This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 16:32:44 (UTC).

Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. v. Backer EHP, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 Zoppas Industries de Mexico S A de C filed an Other lawsuit against v Backer EHP, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01693

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.

Defendants

Backer EHP, Inc.

Backer EHP, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Backer-Springfield, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron M. Nelson

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Patricia L. Enerio

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stephen J Akerley

Philip Ducker

Daniel J. Herling

Adrian Kwan

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Y. Choi

Thomas E. Williams

Kevin C. May

Daniel M. Terhune

Philip A. Rovner

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME On NOvember 13, 2018 an Order was Entered Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiffs Complaint to December 20, 2018 (D.I. 6); December 19, 2018 Defendant Filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (D.I. 7) and Its Opening Brief (D.I. 8) to Plaintiff Shall File Answering Brief to Motion through and Including January 24, 2019; Defendant shall file any Reply Brief in Support of Motion is Extend and Including Feburary 7, 2019 - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. (Enerio, Patricia) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Williams, Kevin C. May, Eric Y. Choi and Daniel M. Terhune - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent NIBE Industrier AB (publ) for Backer EHP, Inc. filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#8

(#8) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Backer EHP, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/2/2019. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2018 - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Herling, Steven J. Akerley, Philip C. Ducker and Adrian Kwan - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. (Enerio, Patricia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. Backer EHP, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Enerio, Patricia) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Zoppas Industries SpA for Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. (crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Backer EHP, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2491433.) - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Eric Y. Choi,Kevin C. May,Daniel M. Terhune,Thomas Earl Williams for Backer EHP, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, Set Briefing Schedule: re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 1/24/2019., Reply Brief due 2/7/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2018. (nmf) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME On NOvember 13, 2018 an Order was Entered Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiffs Complaint to December 20, 2018 (D.I. 6); December 19, 2018 Defendant Filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (D.I. 7) and Its Opening Brief (D.I. 8) to Plaintiff Shall File Answering Brief to Motion through and Including January 24, 2019; Defendant shall file any Reply Brief in Support of Motion is Extend and Including Feburary 7, 2019 - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. (Enerio, Patricia) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Williams, Kevin C. May, Eric Y. Choi and Daniel M. Terhune filed by Backer EHP, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/20/2018. (fms) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Williams, Kevin C. May, Eric Y. Choi and Daniel M. Terhune - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent NIBE Industrier AB (publ) for Backer EHP, Inc. filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Backer EHP, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/2/2019. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip Ducker,Stephen J Akerley,Adrian Kwan,Daniel J. Herling for Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2018 filed by Backer EHP, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Backer EHP, Inc. answer due 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2018. (fms) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2018 - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Herling, Steven J. Akerley, Philip C. Ducker and Adrian Kwan filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/9/2018. (fms) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Herling, Steven J. Akerley, Philip C. Ducker and Adrian Kwan - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. (Enerio, Patricia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. Backer EHP, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Enerio, Patricia) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Backer EHP, Inc. on 10/29/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Zoppas Industries SpA for Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. (crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Backer EHP, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2491433.) - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less