This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2017 at 02:37:24 (UTC).

Yusupov v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Case Summary

On 12/13/2017 Yusupov filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karon O Bowdre and Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-02085

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karon O Bowdre

Referral Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Malkiel Yusupov

Respondents

Todd Entrekin

Thomas D Homan

U.S. Department of Justice

Elaine C Duke

Jeff Sessions

Etowah County Detention Center

David D Rivera

US Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Julia Greenberg

Attorney at International Law Counsel, P.C.

125 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Respondent Attorney

Brandon Matthew Waterman

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER OF VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and the parties, that this action shall be and hereby is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, and the seven-day waiting period in Local Civil Rule 83.1 is waived. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/13/2017) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk shall serve copies of the petition, any documents filed in support, and this Order on the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. Respondents shall submit a written response to the petition no later than December 12, 2017. If Petitioner wishes to submit a reply brief, he must do so no later than December 19, 2017. Counsel for the parties shall appear for a hearing on December 21, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/28/2017) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-06959. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER OF VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and the parties, that this action shall be and hereby is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, and the seven-day waiting period in Local Civil Rule 83.1 is waived. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/13/2017) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Brandon M. Waterman dated December 12, 2017 re: Agreement to transfer venue. Document filed by Elaine C. Duke, Todd Entrekin, Etowah County Detention Center, Thomas D. Homan, David D. Rivera, Jeff Sessions, U.S Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Waterman, Brandon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of Elaine C. Duke, Todd Entrekin, Etowah County Detention Center, Thomas D. Homan, David D. Rivera, Jeff Sessions, U.S Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Waterman, Brandon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of Elaine C. Duke, Todd Entrekin, Etowah County Detention Center, Thomas D. Homan, David D. Rivera, Jeff Sessions, U.S Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Waterman, Brandon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk shall serve copies of the petition, any documents filed in support, and this Order on the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. Respondents shall submit a written response to the petition no later than December 12, 2017. If Petitioner wishes to submit a reply brief, he must do so no later than December 19, 2017. Counsel for the parties shall appear for a hearing on December 21, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/28/2017) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Julia Greenberg dated 11/21/2017 re: 28 USC 2243. Document filed by Malkiel Yusupov.(Greenberg, Julia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY;ELAINE C. DUKE, in her official capacity as Secretary; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THOMAS D. HOMAN, in is official capacity as Director; ETOWAH COUNTY DETENTION CENTER; DAVID D. RIVERA, in his official capacity as Director of New Orleans Field Office, TODD ENTREKIN, in his official capacity as Sheriff of the Etowah County Sheriffs Office; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; JEFF SESSSIONS, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Malkiel Yusupov. (Greenberg, Julia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Julia Greenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PERMISSION FROM THE COURT IS REQUIRED TO FILE SUMMONSES IN A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS -PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY;ELAINE C. DUKE, in her official capacity as Secretary; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THOMAS D. HOMAN, in is official capacity as Director; ETOWAH COUNTY DETENTION CENTER; DAVID D. RIVERA, in his official capacity as Director of New Orleans Field Office, TODD ENTREKIN, in his official capacity as Sheriff of the Etowah County Sheriffs Office; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; JEFF SESSSIONS, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Malkiel Yusupov. (Greenberg, Julia) Modified on 11/8/2017 (kl). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title on the summons must match the caption title on the petition. Party names on the summons must also match what is listed on the petition caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dpt of Homeland Sec. DHS, Elaine Duke Kelly, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), Acting Director Thomas D. Homan, Etowah County Detention Center, Rivera David, U.S. Department of Justice, Jeff Sessions, Todd Entrekin, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Malkiel Yusupov. (Greenberg, Julia) Modified on 10/26/2017 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Greenberg, Julia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Julia Greenberg. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (kl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Case Designated ECF. (kl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Julia Greenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dpt of Homeland Sec. DHS, Elaine Duke Kelly, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), Acting Director Thomas D. Homan, Etowah County Detention Center, Rivera David, U.S. Department of Justice, Jeff Sessions, Todd Entrekin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (kl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 0208-14121294)Document filed by Malkiel Yusupov.(Greenberg, Julia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.