06/2002
  • 28(h) BRIEFING SCHEDULE updated. (SU) [Entered: 09/06/2002 09:05 AM]
  • 09/04/2002
  • ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT filed by Appellant Winchester-Conant in 02-1452, Appellant Willows at Winchest in 02-1452, Appellant Winchester-Conant in 02-1533, Appellant Willows at Winchest in 02-1533. [02-1452, 02-1533] (SU) [Entered: 09/06/2002 09:06 AM]
  • 09/04/2002
  • REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Winchester-Conant in 02-1452, Appellant Willows at Winchest in 02-1452, Appellant Winchester-Conant in 02-1533, Appellant Willows at Winchest in 02-1533. Length: 58 pages/13966 words, Copies: 10, delivered by hand. Certificate of service date 9/4/02. [684109-1] [02-1452, 02-1533] (SU) [Entered: 09/06/2002 09:01 AM]
  • 08/09/2002
  • ORDER filed. Upon consideration of motion, It is ordered that the time for defendants-appellantscross-appellees to file their reply brief be enlarged to and including September 4, 2002. Appellee's reply brief is due within 14 days after service of appellants' reply brief. [02-1452, 02-1533] in 02-1452, 02-1533 (LB) [Entered: 08/09/2002 03:20 PM]
  • 08/09/2002
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Winchester-Conant in 02-1452, Appellant Willows at Winchest in 02-1452, Appellant Winchester-Conant in 02-1533, Appellant Willows at Winchest in 02-1533 to extend time to file Appellant's reply brief until 9/4/02. Ext. Code: vac. [02-1452, 02-1533] Certificate of service dated 8/7/02. [02-1452, 02-1533] (LB) [Entered: 08/09/2002 03:08 PM]
  • 07/29/2002
  • DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1452 & 02-1533 filed. [02-1452, 02-1533] (FJP) [Entered: 07/29/2002 10:50 AM]
  • 07/29/2002
  • ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT (brief on disk) filed by Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1452 & 02-1533. [02-1452, 02-1533] (FJP) [Entered: 07/29/2002 10:49 AM]
  • 07/29/2002
  • BRIEF filed by Appellee Danielson, Inc. in 02-1452 & 02-1533. Length: 57 pages (11,970 words), Copies: 9, delivered by hand. Certificate of service date 7/26/02. [673763-1] [02-1452, 02-1533] (FJP) [Entered: 07/29/2002 10:48 AM]
  • 06/27/2002
  • PUBLIC NOTE: [02-1452, 02-1533] Originals of the appendix/exhibits filed in file room; copies filed in exhibit room. (SU) [Entered: 06/27/2002 09:19 AM]

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.