This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2019 at 07:28:08 (UTC).

ZUFFA, LLC v. ALSAKKA et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 ZUFFA, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against ALSAKKA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur J. Schwab. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01705

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUFFA, LLC

Defendants

HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC

ALAMIR ALSAKKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wayne D. Lonstein

Attorney at Lonstein Law Office, P.C.

1 Terrace Hill, P.O. Box 351

Ellenville, NY 12428

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED - E-mailed copy of this letter, AO 121 Form, Docket Sheet and Notice of Settlement to the Copyright Office. (ept) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Settlement and Administrative Dismissal by ZUFFA, LLC (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon defendants of ECF#12 Text Only Order by ZUFFA, LLC re 12 Order, Set Hearings, (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon Defendants of Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference by ZUFFA, LLC re #10 Order, Set Hearings (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 3/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 9:00 AM. Defendant(s) shall file an answer on or before February 7, 2019. Counsel for Plaintiff is hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference together with the Complaint upon Defendant or Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/28/19. (lck) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ZUFFA, LLC. HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/3/19. (ms) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#5

(#5) COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights. (ept) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#4

(#4) AO 121 NOTICE by ZUFFA, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZUFFA, LLC. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ALAMIR ALSAKKA, HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC. (ept) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

1 #4

Summons Hookah Bookah

1 #3

Summons Alsakka

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALAMIR ALSAKKA, HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4976961), filed by ZUFFA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Alsakka, #4 Summons Hookah Bookah) (ept) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED - E-mailed copy of this letter, AO 121 Form, Docket Sheet and Notice of Settlement to the Copyright Office. (ept) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER APPROVING #14 Notice of Settlement filed by ZUFFA, LLC, Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Settlement and Administrative Dismissal by ZUFFA, LLC (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon defendants of ECF#12 Text Only Order by ZUFFA, LLC re 12 Order, Set Hearings, (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER - The TIME of the Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 is RESCHEDULED for 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab (previously set for 9:00 AM). Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon Defendants of Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference by ZUFFA, LLC re #10 Order, Set Hearings (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 3/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 9:00 AM. Defendant(s) shall file an answer on or before February 7, 2019. Counsel for Plaintiff is hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference together with the Complaint upon Defendant or Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/28/19. (lck) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ZUFFA, LLC. HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ZUFFA, LLC. ALAMIR ALSAKKA served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/3/19. (ms) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights. (ept) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 NOTICE by ZUFFA, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZUFFA, LLC. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. Attorney to submit AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. Attorney advised to file the Notice within 7 days. The link to the report can be found under Other Forms at: http://www.uscourts.gov/FormsAndFees/Forms/CourtFormsByCategory.aspx (ept) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2019. (ept) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to ALAMIR ALSAKKA, HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC. (ept) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALAMIR ALSAKKA, HOOKAH BOOKAH LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4976961), filed by ZUFFA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Alsakka, #4 Summons Hookah Bookah) (ept) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less