This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2018 at 07:22:55 (UTC).

Yufa et al v. Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 Yufa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gene B Glick, Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12933

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irina Yufa

Victoria Gross

Defendant

Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey S. Wagner

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 West Big Beaver Road, Tenth Floor Columbia Center

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant Attorney

W. James Fitzgibbons

Attorney at Liberty Mutual Insurance - Northeast Region

28411 Northwestern Hwy., Suite 640

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/22/2019, Final Settlement Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#8

(#8) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wagner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2018 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

5 #1

Document Continuation Affirmatives

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmatives) (Fitzgibbons, W.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc. served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Wagner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc.* (DAll) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6910393 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Indiana. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wagner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/22/2019, Final Settlement Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/14/2018. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wagner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2018 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmatives) (Fitzgibbons, W.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc. served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Wagner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Gene B. Glick, Co., Inc.* (DAll) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6910393 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Indiana. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wagner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less