This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:40:46 (UTC).

Zirlott v. General Revenue Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Zirlott filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against General Revenue Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are P. Bradley Murray and William H. Steele. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00469

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

P. Bradley Murray

Presiding Judge

William H. Steele

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Zirlott

Defendant

General Revenue Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Brandon Walker

Attorney at Walker McMullan, LLC

242 West Valley Avenue Suite 312

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Brian D Roth

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel, L.L.C.

3850 North Causeway Boulevard, Suite 200

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura C. Nettles

Attorney at Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Proposed Order for Admission PHV

10 #2

Certificate in Good Standing

10 #1

Application for Admission w-Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2317664, Online Credit Card Payment.) by General Revenue Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission w-Exhibit A, #2 Certificate in Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission PHV) (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

9 #1

Consent Form

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant General Revenue Corporation. (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Revenue Corporation. (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Zirlott. General Revenue Corporation served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018 (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#3

(#3) Service Order entered 11/8/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/21/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/8/2018. (tgw) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to General Revenue Corporation. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against General Revenue Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2303320, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Phillip Zirlott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Admission of Brian D. Roth, Esq., Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/13/18. (lto) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2317664, Online Credit Card Payment.) Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2317664, Online Credit Card Payment.) by General Revenue Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission w-Exhibit A, #2 Certificate in Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission PHV) (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Defendant General Revenue Corporation reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by General Revenue Corporation. (Steele, William) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant General Revenue Corporation. (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Revenue Corporation. (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Zirlott. General Revenue Corporation served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018 (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Service Order entered 11/8/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/21/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/8/2018. (tgw) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to General Revenue Corporation. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against General Revenue Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2303320, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Phillip Zirlott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less