This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2018 at 07:57:25 (UTC).

Zurvita, Inc. et al v. Xu et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Zurvita, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Xu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02480

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zurvita Holdings, Inc.

Zurvita, Inc.

Defendants

Stoian Annastasov

Qing Li

Xiaoyong Chi

Simon Li

Juan Moreno

Wei Xu

Catarino Pardo

Jason Sharpe

Defeng Chen

Jiazheng Yin

Brittany Chrane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Angelina M. Whittington

Attorney at Whittington Law Group

230 E Davis Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Complaint

#15

#14

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE regarding service of #2 Summons issued by Kathy Xu (BES) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RETURN of service executed on 10/26/2018 by Zurvita, Inc., Zurvita Holdings, Inc. as to Jason Sharpe. (Whittington, Angelina) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RETURN of service executed on 10/27/2018 by Zurvita, Inc., Zurvita Holdings, Inc. as to Juan Moreno. (Whittington, Angelina) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Related case order and track 2 notice by Zurvita Holdings, Inc., Zurvita, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zurvita Holdings, Inc. for Zurvita Holdings, Inc., Zurvita, Inc... (Whittington, Angelina) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #16 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Zurvita Holdings, Inc., Zurvita, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Whittington, Angelina) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/15/2018. (SAO) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS issued as to Juan Moreno. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS issued as to Xiaoyong Chi. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS issued as to Stoian Annastasov (Dallas). (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued as to Jiazheng Yin. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS issued as to Brittany Chrane. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Jason Sharpe. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Simon Li. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Qing Li. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Defeng Chen (Garden City). (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Defeng Chen (Oakland Gardens). (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Catarino Pardo. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Wei Xu. (BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Stoian Annastasov, Defeng Chen, Xiaoyong Chi, Brittany Chrane, Qing Li, Simon Li, Juan Moreno, Catarino Pardo, Jason Sharpe, Wei Xu, Jiazheng Yin Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA 53521 filed by Zurvita, Inc., Zurvita Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BES) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurvita, Inc. is a litigant