Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2019 at 03:28:31 (UTC).

Connecticut Gen Life, et al v. New Images of Bev, et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/1999 Connecticut Gen Life filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against New Images of Bev. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Victor B. Kenton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:99-CV-08197

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Referral Judge

Victor B. Kenton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Cigna Employee Benefits Services Inc

Equitable Life Assurance Society of The United States

Does 1 thruogh 25

Petitioners and Counter Claimants

Pacific Wilshire Medical & Surgical Center Inc

Cosmetic Surgery Financing Corporation

Willow Glen Enterprises Inc

Medcon Enterprises

D.A.S. International Medical Marketing Ltd

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Abasali Amir-Jahed

Thu Ngoc Pham

Lee D Newman

Thomas Cloud

Susan Alter

Teofilo Po

Advanced Laser Surgical Center

Providence Ambulatory Surgery Center Inc

Will Annexed

Sim Hoffman

The Oaks Diagnostics Inc

Tove Jorgensen

D.A.S. International Medical Marketing Ltd

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Teofilo Po

Willow Glen Enterprises Inc

Sim Hoffman

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Advanced Laser Surgical Center

Providence Ambulatory Surgery Center Inc

The Oaks Diagnostics Inc

78 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas H Case

Attorney at Hennelly and Grossfeld

4640 Admiralty Way, Suite 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90272

Marvin Wexler

Attorney at Kornstein Veisz Wexler and Pollard

757 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Lawrence C Fox

Attorney at Kornstein Veisz Wexler and Pollard

757 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Petitioner Attorney

Joel R Bennett

Attorney at Joel R Bennett Law Office

151 South Orange Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Robert L Corbin

Attorney at Corbin Athey and Martinez LLP

601 West 5Th Street Suite 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2024

Roy Chester Dickson

Attorney at Dickson & Associates APLC

2323 North Tustin Avenue Suite 1

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Dennis E Lee

Attorney at Berliner Steffin Azod LLP

555 West Fifth Street 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Other Attorneys

Scott J Spolin

Attorney at Spolin Silverman Cohen & Bosserman LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Martin R Berman

Attorney at Law Office of Pflaster and Berman

9100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 333 East

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Howard Z Rosen

Attorney at Rosen Marsili Rosen LLP

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2679

Michael F Sisson

Attorney at Michael F Sisson Law Offices

18411 Crenshaw Blvd, Suite 220

Torrance, CA 90504

Edward W Lloyd

23962 Alessandro Blvd, Ste P

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

Rodney M Perlman

Attorney at Wehner & Perlman

12121 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1120

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1123

Gregory R Smith

Attorney at Irell and Manella

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Stephanie L Krafchak

Attorney at Krafchak & Lynch

2029 Century Park East Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Craig Nelson

Attorney at Law Offices of Clark Garen

6700 S. Centinela Ave., 3Rd Fl.

Culver City, CA 90230

Damon G Saltzburg

Attorney at Saltzburg Ray & Bergman LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1166

Thomas John Borchard

Attorney at Borchard & Callahan

25909 Pala, Ste 300

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Laurie E Smith

Attorney at Kaye Scholer

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6048

Gary Scott Soter

Attorney at Pearson Simon Soter Warshaw & Penny LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

58 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#3015

No Description Available

#3004

No Description Available

3003 #5

Exhibit Exhibit C to Fox Decl.

#2884

No Description Available

#2714

No Description Available

#2693

No Description Available

#2422

No Description Available

#1880

No Description Available

#1782

No Description Available

#1629

No Description Available

#1121

No Description Available

#1017

No Description Available

#1016

No Description Available

#888

No Description Available

#680

No Description Available

#139

No Description Available

#65

No Description Available

695 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3302) Mail Returned addressed to Saghi Zilka re USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed #3295 . (jloz) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3301) Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Saghi Zilka re 2nd Alias Writ Returned #3298 . (jp) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3300) Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Saghi Zilka re Alias Writ Returned #3297 . (jp) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3299) Mail Returned addressed to Saghi Zilka re Writ Returned #3296 . (jp) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3304) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE of a Writ of Execution, Notice of Levy, Exemptions from Enforcement of Judgments, etc served by mail on 3/10/08.**NOT FOR PUBLIC VIEW PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT OF 2002* **LATE DOCKETING DUE TO CLERK'S OFFICE ERROR** (yl) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3298) 2ND ALIAS WRIT of Execution Returned as to Judgment Debtor Ata Montazeri, M.D. and All-American Medical Group, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3297) ALIAS WRIT of Execution Returned as to Judgment Debtor/Defendant Teofilo Po. (gk) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3296) WRIT of Execution Returned Executed as to Judgment Debtor/Defendant Clifford Ermshar. (gk) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3295) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) or Levy with Writ of Execution as to all money maintained by debtor Clifford Ermshar in any accounts at any and all branches executed upon The Vanguard Group, by serving Jovanne Williams, Legal Dept. on 4/10/2007. Remarks: USM 285 and 2 Notices of Levy packets forwarded to PA. Total Deputy Time 3 hours; total R/T mileage 50 miles at $.485. (gk) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3294) Mail Returned addressed to Saghi Zilka re USCA Mandate #3293 . (gk) (Entered: 03/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
3,371 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/1999
  • (#9) Proof of service of s/c executed upon defendant Lee D Newman MD personally on 8/30/99 (lc) (Entered: 09/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/1999
  • (#8) Proof of service of s/c executed upon defendant Mohsen Tavoussi personally on 8/25/99 (lc) (Entered: 09/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/1999
  • (#7) Proof of service of s/c executed upon defendant Advanced Professional Imaging Inc by srv Miguel Alvarez, agent for srv, personally on 8/26/99 (lc) (Entered: 09/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/1999
  • (#6) Proof of service of s/c executed upon defendant Ata O Montazeri MD personally on 8/24/99 (lc) (Entered: 09/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/1999
  • (#5) Proof of service of s/c executed upon defendant Harrell Robinson personally on 8/30/99 (lc) (Entered: 09/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/1999
  • (#4) RETURN OF SMS Proof of service of s/c executed upon defendant Advanced Laser Surgical Cetner Inc dba Advanced Laser Surgical Cetner by srv Mir Jaffar Shadjareh, agent for srv personally on 8/30/99 (lc) (Entered: 09/03/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/1999
  • NOTICE pro hac vice application mailed to attorneys Marvin Wexler and Lawrence C Fox (bg) (Entered: 08/13/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1999
  • (#641) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by plaintiff (lc) Modified on 01/02/2001 (Entered: 08/17/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) Issued referred to Discovery Ann I. Jones (bg) (iv). (Entered: 08/16/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1999
  • (#2) NOTICE by plaintiff of related case(s) CR 98-1042 JSL, CR 98-1116 JSL, CR 98-1117 JSL, CR 99-143 (assignment unknown), CR 99-169 JSL, CR 99-170 JSL, CR 99-416 SVW, CR 99-458 JSL, CR 99-459 JSL, CR 99-460 JSL, CR 99-462 JSL, CR 99-463 SVW, CR 99-464 SVW, CV 99-7158 WDK (CWx), CV 99-7740 DDP (RNBx), CV 99-7741 MRP (BQRx), CV 99-7742 HLH (Ex), CV 99-7743 MMM (SHx) & CV 99-7760 JSL (VAPx) (rn) Modified on 08/16/1999 (Entered: 08/16/1999)

    Read MoreRead Less