This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:18:04 (UTC).

Zagorsky-Beaudoin v. Warner Music Group Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Zagorsky-Beaudoin filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Warner Music Group Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03031

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin

Phoenix, AZ 85067

Defendants

John Cosenza

EMusic.Com Incorporated

Slacker Incorporated

Heartland Music.com

Pam Lueneburg

Pandora Media Incorporated

Unknown Parties

eBay Incorporated

Import CDs Incorporated

Brilliant Digitial Entertainment Incorporated

W B Colitre

Music Reports Incorporated

MYSPACE Music LLC

Atlantic Recording Corporation

Amazon.com Incorporated

Brian Oppenheimer

Microsoft Corporation

Rhino Entertainment Company

Apple Incorporated

5 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#9

#8

#10

7 #1

instructions

#7

#6

#2

1 #3

complaint

1 #2

complaint

1 #1

complaint

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REK) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #6 MOTION Requesting Court Order Service of Summons on Defendants for Plaintiff and Exempt Plaintiff from all costs re PACER registration required for e-filings (Titled: Motion Requesting the Court Order Plaintiff's Motion Filed on 9/25/18 be Withdrawn from Ajudication) by Plaintiff Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (REK) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Seal her #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is directed to seal Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 10/9/2018. (ATD) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) **Withdrawn by #18 **MOTION to Amend/Correct Page 33 re: #1 Complaint by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (REK) Modified on 11/6/2018 (REK). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Seal #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pgs. 6-8 by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (ATD) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (REK) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • (#12) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03031-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 instructions)(BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) **Withdrawn by #17 **MOTION Requesting Court Order for Service of Summons on Defendants for Plaintiff and Exempt Plaintiff from all costs re PACER registration required for e-filings by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (BAS) Modified on 11/1/2018 (REK). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (BAS) *Modified on 10/9/2018 to seal pursuant to Doc. #16 (ATD). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Larissa Zagorsky-Beaudoin. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 complaint, #3 complaint)(BAS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRILLIANT DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Slacker, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rhino Entertainment Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant