This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:58:27 (UTC).

Young v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Young filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00992

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Young

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew A. Warth

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

Brittany K. Barnett

3131 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75204

Respondent Attorneys

Van S. Vincent

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

110 Ninth Avenue, S, Suite A961

Nashville, TN 37203-3870

Brent Adams Hannafan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Nashville Office)

110 Ninth Avenue, S, Suite A961

Nashville, TN 37203-3870

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/21/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pending before the Court is Petitioner's Motion To Vacate, Set Aside, Or Correct Conviction and Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Doc. No. 1). Having conducted a preliminary review of the Motion without determining the ultimate merits of Petitioner's claim(s), the Court concludes Petitioner has satisfied the initial threshold requirement set forth in Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings For The United States District Courts (Section 2255 Rules). Accordingly, Respondent shall file an answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Motion in conformance with Rule 5 of the Section 2255 Rules within sixty (60) days of the date of entry of this Order on the docket. Petitioner shall file any reply within thirty (30) days after Respondent files its response. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/4/2018. (am) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by United States of America re #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Unopposed Proposed Order - R 5-1 filed in error (Vincent, Van) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Christopher Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Hallie McFadden Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - William Bruce Letter)(am) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Van S. Vincent on behalf of United States of America (Vincent, Van) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Hallie McFadden Affidavit

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Unopposed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Vincent, Van) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Brittany K. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/28/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

3 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for attorney(s) Brittany K. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2767719) by Christopher Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnett, Brittany) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B - William Bruce Letter

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Brittany K. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/28/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/21/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by United States of America re #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Unopposed Proposed Order - R 5-1 filed in error (Vincent, Van) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Unopposed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Vincent, Van) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Pending before the Court is Petitioner's Motion To Vacate, Set Aside, Or Correct Conviction and Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Doc. No. 1). Having conducted a preliminary review of the Motion without determining the ultimate merits of Petitioner's claim(s), the Court concludes Petitioner has satisfied the initial threshold requirement set forth in Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings For The United States District Courts (Section 2255 Rules). Accordingly, Respondent shall file an answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Motion in conformance with Rule 5 of the Section 2255 Rules within sixty (60) days of the date of entry of this Order on the docket. Petitioner shall file any reply within thirty (30) days after Respondent files its response. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/4/2018. (am) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • TN & TX State Bar status verified as active for Van S. Vincent, Brent Adams Hannafan, Brittany K. Barnett, Andrew A. Warth. (am) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for attorney(s) Brittany K. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2767719) by Christopher Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnett, Brittany) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Van S. Vincent on behalf of United States of America (Vincent, Van) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Christopher Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Hallie McFadden Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - William Bruce Letter)(am) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.